EP2453450 - Hybrid core for power inductor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Falco Electronics Ltd. 40 Craven Street London WC2N 5NG / GB | [2012/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duràn, Javier Calle 23 Apt. 311 X 46 Fracc Itzincab Mérida Yucatà 97392 / MX | 02 /
Esguerra, Mauricio Römerring 1 82024 Taufkirchen / DE | 03 /
Gibellini, Umberto Calle 23 Apt. 311 X 46 Fracc Itzincab Mérida Yucatàn 97392 / MX | [2012/20] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/20] | Application number, filing date | 10014552.3 | 12.11.2010 | [2012/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2453450 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01F3/10, H01F27/33, H01F37/00 | [2012/20] | CPC: |
H01F3/10 (EP);
H01F27/33 (EP);
H01F37/00 (EP);
H01F2003/106 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Hybridkern für einen Leistungsinduktor | [2012/20] | English: | Hybrid core for power inductor | [2012/20] | French: | Noyau hybride pour inducteur de puissance | [2012/20] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/26] | 17.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6980077 (CHANDRASEKARAN SRIRAM [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 14 * * column 4, line 34 - column 7, line 30 * * figures 5,7,8,9 *; | [XI]EP1806759 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * * column 3, paragraph 48 - column 6, paragraph 63 * * figures 1,3,4 * [I] 3,6,7; | [X]US4100521 (HORI YASURO) [X] 1-3,8 * abstract * * column 4, line 32 - column 8, line 58 * * figures 1-14 * | by applicant | DE3305708 |