EP2277935 - POLYESTER COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING CYCLOBUTANEDIOL HAVING A CERTAIN COMBINATION OF INHERENT VISCOSITY AND MODERATE GLASS TRANSITION TEMPERATURE AND ARTICLES MADE THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/04] | Polyester compositions containing cyclobutanediol having a certain combination of inherent viscosity and moderate glass transition temperature and articles made therefrom | ||
[2015/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Chemical Company 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | [2011/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crawford, Emmett Dudley 3818 Woodleaf Lane Kingsport Tennessee 37663 / US | 02 /
Pecorini, Thomas Joseph 208 Remington Court Kingsport Tennessee 37663 / US | 03 /
McWilliams, Douglas Stephens 300 Charlie Avenue Piney Flats, Tennessee 37686 / US | 04 /
Porter, David Scott 365 Glasgow Lane Blountville Tennessee 37617 / US | 05 /
Connell, Gary Wayne 212 Gilda Avenue Church Hill Tennessee 37642 / US | [2015/29] |
Former [2011/10] | 01 /
Crawford, Emmett Dudley 3818 Woodleaf Lane Kingsport Tennessee 37663 / US | ||
02 /
Pecoroni, Thomas Joseph 208 Remington Court Kingsport Tennessee 37663 / US | |||
03 /
McWilliams, Douglas Stephens 300 Charlie Avenue Piney Flats, Tennessee 37686 / US | |||
04 /
Porter, David Scott 365 Glasgow Lane Blountville Tennessee 37617 / US | |||
05 /
Connell, Gary Wayne 212 Gilda Avenue Church Hill Tennessee 37642 / US | |||
Former [2011/04] | 01 /
Crawford, Emmett Dudley 3818 Woodleaf Lane Kingsport Tennessee 37663 / US | ||
02 /
Pecoroni, Thomas Joseph 208 Remington Court Kingsport Tennessee 37663 / US | |||
03 /
McWilliams, Douglas Stephens 291 Grandview Court Kingsport Tennesse 37664 / US | |||
04 /
Porter, David Scott 365 Glasgow Lane Blountville Tennessee 37617 / US | |||
05 /
Connell, Gary Wayne 212 Gilda Avenue Church Hill Tennessee 37642 / US | Representative(s) | Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/29] | Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/04] | Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Foerstl Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10014298.3 | 30.03.2006 | [2011/04] | Priority number, date | US20050691567P | 17.06.2005 Original published format: US 691567 P | US20050731389P | 28.10.2005 Original published format: US 731389 P | US20050731454P | 28.10.2005 Original published format: US 731454 P | US20050738869P | 22.11.2005 Original published format: US 738869 P | US20050739058P | 22.11.2005 Original published format: US 739058 P | US20050750547P | 15.12.2005 Original published format: US 750547 P | US20050750682P | 15.12.2005 Original published format: US 750682 P | US20050750692P | 15.12.2005 Original published format: US 750692 P | US20050750693P | 15.12.2005 Original published format: US 750693 P | [2011/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2277935 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2277935 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2277935 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/199, C08L67/02, C08J5/18 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
A01G9/1438 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (EP,KR,US);
A47F5/00 (EP,US);
B01D61/30 (EP,US);
B32B17/10018 (EP,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
B65D1/0207 (EP,US);
B65D23/10 (EP,US);
B65D25/00 (EP,US);
B65D43/00 (EP,US);
C08G63/183 (KR,US);
C08G63/199 (EP,US);
C08J7/0427 (US);
C08J7/123 (EP,US);
C08K3/32 (EP,US);
C08K5/521 (EP,US);
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
C08L67/03 (KR);
C08L69/00 (EP,US);
C09D167/02 (US);
E01F8/0005 (EP,US);
E04D13/03 (EP,US);
G02B1/04 (KR);
G02B1/14 (EP,US);
G02F1/133606 (EP,US);
A61M1/16 (EP,US);
B29C49/00 (EP,US);
B29C49/0005 (EP,US);
B29K2067/00 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7542 (EP,US);
C08J2367/00 (EP,US);
C08J2367/02 (EP,US);
C08J2483/00 (EP,US);
C08K2201/014 (EP,US);
C08L101/00 (EP,US);
G02B1/10 (EP,US);
G02B5/3083 (EP,US);
Y02A40/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/139 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1397 (EP,US);
Y10T428/161 (EP,US);
Y10T428/162 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24107 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24479 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31507 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/32, C08L67/00 (US,EP);
C08K5/521, C08L67/02 (EP,US);
C08L67/02, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L67/02, C08L2666/18 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/29] |
Former [2011/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | POLYESTERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, DIE CYCLOBUTANDIOL ENTHALTEN UND DIE EINE GEWISSE KOMBINATION VON VISKOSITÄT UND MÄSSIGER GLASSÜBERGANGSTEMPERATUR HABEN, UND daraus hergestellte ARTIKEL | [2015/08] | English: | POLYESTER COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING CYCLOBUTANEDIOL HAVING A CERTAIN COMBINATION OF INHERENT VISCOSITY AND MODERATE GLASS TRANSITION TEMPERATURE AND ARTICLES MADE THEREFROM | [2015/11] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE POLYESTER CONTENANT DU CYCLOBUTANEDIOL QUI PRÉSENTENT UNE CERTAINE COMBINAISON DE VISCOSITÉ ET DE TEMPÉRATURE DE TRANSITION VITREUSE MODÉRÉE ET ARTICLES FABRIQUÉS À PARTIR DE CELLES-CI | [2015/11] |
