EP2364059 - Device with several lamps switched in series [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2012 [2012/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O.Box 5052 Troy MI 48007 / US | [2011/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Singer, Andreas Im Oeschle 28 72488 Sigmaringen / DE | 02 /
Suck, Jochen Im Biesengarten 10 51674 Wiehl / DE | 03 /
Scholz, Martin Gansbusch 32 42369 Wuppertal / DE | [2011/36] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10015239.6 | 08.12.2008 | [2011/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2364059 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2364059 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08 | [2011/36] | CPC: |
H05B45/48 (EP);
H05B45/38 (EP,US);
H05B45/54 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung mit mehreren elektrisch in Serie geschalteten Leuchtmitteln | [2011/36] | English: | Device with several lamps switched in series | [2011/36] | French: | Dispositif doté de plusieurs voyants électriques reliés en série | [2011/36] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/46] | 22.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/46] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08021297.0 / EP2194760 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080021297) is 16.07.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0891120 (REITTER & SCHEFENACKER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 24; figure 2 *; | [A]DE10329367 (OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0040]; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2007069124 (PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 6, line 4 - page 8, line 11; figures 1-7 *; | [Y]US2007145914 (HONG HEE JUNG [KR], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0030] - [0043]; figures 2-4 *; | [Y]US2008111505 (WANG DAVID SHAU CHEW [TW], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0010] - [0015] * * paragraphs [0022] - [0027]; figures 2-6 *; | [A]US2008211428 (BAYAT BIJAN [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0136] - [0153]; figures 10,11 * |