EP2301961 - SCLEROSTIN EPITOPES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/13] | Sclerostin epitopes | ||
[2016/32] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.01.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2023 | Correction of patent specification | published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, California 91320-1799 / US | [2016/48] |
Former [2011/13] | For all designated states UCB Pharma, S.A. Allée de la Recherche 60 1070 Bruxelles / BE | ||
For all designated states Amgen, Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lu, Hsieng Sen 2758 Rainfield Avenue Westlake Village California 91362 / US | 02 /
Paszty, Christopher 1027 Westridge Drive Ventura California 93003 / US | 03 /
Robinson, Martyn Kim Nursery Cottage Harvey Hill Woodburn Green Buckinghamshire HP10 0JH / GB | 04 /
Henry, Alistair James 92 Cowley Road Uxbridge Middlesex UB 8 2LX / GB | 05 /
Hoffmann, Kelly Sue 795 Green Valley Drive Newbury Park California 91320 / US | 06 /
Latham, John 2409 10th Avenue West Seattle Washington 98119 / US | 07 /
Lawson, Alastair 208 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | 08 /
Winkler, David 127 George Street Arlington Massachusetts 02476-7326 / US | 09 /
Winters, Aaron George 2501 Pierpont Boulevard Ventura California 93001 / US | [2017/08] |
Former [2011/13] | 01 /
Lu, Hsieng Sen 2758 Rainfield Avenue Westlake Village California 91362 / US | ||
02 /
Paszty, Christopher 1027 Westridge Drive Ventura California 93003 / US | |||
03 /
Robinson, Martyn Kim Nursery Cottage Harvey Hill Woodburn Green Buckinghamshire HP10 0JH / GB | |||
04 /
Henry, Alistair James 92 Cowley Road Uxbridge Middlesex UB 8 2LX / GB | |||
05 /
Hoffmann, Kelly Sue 795 Green Valley Drive Newbury Park California 91320 / US | |||
06 /
Latham, John 2409 10th Avenue West Seattle Washington 98119 / US | |||
07 /
Lawson, Alastair 208 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | |||
08 /
Winkler, David 127 George Street Arlington Massachusetts 02476-7326 / US | |||
09 /
Winters, Aaron George 2501 Pierpont Boulevard Ventura California 93001 / US | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/28] |
Former [2017/08] | Campbell, Patrick John Henry J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2011/13] | Campbell, Patrick John Henry J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10014373.4 | 28.04.2006 | [2011/13] | Priority number, date | US20050677583P | 03.05.2005 Original published format: US 677583 P | US20060776847P | 24.02.2006 Original published format: US 776847 P | US20060782244P | 13.03.2006 Original published format: US 782244 P | US20060792645P | 17.04.2006 Original published format: US 792645 P | US20060410540 | 25.04.2006 Original published format: US 410540 | [2011/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2301961 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2301961 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/08] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2301961 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2301961 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, C07K16/18, C07K16/22, C12N15/63, C07K14/51 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
C07K14/51 (EP,US);
C07K16/18 (US);
A61P15/12 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K16/22 (EP,US);
C12N15/63 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/13] | C07K14/51, A61K38/10, A61K38/17 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/08] |
Former [2011/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 14.09.2011 | BA | 14.09.2011 | HR | 14.09.2011 | MK | 14.09.2011 | YU | 14.09.2011 | Title | German: | SCLEROSTIN EPITOPE | [2016/31] | English: | SCLEROSTIN EPITOPES | [2016/32] | French: | EPITOPES DE LA SCLEROSTIN | [2023/28] |
Former [2011/13] | Sclerostin Epitope | ||
Former [2011/13] | Sclerostin epitopes | ||
Former [2011/13] | Epitopes de la sclerostin | Examination procedure | 14.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 07.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 17.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 11.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06751835.7 / EP1891100 | EP10006930.1 / EP2251351 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060751835) is 30.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.11.2017
28.11.2017
ADMISSIBLE James Poole Limited One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB Opponent's representative Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2021/37] |
