EP2282445 - CLASSIFICATION MECHANISM FOR SUPPLYING POWER OVER COMMUNICATION LINK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/06] | Classification mechanism for supplying power over communication link | ||
[2014/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linear Technology Corporation 1630 McCarthy Boulevard Milpitas, CA 95035-7417 / US | [2011/37] |
Former [2011/12] | For all designated states Linear Technology Corporation 1630 McCarthy Boulevard Milpitas, CA 95035-7417 / US | ||
Former [2011/06] | For all designated states Linear Technology Corporation 1630 McCarthy Boulevard Milipitas, CA 95035-7417 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stanford, Clayton Reynolds P.O.Box 1210 Summerland CA 93067-1210 / US | [2011/06] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2016/32] |
Former [2011/06] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10014682.8 | 15.03.2006 | [2011/06] | Priority number, date | US20050079487 | 15.03.2005 Original published format: US 79487 | [2011/06] | Filing language | EE | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2282445 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2282445 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2282445 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/10 | [2011/06] | CPC: |
H04L12/10 (EP,KR,US);
H04L49/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/32] |
Former [2011/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KLASSIFIZIERUNGSMECHANISMUS ZUR LEISTUNGSZUFÜHRUNG ÜBER EINE KOMMUNIKATIONSVERBINDUN | [2016/13] | English: | CLASSIFICATION MECHANISM FOR SUPPLYING POWER OVER COMMUNICATION LINK | [2016/15] | French: | MÉCANISME DE CLASSIFICATION POUR FOURNIR ALIMENTATION SUR UN LIEN DE COMMUNICATION | [2016/15] |
Former [2011/06] | Klassifizierungsmechanismus zur Leistungszuführung über eine Kommunikationsverbindung | ||
Former [2011/06] | Classification mechanism for supplying power over communication link | ||
Former [2011/06] | Mécanisme de classification pour fournir alimentation sur un lien de communication | Examination procedure | 02.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/08] | 05.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 23.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06738267.1 / EP1859567 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060738267) is 20.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.03.2006 | AT | 10.08.2016 | BE | 10.08.2016 | CY | 10.08.2016 | CZ | 10.08.2016 | DK | 10.08.2016 | EE | 10.08.2016 | ES | 10.08.2016 | FI | 10.08.2016 | LT | 10.08.2016 | LV | 10.08.2016 | MC | 10.08.2016 | PL | 10.08.2016 | RO | 10.08.2016 | SE | 10.08.2016 | SI | 10.08.2016 | SK | 10.08.2016 | TR | 10.08.2016 | BG | 10.11.2016 | GR | 11.11.2016 | IS | 10.12.2016 | PT | 12.12.2016 | IE | 15.03.2017 | LU | 15.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 15.03.2006 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
IE | 15.03.2017 | ||
LU | 15.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 15.03.2006 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
IE | 15.03.2017 | ||
LU | 15.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
IE | 15.03.2017 | ||
LU | 15.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
LU | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 10.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003036819 (LEHR AMIR [IL], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0009] - [0029] * * paragraphs [0041] - [0062]; figures 2,3A,3B,4A,4B,5 * * paragraphs [0065] - [0073]; figures 8,9 *; | [AP]WO2005036374 (POWERDSINE LTD [IL], et al) [AP] 1-16 * paragraphs [0002] - [0008] - [0017] - [0028] * * paragraphs [0064] , [0072] - [0081] - [0084] - [0087]; figures 2a,2b,3a,3b,4a,4b * * paragraphs [0093] - [0126] - [0132] - [0152]; figures 5a,5b,5c,5d,6a,6b,6c *; | [XP]WO2005036815 (POWERDSINE LTD [IL], et al) [XP] 1-16 * paragraphs [0006] - [0021] * * paragraphs [0043] - [0047]; figures 1a-1c * * paragraphs [0050] - [0077]; figures 2a-2d * * paragraphs [0080] - [0102]; figures 3a-3d,4 * | [I] - MENDELSON G, "All You Need To Know About Power over Ethernet (PoE) and the IEEE 802.3af Standard", IEEE, (200406), XP002372480 [I] 1-16 * page 7 - page 19; figures 2-10 * | [A] - YAIR DARSHAN, "IEEE802.3poep Study Group Technical Aspects", (20050101), pages 1 - 9, IEEE, URL: http://www.ieee802.org/3/poep_study/public/jan05/darshan_2_0105.pdf, (20060707), XP002389252 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [A] - IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, "802.3af Part 3: carrier Sense Multiple Access with Collision detection (CSMA/CD) Access Method and Physical Layer Specifications Amendment: Data Terminal Equipment (DTE) Pwer via Media Dependent Interface (MDI)", IEEE STD 802.3AF-2003, XX, XX, (20030618), pages 1 - 121, XP002323385 [A] 1-16 * page 29 - page 65 * | by applicant | US20050079487 |