EP2333492 - Rotational angle measurement apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/24] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Mutsumi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectuel Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2016/04] |
Former [2011/24] | 01 /
Suzuki, Mutsumi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectuel Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/04] | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstraße 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/24] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10014677.8 | 16.11.2010 | [2011/24] | Priority number, date | JP20090261472 | 17.11.2009 Original published format: JP 2009261472 | [2011/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2333492 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2333492 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/14 | [2011/24] | CPC: |
G01D5/145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/04] |
Former [2011/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Rotationswinkelmessvorrichtung | [2011/24] | English: | Rotational angle measurement apparatus | [2011/24] | French: | Appareil de mesure d'angle de rotation | [2011/24] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 15.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.11.2010 | AL | 27.01.2016 | AT | 27.01.2016 | BE | 27.01.2016 | CY | 27.01.2016 | CZ | 27.01.2016 | DK | 27.01.2016 | EE | 27.01.2016 | ES | 27.01.2016 | FI | 27.01.2016 | HR | 27.01.2016 | IT | 27.01.2016 | LT | 27.01.2016 | LV | 27.01.2016 | MC | 27.01.2016 | MK | 27.01.2016 | NL | 27.01.2016 | PL | 27.01.2016 | RO | 27.01.2016 | RS | 27.01.2016 | SE | 27.01.2016 | SI | 27.01.2016 | SK | 27.01.2016 | SM | 27.01.2016 | TR | 27.01.2016 | BG | 27.04.2016 | NO | 27.04.2016 | GR | 28.04.2016 | IS | 27.05.2016 | PT | 27.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 16.11.2010 | |
AT | 27.01.2016 | ||
BE | 27.01.2016 | ||
CY | 27.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
MC | 27.01.2016 | ||
MK | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
TR | 27.01.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 16.11.2010 | |
AT | 27.01.2016 | ||
BE | 27.01.2016 | ||
CY | 27.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
MC | 27.01.2016 | ||
MK | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
BE | 27.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
BE | 27.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 27.01.2016 | |
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 27.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6633462 (ADELERHOF DERK JAN [NL]) [Y] 1-15* column 1, line 4 - line 8; figures 4,7; claim 1 *; | [X]WO2006070305 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 1, line 6 - line 8; figures 4,6; claims 1,6,10 *; | [Y]EP1918678 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * figure 1; claims 1,7 * | by applicant | JP3799270B | JP2006194861 |