Former [2018/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.11.2017
28.11.2017
ADMISSIBLE James Poole Limited One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB Opponent's representative Marshall, Cameron John Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | 11.12.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.04.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.01.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.06.2019 | 01.03.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.11.2019 | 12.06.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.12.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.12.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.02.2023 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 31.05.2023 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 14.02.2020 | Appeal received No. T0398/20 | 01.05.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 03.02.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 17.01.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 17.01.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.01.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2005003158 (CELLTECH R & D INC [US], et al) [X] 15-20 * sequences 74, 76, 98 * * page 41, line 5 - line 7 * * page 46, line 22 - line 25 * [Y] 1-20; | [XY]WO2005014650 (CELLTECH R & D INC [US], et al) [X] 15-20 * sequences 29, 31, 53 * * page 6, line 23 - line 28 * [Y] 1-20; | [Y] - VITER S S ET AL, "Analysis of antigenic structure of Potato Virus M Ukrainian strains", BIOPOLIMERY I KLETKA, NAUKOVA DUMKA, KIEV, UK, (20000701), vol. 16, no. 4, ISSN 0233-7657, pages 312 - 319, XP009144175 [Y] 1 * page 315, column 1, paragraph 2 * | [A] - AVSIAN-KRETCHMER ORNA ET AL, "Comparative genomic analysis of the eight-membered ring cystine knot-containing bone morphogenetic protein antagonists.", MOLECULAR ENDOCRINOLOGY, (200401), vol. 18, no. 1, ISSN 0888-8809, pages 1 - 12, XP002400896 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4179337 | US4301144 | US4331647 | US4411993 | US4464456 | US4496689 | US4543439 | USRE32011E | US4640835 | US4670417 | US4791192 | US4902614 | WO9202551 | US5145684 | US5223409 | US5399363 | US5466468 | US5543158 | US5552157 | US5565213 | US5567434 | US5627052 | US5641515 | US5698426 | US5738868 | US5795587 | US5877397 | US6133426 | US6395511 | US2004009535 | US6703199 | US2004146888 | US6803453 | US2005106683 | US2005238646 | - RIGGS, WEST J. MED., (1991), vol. 154, pages 63 - 77 | - BRUNKOW ET AL., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (2001), vol. 68, pages 577 - 589 | - BALEMANS ET AL., HUM. MOL. GENET., (2001), vol. 10, pages 537 - 543 | - HOLLINGER; HUDSON, NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 23, no. 9, pages 1126 - 1136 | - NISONOFF ET AL., ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (1960), vol. 89, page 230 | - PORTER, BIOCHEM. J., (1959), vol. 73, page 119 | - EDELMAN ET AL., Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1967), vol. 1, page 422 | - ANDREWS, S.M.; TITUS, J.A. ET AL., Current Protocols in Immunology, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (2003), pages 2.8.1 - 2.8.10,2 | - LARRICK ET AL., METHODS: A COMPANION TO METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1991), vol. 2, page 106 | - "Genetic Manipulation of Monoclonal Antibodies", COURTENAY-LUCK ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies: Production, Engineering and Clinical Application, CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1995), page 166 | - "Genetic Manipulation and Expression of Antibodies", WARD ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies: Principles and Applications, WILEY-LISS, INC., (1995), page 137 | - MOULT J., CURR. OP. IN BIOTECH., (1996), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 422 - 427 | - CHOU ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1974), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 222 - 245 | - CHOU ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1974), vol. 113, no. 2, pages 211 - 222 | - CHOU ET AL., ADV. ENZYMOL. RELAT AREAS MOL. BIOL., (1978), vol. 47, pages 45 - 148 | - CHOU ET AL., ANN. REV. BIOCHEM., vol. 47, pages 251 - 276 | - CHOU ET AL., BIOPHYS. J., (1979), vol. 26, pages 367 - 384 | - HOLM ET AL., NUCL. ACID. RES., (1999), vol. 27, no. 1, pages 244 - 247 | - BRENNER ET AL., CURR. OP. STRUCT. BIOL., (1997), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 