EP2329800 - Knee orthotic [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2013 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otto Bock HealthCare GmbH Max-Näder-Strasse 15 37115 Duderstadt / DE | [2011/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vollbrecht, Matthias Berliner Strasse 27 37412 Herzberg am Harz / DE | 02 /
Brüggemann, Gert-Peter, Prof. Dr. Kirchweg 56 50858 Köln / DE | 03 /
Gösele- Koppenburg, Andreas Rebweg 1a 79540 Lörrach / DE | 04 /
Best, Raymond, Dr. Alexanderstrasse 153 70180 Stuttgart / DE | 05 /
Ellermann, Andree, Dr. Schauinslandstrasse 12 76275 Ettlingen / DE | 06 /
Semsch, Hartmut Einsteinstrasse 44 70374 Stuttgart / DE | 07 /
Albasini, Alfio Montedato 6595 Riazzino Ticino / CH | 08 /
Liebau, Christian, Dr. Jägersruh 41a 38126 Braunschweig / DE | 09 /
Petersen, Wolf, Prof. Dr. Am grossen Wannsee 64 H 14109 Berlin / DE | [2011/23] | Representative(s) | Lins, Edgar, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | Lins, Edgar, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 10014768.5 | 19.11.2010 | [2011/23] | Priority number, date | DE20091057700 | 07.12.2009 Original published format: DE102009057700 | [2011/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2329800 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2329800 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/09] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2329800 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/01 | [2011/23] | CPC: |
A61F5/0125 (EP,US);
A61F2005/0176 (EP,US);
A61F2005/0179 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/23] | Title | German: | Kniegelenkorthese | [2011/23] | English: | Knee orthotic | [2011/23] | French: | Orthèse du genou | [2011/23] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 08.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 30.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.11.2010 | AL | 29.02.2012 | CY | 29.02.2012 | CZ | 29.02.2012 | DK | 29.02.2012 | EE | 29.02.2012 | FI | 29.02.2012 | HR | 29.02.2012 | IE | 29.02.2012 | LT | 29.02.2012 | LV | 29.02.2012 | MK | 29.02.2012 | MT | 29.02.2012 | RO | 29.02.2012 | RS | 29.02.2012 | SI | 29.02.2012 | SK | 29.02.2012 | SM | 29.02.2012 | BG | 29.05.2012 | NO | 29.05.2012 | GR | 30.05.2012 | ES | 09.06.2012 | IS | 29.06.2012 | PT | 29.06.2012 | LU | 19.11.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 19.11.2010 | |
AL | 29.02.2012 | ||
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
RS | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
SM | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
LU | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AL | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
RS | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
SM | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
LU | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AL | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
RS | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
RS | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
RS | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
RS | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
RS | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
RS | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
RS | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
RS | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/40] | FI | 29.02.2012 | |
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
RS | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 29.02.2012 | |
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 29.02.2012 | |
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 29.02.2012 | |
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 29.02.2012 | |
NO | 29.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5807298 (PALUMBO PASQUALE M [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 2, lines 54-57 * * column 3, line 66 - column 5, line 32 *; | [AD]WO2004069109 (DJ ORTHOPEDICS LLC [US], et al) [AD] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] , [0031] - [0039] *; | [AD]US7060045 (MASON JEFFREY T [US], et al) [AD] 1-12 * abstract *; | [AD]US7059329 (MASON JEFFREY T [US], et al) [AD] 1-12* abstract * | by applicant | WO2004069109 | US7059329 | US7060045 |