EP2285115 - Bi-directional predictive coding of interlaced video [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/12] |
Former [2011/07] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mukerjee, Kunal c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
Holcomb, Thomas W. c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2016/52] |
Former [2011/07] | 01 /
Mukerjee, Kunal c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | ||
02 /
Holcomb, Thomas W. c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/52] |
Former [2012/24] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/49] | Fischer, Michael Maria, et al Olswang Gemany LLP Maximilianstraße 13 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/07] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10014885.7 | 03.09.2004 | [2011/07] | Priority number, date | US20030501081P | 07.09.2003 Original published format: US 501081 P | US20040882135 | 29.06.2004 Original published format: US 882135 | [2011/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2285115 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2285115 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2285115 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/577, H04N19/61, H04N19/70 | [2016/08] | CPC: |
H04N19/577 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/102 (EP,US);
H04N19/105 (EP,US);
H04N19/109 (EP,US);
H04N19/11 (EP,US);
H04N19/112 (EP,US);
H04N19/117 (EP,US);
H04N19/129 (EP,US);
H04N19/13 (EP,US);
H04N19/137 (EP,US);
H04N19/146 (EP,US);
H04N19/147 (EP,US);
H04N19/159 (EP,US);
H04N19/16 (EP,US);
H04N19/172 (EP,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/18 (EP,US);
H04N19/184 (EP,US);
H04N19/186 (EP,US);
H04N19/196 (EP,US);
H04N19/433 (KR);
H04N19/46 (EP,US);
H04N19/463 (EP,US);
H04N19/51 (EP,US);
H04N19/52 (EP,US);
H04N19/523 (EP,US);
H04N19/593 (EP,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
H04N19/70 (EP,US);
H04N19/82 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/07] | H04N7/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/52] |
Former [2011/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bidirektionale prädiktive Kodierung von Videos mit Zeilensprungsverfahren | [2016/52] | English: | Bi-directional predictive coding of interlaced video | [2011/07] | French: | Codage prédictif bidirectionnel de vidéo entrelacée | [2011/07] |
Former [2011/07] | Bidirektionale prädiktive Kodierung von Progressivvideos | Examination procedure | 23.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 16.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04783296.9 / EP1665766 | Divisional application(s) | EP12158084.9 / EP2466894 | EP12158085.6 / EP2466895 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040783296) is 23.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.09.2004 | AT | 28.12.2016 | BE | 28.12.2016 | CY | 28.12.2016 | CZ | 28.12.2016 | DK | 28.12.2016 | EE | 28.12.2016 | ES | 28.12.2016 | FI | 28.12.2016 | IT | 28.12.2016 | MC | 28.12.2016 | PL | 28.12.2016 | RO | 28.12.2016 | SE | 28.12.2016 | SI | 28.12.2016 | SK | 28.12.2016 | TR | 28.12.2016 | BG | 28.03.2017 | GR | 29.03.2017 | PT | 28.04.2017 | IE | 03.09.2017 | LU | 03.09.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 03.09.2004 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
IE | 03.09.2017 | ||
LU | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 03.09.2004 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
IE | 03.09.2017 | ||
LU | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
IE | 03.09.2017 | ||
LU | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 28.12.2016 | |
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 28.12.2016 | |
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0542474 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 18, line 23 - page 21, line 44; figures 1,16 * * page 8, line 46 - page 9, line 55 *; | [A]WO03047272 (GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0060]; figures 5,6 * * paragraph [0068]; figure 11 * * paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0098] * * paragraph [0112] *; | [A]EP0863674 (GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 5, line 46 - page 6, line 2 * * page 6, line 54 - page 8, line 42 * * page 10, line 43 - page 12, line 41; figures 4-8; tables 2-4,6 *; | [A] - WANG L ET AL, "Interlace Coding Tools for H.26L Video Coding", ITU STUDY GROUP 16 - VIDEO CODING EXPERTS GROUP,, Pattaya, Thailand, (20011204), pages 1 - 20, XP002240263 [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph l - page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 7, paragraph l - page 8, paragraph l * | [A] - KARSTEN SÜHRING ET AL, "JM2.1 video coding reference software, extract from source code module lencod.c", INTERNET CITATION, (20020527), URL: Geneva, Switzerland http://iphome.hhi.de/suehring/tml/download/old_jm /jm21.zip, (20080214), XP002469654 [A] 1-11 * page 1, line 1 - line l * * page 3, last line but 4 - page 4, last line, in particular section "allocate memory for temp B-frame motion vector buffer" * | [AP] - SRINIVASAN S ET AL, "Windows Media Video 9: overview and applications", SIGNAL PROCESSING. IMAGE COMMUNICATION, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20041001), vol. 19, no. 9, doi:10.1016/J.IMAGE.2004.06.005, ISSN 0923-5965, pages 851 - 875, XP004607151 [AP] 1-11 * abstract * * sections 3.3.2, 3.7 and 3.8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.image.2004.06.005 | by applicant | US20030501081 | US20040237803 | US20040228403 | US20040284103 | US20040857473 | US20020321415 |