369 - 376 | - JONES, D., CURR. OPIN. STRUCT. BIOL., (1997), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 377 - 87 | - SIPPL ET AL., STRUCTURE, (1996), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 15 - 19 | - BOWIE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 253, pages 164 - 170 | - GRIBSKOV ET AL., METH. ENZYM., (1990), vol. 183, pages 146 - 159 | - GRIBSKOV ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI., (1987), vol. 84, no. 13, pages 4355 - 4358 | - THORNTON ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 354, page 105 | - NYGREN; UHLEN, CURRENT OPINION IN STRUCTURAL BIOLOGY, (1997), vol. 7, pages 463 - 469 | - ZHANG, W. ET AL., MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY., (2005), vol. 42, no. 12, pages 1445 - 1451 | - HWANG W. ET AL., METHODS, (2005), vol. 36, no. 1, pages 35 - 42 | - DAU'ACQUA WF ET AL., METHODS, (2005), vol. 36, no. 1, pages 43 - 60 | - CLARK, M., IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, (2000), vol. 21, no. 8, pages 397 - 402 | - PLUCKTHUN ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1989), vol. 178, pages 497 - 515 | - SANGER ET AL., PNAS, (1977), vol. 74, page 5463 | - KRAMER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1984), vol. 12, page 9441 | - KUNKEL, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, pages 488 - 92 | - KUNKEL ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 154, pages 367 - 82 | - YANG ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1995), vol. 254, pages 392 - 403 | - MARKS ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783 | - LOW ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 250, pages 350 - 368 | - PATTEN ET AL., CURR. OPIN. BIOTECLMOL., (1997), vol. 8, pages 724 - 733 | - THOMPSON ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 256, pages 7 - 88 | - CRAMERI ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 391, pages 288 - 291 | - VAUGHAN ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 16, pages 535 - 539 | - KOHLER ET AL., NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495 | - COLIGAN ET AL., Current Protocols in Immunology, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1991), vol. 1 | - "Production of monoclonal antibodies against proteins expressed in E. coli", PICKSLEY ET AL., DNA Cloning 2: Expression Systems, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1995), page 93 | - "Purification of Immunoglobulin G (IgG)", BAINES ET AL., Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS, INC., (1992), vol. 10, pages 79 - 104 | - GREEN ET AL., NATURE GENET., (1994), vol. 7, page 13 | - LONBERG, NATURE, (1994), vol. 368, page 856 | - TAYLOR, INT. IMMUN., (1994), vol. 6, page 579 | - BRUGGEMANN, CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL., (1997), vol. 8, pages 455 - 58 | - JAKOBOVITS ET AL., ANN. N. Y. ACAD SCI., (1995), vol. 764, pages 525 - 35 | - BRUGGEMANN ET AL., CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL., (1997), vol. 8, pages 455 - 58 | - GLASKY ET AL., HYBRIDOMA, (1989), vol. 8, pages 377 - 89 | - BOERNER ET AL., J LMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 147, pages 86 - 95 | - BABCOOK ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 7843 - 48 | - WINTER ET AL., ANNU. REV: IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 12, pages 433 - 55 | - BURTON ET AL., ADV. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 57, pages 191 - 280 | - HUSE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 246, pages 1275 - 81 | - SASTRY ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 5728 - 32 | - ALTING-MEES ET AL., STRATEGIES IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1990), vol. 3, pages 1 - 9 | - KANG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 4363 - 66 | - HOOGENBOOM ET AL., J. MOLEC. BIOL., (1992), vol. 227, pages 381 - 388 | - SCHLEBUSCH ET AL., HYBRIDOMA, (1997), vol. 16, pages 47 - 52 | - BIRD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426 | - HARRIS, RJ., JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, (1995), vol. 705, pages 129 - 134 | - ANGAL SET, MOL IMMUNOL, (1993), vol. 30, no. 1, pages 105 - 108 | - SCATCHARD, ANN. N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (1949), vol. 51, pages 660 - 672 | - WOLFF ET AL., CANCER RES., (1993), vol. 53, pages 2560 - 65 | - SUDO H; KODAMA H-A; AMAGAI Y; YAMAMOTO S; KASAI S, "vitro differentiation and calcification in a new clonal osteogenic cell line derived