EP2332863 - Device for rotating book blocks, books or similar printed products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kolbus GmbH & Co. KG Osnabrücker Strasse 77 32369 Rahden / DE | [2011/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerke, Klaus Gross Ringmar 16 27211 Bassum / DE | [2011/24] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/10] | Application number, filing date | 10015353.5 | 07.12.2010 | [2011/24] | Priority number, date | DE20091058150 | 12.12.2009 Original published format: DE102009058150 | [2011/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2332863 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2332863 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/244, B65G47/90 | [2011/24] | CPC: |
B65G47/244 (EP);
B65G47/905 (EP);
B65G2201/0288 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/24] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Drehen von Buchblocks, Büchern o. dgl. Druckprodukten | [2011/24] | English: | Device for rotating book blocks, books or similar printed products | [2011/24] | French: | Dispositif destiné à tourner des blocs de livres, des livres ou des produits d'impression analogues | [2011/24] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 14.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.12.2010 | AL | 07.03.2012 | CY | 07.03.2012 | CZ | 07.03.2012 | DK | 07.03.2012 | EE | 07.03.2012 | FI | 07.03.2012 | HR | 07.03.2012 | LT | 07.03.2012 | LV | 07.03.2012 | MK | 07.03.2012 | MT | 07.03.2012 | NL | 07.03.2012 | PL | 07.03.2012 | RO | 07.03.2012 | RS | 07.03.2012 | SE | 07.03.2012 | SI | 07.03.2012 | SK | 07.03.2012 | SM | 07.03.2012 | TR | 07.03.2012 | BG | 07.06.2012 | NO | 07.06.2012 | GR | 08.06.2012 | ES | 18.06.2012 | IS | 07.07.2012 | PT | 09.07.2012 | IE | 07.12.2012 | LU | 07.12.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 07.12.2010 | |
AL | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
MT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
RS | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
SM | 07.03.2012 | ||
TR | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
IE | 07.12.2012 | ||
LU | 07.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AL | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
MT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
RS | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
SM | 07.03.2012 | ||
TR | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
IE | 07.12.2012 | ||
LU | 07.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AL | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
MT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
RS | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
TR | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
IE | 07.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AL | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
MT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
RS | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
IE | 07.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
RS | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
IE | 07.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
RS | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
RS | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
RS | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
RS | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
RS | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
RS | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RS | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RS | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/40] | FI | 07.03.2012 | |
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RS | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 07.03.2012 | |
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 07.03.2012 | |
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 07.03.2012 | |
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 07.03.2012 | |
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 07.03.2012 | |
NO | 07.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1054937 (BETTERMANN) [A] 1 * figure 2; claim 5 *; | [AD]DE19810112 (KOLBUS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [AD] 1* the whole document * | by applicant | DE19810112 | DE19758732 |