Former [2011/04] | POLYESTERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, DIE CYCLOBUTANDIOL ENTHALTEN UND DIE EINE GEWISSE KOMBINATION VON VISKOSITÄT UND MÄSSIGER GLASSÜBERGANGSTEMPERATUR HABEN, UND daraus hergestellte ARTIKEL | ||
Former [2011/04] | Polyester compositions containing cyclobutanediol having a certain combination of inherent viscosity and moderate glass transition temperature and articles made therefrom | ||
Former [2011/04] | Compositions de polyester contenant du cyclobutanediol qui présentent une certaine combinaison de viscosité et de température de transition vitreuse modérée et articles fabriqués à partir de celles-ci | Examination procedure | 02.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2012 | Examination requested [2012/51] | 17.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06749019.3 / EP1891137 | Divisional application(s) | EP15002089.9 / EP2954910 | EP17163415.7 / EP3246055 | EP20163621.4 / EP3686233 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060749019) is 04.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.03.2006 | AT | 15.07.2015 | BE | 15.07.2015 | BG | 15.07.2015 | CY | 15.07.2015 | CZ | 15.07.2015 | DK | 15.07.2015 | EE | 15.07.2015 | ES | 15.07.2015 | FI | 15.07.2015 | IT | 15.07.2015 | LT | 15.07.2015 | LV | 15.07.2015 | MC | 15.07.2015 | NL | 15.07.2015 | PL | 15.07.2015 | RO | 15.07.2015 | SE | 15.07.2015 | SI | 15.07.2015 | SK | 15.07.2015 | TR | 15.07.2015 | GR | 16.10.2015 | IS | 15.11.2015 | PT | 16.11.2015 | IE | 30.03.2016 | LU | 30.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 30.03.2006 | |
AT | 15.07.2015 | ||
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
CY | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
TR | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
IS | 15.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
IE | 30.03.2016 | ||
LU | 30.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.03.2006 | |
AT | 15.07.2015 | ||
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
CY | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
IS | 15.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
IE | 30.03.2016 | ||
LU | 30.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
IS | 15.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
IE | 30.03.2016 | ||
LU | 30.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
IS | 15.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
IE | 30.03.2016 | ||
LU | 30.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
IS | 15.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
LU | 30.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
IS | 15.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
LU | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
IS | 15.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
LU | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
IS | 15.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
IS | 15.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
IS | 15.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
IS | 15.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
IS | 15.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
IS | 15.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 15.07.2015 | |
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
IS | 15.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 15.07.2015 | |
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 15.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1278284 (KODAK PATHE) [A] 1-15 * example 13 *; | [A]GB1044015 (KODAK LTD) [A] 1-15 * example 8 *; | [A]UST875010I (KODAK-PATHE) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [A]US4379802 (WEAVER JAMES C, et al) [A] 11 * the whole document *; | [A]US4738880 (ASADA MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0544008 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP], et al) [A] 11 * the whole document *; | [A]US5705575 (KELSEY DONALD ROSS [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 7 - line 40 * * column 4, line 11 - line 19 *; | [A]US5942585 (SCOTT CHRISTOPHER E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 11 - column 3, line 6; example -; claim - *; | [A]US6011124 (SCOTT CHRISTOPHER EDWARD [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 14; example -; claim - *; | [A]US6043322 (SCOTT CHRISTOPHER EDWARD [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 7 * * column 7, line 31 - line 39 * * column 8, line 25 - line 34 *; | [A]US6096854 (MORRIS JOHN C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 7 - line 27 * * column 3, line 1 - line 22 * * column 6, line 9 - line 14 * * column 9, line 31 - line 36; example - *; | [X]US6120889 (TURNER S RICHARD [US], et al) [X] 1,9,10,12 * examples comp,6,7 *; | [A]US2002188092 (MOSKALA ERIC JON [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | Examination | - SHEARER N H, "T18-TYPE 1 POLYESTERS", SPE ANNUAL TECHNICAL CONFERENCE AND EXHIBITION, XX, XX, (19660301), vol. 12, page 2PP, XP009080224 | by applicant | US3169121 | US3207814 | US3772405 | US4156069 | US4194038 | US4430484 | US4452933 | US4465820 | US4981898 | US5654347 | US5696176 |