from newborn mouse calvaria", J. CELL BIOL., (1983), vol. 96, doi:doi:10.1083/jcb.96.1.191, pages 191 - 198, XP002000687 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/jcb.96.1.191 | - SMITH E; REDMAN R; LOGG C; COETZEE G; KASAHARA N; FRENKEL B, "Glucocorticoids inhibit developmental stage-specific osteoblast cell cycle", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2000), vol. 275, pages 19992 - 20001 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, pages 1035 - 1038,157 | - LASIC, TRENDS BIOTECHNOL., (1998), vol. 16, no. 7, pages 307 - 21 | - TAKAKURA, NIPPON RINSHO, (1998), vol. 56, no. 3, pages 691 - 95 | - CHANDRAN ET AL., INDIAN J. EXP. BIOL., (1997), vol. 35, no. 8, pages 801 - 09 | - MARGALIT, CRIT. REV. THER. DRUG CARRIER SYST., (1995), vol. 12, no. 2-3, pages 233 - 61 | - QUINTANAR-GUERRERO ET AL., DRUG DEV. IND PHARM., (1998), vol. 24, no. 12, pages 1113 - 28 | - COUVREUR ET AL., CRIT. REV. THER. DRUG CARRIER SYST., (1988), vol. 5, no. 1, pages 1 - 20 | - ZUR MUHLEN ET AL., EUR. J. PHARM. BIOPHARM., (1998), vol. 45, no. 2, pages 149 - 55 | - ZAMBAUX ET AL., J CONTROLLED RELEASE, (1998), vol. 50, no. 1-3, pages 31 - 40 | - COMIER, CURR. OPIN. IN RHEU., (1995), vol. 7, page 243 | - GUINNESS-HEY, METAB. BONE DIS. RELAT. RES., (1984), vol. 5, pages 177 - 181 | - KALU, D.N., "The ovariectomized rat model ofpostmenopausal bone loss", BONE AND MINERAL, (1991), vol. 15, pages 175 - 192 | - FROST, H.M.; JEE, W.S.S., "Qn the rat'model of human osteopenias and osteoporosis", BONE AND MINERAL, (1992), vol. 18, doi:doi:10.1016/0169-6009(92)90809-R, pages 227 - 236, XP023072088 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-6009(92)90809-R | - JEE, W.S.S.; YAO, W., "Overview: animal models of osteopenia and osteoporosis", J MUSCULOSKEL. NEURON. INTERACT., (2001), vol. 1, pages 193 - 207 | - SUDO H ET AL., "vitro differentiation and calcification in a new clonal osteogenic cell line derived from newborn mouse calvaria", J. CELL BIOL., vol. 96, doi:doi:10.1083/jcb.96.1.191, pages 191 - 198, XP002000687 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/jcb.96.1.191 | - SMITH E; REDMAN R; LOGG C; COETZEE Q; KASAHARA N; FRENKEL B, "Glucocorticoids inhibit developmental stage-specific osteoblast cell cycle", J BIOL CHEM, (2000), vol. 275, pages 19992 - 20001 | - SUDO H; KODAMA H-A; AMAGAI Y; YAMAMOTO S; KASAI S, "vitro differentiation and calcification in a new clonal osteogenic cell line derived from newborn mouse calvaria", J CELL BIOL, (1983), vol. 96, doi:doi:10.1083/jcb.96.1.191, pages 191 - 198, XP002000687 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/jcb.96.1.191 | - BYRNE, F. R. ET AL., GUT, (2005), vol. 54, pages 78 - 86 | US20030478977 | US20040868497 | Opposition | WO0032773 | WO2005003158 | WO2005014650 | - VITER et al., "Analysis of antigenic structure of Potato Virus M Ukrainian strains", Biopolymers & Cell, (20000000), vol. 16, no. 4, pages 312 - 319, XP009144175 | - AVSIAN-KRETCHMER et al., "Comparative genomic analysis of the eight-membered ring cystine knot-containing bone morphogenetic protein antagonists", Mol. Endocrinol., (20040000), vol. 18, no. 1, pages 1 - 12, XP002400896 | - HUGO et al., "Functional aspects of co-variant surf ace charges in an antibody fragment", Prot. Sci., (20020000), vol. 11, pages 2697 - 2705, XP055261739 | - Warmington K. et al., "Sclerostin Antagonism in Adult Rodents, via Monoclonal Antibody Mediated Blockade, Increases Bone Mineral Density and Implicates Sclerostin as a Key Regulator of Bone Mass During Adulthood", Oasis, Online Abstract Submission and Invitation System, (20040000), XP009072609 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1359/JBMR.0301211 | - Declaration of Chris Paszty of 14 June 2012 | - Reverberi and Reverberi, 2007, Blood Transfus., 5, 227-240 | - Lee and Kerns (1999) LS/MS Applications in Drug Development, Mass Spectrometry Reviews 18, 187-279 | - Robb et al. (2000), Anal. Chem., 72. 3653-3659 | - Arpino et al. (1989) Mass Spectrometry Reviews, 8, 35-55 | - Ardrey (2003), Liquid Chromatography - Mass Spectrometry: An Introduction. John Wiley & Sons, Ltd | - Niessen (2006). Liquid Chromatography - Mass Spectrometry, Third Edition. Boca Raton: CRC Taylor & Francis | - Declaration of Prof. Schwartz | - New continuous chemistry systems offers the widest range of reactions | - Syrris Releae. New continuous chemistry system offers the widest range of reactions | - A. Raines "The Calvin Cycle Revisited" - 18.04.2022 |