EP2293054 - POTENTIOMETRIC REFERENCE ELECTRODE WITH HETEROGENEOUS MEMBRANE AND USAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/10] | Potentiometric sensor comprising reference electrode with heterogeneous membrane | ||
[2020/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.08.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Healthcare Diagnostics Inc. 511 Benedict Avenue Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2018/18] |
Former [2011/10] | For all designated states Epocal Inc. 2060 Walkley Road Ottawa Ontario K1G 3P5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lauks, Imants 218 Coltrin Road Ottawa, K1M 0A6 / CA | 02 /
Maczuszenko, Andrzej 20 Rowse Crescent Etobicoke Ontario M9P 3L5 / CA | [2011/10] | Representative(s) | Plate, Jürgen Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwalt Industriepark Kalle-Albert, Gebäude H391 Rheingaustraße 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/15] | Plate, Jürgen Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwälte Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2011/10] | Bohmann, Armin K. Bohmann Anwaltssozietät Nymphenburger Straße 1 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10014341.1 | 27.11.2003 | [2011/10] | Priority number, date | US20020307481 | 02.12.2002 Original published format: US 307481 | [2011/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2293054 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2293054 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/30, G01N27/40, B01L3/00 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
B01L3/502715 (EP,US);
B01L3/5027 (EP,US);
G01N27/301 (EP,US);
B01L2200/025 (EP,US);
B01L2200/148 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0645 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0825 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0883 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0887 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/10] | G01N27/416, G01N27/333, G01N27/40, G01N27/401, G01N27/403 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/15] |
Former [2011/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | POTENTIOMETRISCHE REFERENZELEKTRODE MIT HETEROGENER MEMBRAN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2020/35] | English: | POTENTIOMETRIC REFERENCE ELECTRODE WITH HETEROGENEOUS MEMBRANE AND USAGE | [2020/35] | French: | ÉLECTRODE DE RÉFÉRENCE POTÉNTIOMETRIQUE AVEC MEMBRANE HÉTÉROGÈNE ET SON UTILISATION | [2020/35] |
Former [2011/10] | Potentiometrischer Sensor, enthaltend Referenzelektrode mit heterogener Membran | ||
Former [2011/10] | Potentiometric sensor comprising reference electrode with heterogeneous membrane | ||
Former [2011/10] | Capteur potentiométrique comprenant électrode de référence avec membrane hétérogène | Examination procedure | 05.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/10] | 18.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03776734.0 / EP1567855 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030776734) is 06.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/12] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 28.12.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 28.12.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.01.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 28.12.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 28.12.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.01.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 19.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 19.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 18.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.11.2003 | CY | 14.04.2021 | CZ | 14.04.2021 | EE | 14.04.2021 | MC | 14.04.2021 | RO | 14.04.2021 | SI | 14.04.2021 | SK | 14.04.2021 | BG | 14.07.2021 | GR | 15.07.2021 | PT | 16.08.2021 | LU | 27.11.2021 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/29] | HU | 27.11.2003 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
LU | 27.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | CZ | 14.04.2021 | |
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
LU | 27.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | CZ | 14.04.2021 | |
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | CZ | 14.04.2021 | |
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 14.04.2021 | |
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 14.04.2021 | |
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | BG | 14.07.2021 | |
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | BG | 14.07.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0058720 (INFOPIA CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-7 * pages 8-12; figure 1; claims 1-9 *; | [A]EP1087225 (ORTHO CLINICAL DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002011408 (LEE JAE SEON [KR], et al) [X] 1,3-7 * paragraphs [0063] - [0072]; figures 3A,3B *; | [X]EP1193495 (CHA GEUN SIG [KR]) [X] 1,3-7 * paragraphs [0043] - [0048] - [0064] - [0071]; figures 3B,4b *; | [A] - MATYSIK SILKE ET AL, "A disposable electrode based on zeolite-polymer membranes for potentiometric titrations of ionic surfactants", SENS ACTUATORS, B CHEM;SENSORS AND ACTUATORS, B: CHEMICAL JUN 20 2002, (20020620), vol. 85, no. 1-2, pages 104 - 108, XP002271483 [A] 1-7 * page 105, column 2, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0925-4005(02)00060-6 | Examination | US3926764 | - JIN SEO LEE ET AL, "HYDROPHILIC POLYURETHANE COATED SILVER/SILVER CHLORIDE ELECTRODE FOR THE DETERMINATION OF CHLORIDE IN BLOOD", ELECTROANALYSIS, VHC PUBLISHERS, INC, US, (19990401), vol. 11, no. 4, doi:10.1002/(SICI)1521-4109(199904)11:4<260::AID-ELAN260>3.0.CO;2-#, ISSN 1040-0397, pages 260 - 267, XP009020306 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-4109(199904)11:4<260::AID-ELAN260>3.0.CO;2-# | by applicant | US4062750 | US4133735 | US4225410 | US4342964 | US4431508 | US4592824 | US4682602 | US4933048 | US5063081 | US5385659 | US5514253 | US5727548 | - JANATA, Solid State Chemical Sensors, ACADEMIC PRESS INC., (1985), pages 101 - 103 | - Proceedings, Symposium on Electrochemical Sensors for Biomedical Applications, THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1986), vol. 86-14, pages 66 - 73 | - HYDROGELS, Medicine and Pharmacy, CRC PRESS, (1986), vol. 1 | - H. YASUDA ET AL., "Permeability of Solutes through Hydrated Polymer Membranes", DIE MAKROMOLEKULARE CHEMIE, (1968), vol. 118, no. 2858, pages 19 - 35 | US20010871823 |