EP2340912 - Pipe element with a cut edge for welding onto a carrier element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liebherr-Werk Nenzing GmbH Dr.-Hans-Liebherr-Strasse 1 6710 Nenzing / AT | [2011/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dolzer, Heimo Matin 271 6707 Bürserberg / AT | 02 /
Arzt, Ephraim Flugelin 62 6712 Thüringen / AT | [2011/27] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/25] | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/27] | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10015628.0 | 14.12.2010 | [2011/27] | Priority number, date | DE20091060795 | 31.12.2009 Original published format: DE102009060795 | [2011/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2340912 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2340912 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2340912 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B23K33/00 | [2011/27] | CPC: |
B23K33/006 (EP,US);
B23K33/00 (EP,US);
F16L41/004 (EP,US);
F16L41/082 (EP,US);
Y10T83/0596 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/27] | Title | German: | Rohrelement mit einer Schnittkante zum Anschweissen an ein Trägerelement | [2011/27] | English: | Pipe element with a cut edge for welding onto a carrier element | [2011/27] | French: | Elément de tuyau doté d'un bord de coupe pour souder sur un élément de support | [2011/27] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 14.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.04.2014 | 03.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2010 | AL | 18.06.2014 | BG | 18.06.2014 | CY | 18.06.2014 | CZ | 18.06.2014 | DK | 18.06.2014 | EE | 18.06.2014 | ES | 18.06.2014 | FI | 18.06.2014 | HR | 18.06.2014 | IT | 18.06.2014 | LT | 18.06.2014 | LV | 18.06.2014 | MC | 18.06.2014 | MK | 18.06.2014 | MT | 18.06.2014 | PL | 18.06.2014 | RO | 18.06.2014 | RS | 18.06.2014 | SE | 18.06.2014 | SI | 18.06.2014 | SK | 18.06.2014 | SM | 18.06.2014 | TR | 18.06.2014 | NO | 18.09.2014 | GR | 19.09.2014 | IS | 18.10.2014 | PT | 20.10.2014 | GB | 14.12.2014 | IE | 14.12.2014 | LU | 14.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 14.12.2010 | |
BG | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
MK | 18.06.2014 | ||
MT | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
TR | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
GB | 14.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 14.12.2010 | |
BG | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
MT | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
TR | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
GB | 14.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 14.12.2010 | |
BG | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
TR | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
GB | 14.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
GB | 14.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
GB | 14.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
GB | 14.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/48] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
GB | 14.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/47] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 18.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB527107 (UNITED STEEL COMPANIES LTD, et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-11 *; | [A]US3062567 (DE WITT EDWARD J) [A] 1 * figures 1-10 *; | [X]JPS4955544 (XXX) [X] 1 * figures 1-10 *; | [A]JPS5449938 (KOYAMA MASAAKI) [A] 1* figures 1-4 *; | [XA]US4274621 (ILLAKOWICZ JAN, et al) [X] 8 * claim 2 * * figures 1-6 * [A] 1; | [XY]EP0048403 (MUELLER J & W MASCH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5 * page 3, line 19 - line 22 * * page 5, line 1 - line 15 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 4; | [X]DE3032357 (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH) [X] 1,6,9,10 * column 4, line 4 - line 15 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]JPS59127980 (BRIDGESTONE CYCLE CO) [X] 1 * figure 6 *; | [X]JPS60216977 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [X] 1 * figures 1-4,6,7 *; | [XI]US5190207 (PECK DONALD R [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * column 1, line 11 - line 15 * * figures 2-3 * [I] 7; | [Y]EP0870572 (ALKA HOLLAND HOLDING B V [NL]) [Y] 4 * figures 1-6 * |