EP2330626 - COPLANAR HIGH FILL FACTOR PIXEL ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/23] | Coplanar high fill factor pixel architecture | ||
[2017/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carestream Health, Inc. 150 Verona Street Rochester, NY 14608-1733 / US | [2011/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chang, Jeff Hsin 600 Kirk Road Rochester, NY 14612 / US | 02 /
Tredwell, Timothy J. 79 County Clar Crescent Fairport, NY 14450 / US | 03 /
Heiler, Gregory N. 212 Buttonwood Drive Hilton, NY 14468 / US | [2011/23] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/28] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2011/23] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 10014569.7 | 12.11.2010 | [2011/23] | Priority number, date | US20090630959 | 04.12.2009 Original published format: US 630959 | [2011/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2330626 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2330626 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146 | [2011/23] | CPC: |
H01L27/14658 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/14603 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/14609 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/14612 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/14636 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/14659 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/28] |
Former [2011/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KOPLANARE PIXELARCHITEKTUR MIT HOHEM FÜLLFAKTOR | [2017/02] | English: | COPLANAR HIGH FILL FACTOR PIXEL ARCHITECTURE | [2017/02] | French: | ARCHITECTURE DE PIXEL À FACTEUR ÉLEVÉ DE REMPLISSAGE COPLANAIRE | [2017/02] |
Former [2011/23] | Koplanare Pixelarchitektur mit hohem Füllfaktor | ||
Former [2011/23] | Coplanar high fill factor pixel architecture | ||
Former [2011/23] | Architecture de pixel à facteur élevé de remplissage coplanaire | Examination procedure | 12.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 08.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 12.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.11.2010 | AL | 12.07.2017 | AT | 12.07.2017 | CY | 12.07.2017 | CZ | 12.07.2017 | DK | 12.07.2017 | EE | 12.07.2017 | ES | 12.07.2017 | FI | 12.07.2017 | HR | 12.07.2017 | IT | 12.07.2017 | LT | 12.07.2017 | LV | 12.07.2017 | MC | 12.07.2017 | MK | 12.07.2017 | NL | 12.07.2017 | PL | 12.07.2017 | PT | 12.07.2017 | RO | 12.07.2017 | RS | 12.07.2017 | SE | 12.07.2017 | SI | 12.07.2017 | SK | 12.07.2017 | SM | 12.07.2017 | TR | 12.07.2017 | BG | 12.10.2017 | NO | 12.10.2017 | GR | 13.10.2017 | GB | 12.11.2017 | IE | 12.11.2017 | IS | 12.11.2017 | LU | 12.11.2017 | MT | 12.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 12.11.2010 | |
AT | 12.07.2017 | ||
CY | 12.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MK | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PT | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
TR | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
GB | 12.11.2017 | ||
IE | 12.11.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 12.11.2017 | ||
MT | 12.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 12.11.2010 | |
AT | 12.07.2017 | ||
CY | 12.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MK | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
TR | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
GB | 12.11.2017 | ||
IE | 12.11.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 12.11.2017 | ||
MT | 12.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 12.11.2010 | |
AT | 12.07.2017 | ||
CY | 12.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MK | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
GB | 12.11.2017 | ||
IE | 12.11.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 12.11.2017 | ||
MT | 12.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 12.11.2010 | |
AT | 12.07.2017 | ||
CY | 12.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
GB | 12.11.2017 | ||
IE | 12.11.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 12.11.2017 | ||
MT | 12.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 12.11.2010 | |
AT | 12.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
GB | 12.11.2017 | ||
IE | 12.11.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 12.11.2017 | ||
MT | 12.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
GB | 12.11.2017 | ||
IE | 12.11.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 12.11.2017 | ||
MT | 12.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IE | 12.11.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 12.11.2017 | ||
MT | 12.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 12.11.2017 | ||
MT | 12.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 12.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 12.07.2017 | |
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 12.07.2017 | |
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 12.07.2017 | |
NO | 12.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2008001091 (KOBAYASHI ISAO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,9,10 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0103] * * claims 26,32 * * figures 4A-4B,13,14 * [A] 7 [I] 3,8; | [XI]US5789737 (STREET ROBERT A [US]) [X] 1-8 * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 39 * * figures 1-3 * [I] 9,10; | [XAI]EP2086006 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [X] 1,5-7 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0121] * * figures 1-4,12 * [A] 4 [I] 2,3,8-10 |