EP2213297 - Staphylococcus aureus antigenic polypeptides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Absynth Biologics Limited 131 Mount Pleasant Liverpool Science Park, Innovation Centre 1 Liverpool L3 5TF / GB | [2014/15] |
Former [2010/31] | For all designated states Absynth Biologics Ltd 40 Leavygreave Road Sheffield S3 7RD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foster, Simon J. Cedar Croft Higger Lane Hathersage West Yorkshire S32 1AW / GB | 02 /
Garcia Lara, Jorge 9 Midvale Avenue Sheffield S6 3HJ / GB | [2014/51] |
Former [2010/31] | 01 /
Foster, Simon J. Cedar Croft Higger Lane Hathersage West Yorkshire S32 1AW / GB | ||
02 /
Garcia Lara, Jorge 9 Midvale Avenue Sheffield S6 3HJ / GB | Representative(s) | Docherty, Robert Charles, et al Symbiosis IP Limited York Biotech Campus Office 14FA05 Sand Hutton York, YO41 1LZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/51] | Docherty, Robert Charles, et al Symbiosis IP 106 Hepworth Green York YO31 7TQ / GB | ||
Former [2010/47] | Docherty, Robert Charles, et al Symbiosis IP Limited Apollo House Eboracum Way Heworth Green, York YO31 7RE / GB | ||
Former [2010/31] | Docherty, Robert Charles Gilholm Harrison Limited Marlborough House Westminster Place York Business Park Nether Poppleton, York YO26 6RW / GB | Application number, filing date | 10075018.1 | 08.03.2006 | [2010/31] | Priority number, date | GB20050005949 | 23.03.2005 Original published format: GB 0505949 | [2010/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2213297 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2213297 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2213297 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/07, A61K39/085, A61K39/395, C07K7/06, C07K14/31 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
C07K16/1271 (EP,US);
A61K39/07 (EP,US);
A61K39/085 (EP,US);
A61K39/40 (US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/06 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
C07K14/31 (EP,US);
C07K14/32 (EP,US);
C07K16/1278 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/31] | Title | German: | Staphylococcus aureus antigen Polypeptiden | [2010/31] | English: | Staphylococcus aureus antigenic polypeptides | [2010/31] | French: | Polypeptides antigéniques de staphylococcus aureus | [2010/31] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/10] | 15.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06710041.2 / EP1863525 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060710041) is 01.04.2008 | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.03.2006 | AT | 17.12.2014 | BE | 17.12.2014 | BG | 17.12.2014 | CY | 17.12.2014 | CZ | 17.12.2014 | EE | 17.12.2014 | FI | 17.12.2014 | LT | 17.12.2014 | LV | 17.12.2014 | MC | 17.12.2014 | PL | 17.12.2014 | RO | 17.12.2014 | SI | 17.12.2014 | SK | 17.12.2014 | TR | 17.12.2014 | IE | 08.03.2015 | LU | 08.03.2015 | GR | 18.03.2015 | IS | 17.04.2015 | PT | 17.04.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/24] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 08.03.2015 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 08.03.2015 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 08.03.2015 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | EE | 17.12.2014 | |
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 17.12.2014 | |
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 17.12.2014 | |
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 17.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0013694 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US]) [X] 1-8,10,12-14 * abstract * * page 12, line 29 - page 14, line 5 * * page 19, line 12 - page 20, line 33 * * page 27, line 32 - page 30, line 5 * * page 40, line 14 - page 41, line 2 * * claims 3, 4 * * sequences 1, 2 * [I] 9,11,15; | [XI]WO02094868 (CHIRON SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1-10,12-15 * abstract * * page 3, line 7 - line 18 * * page 8, line 25 - page 20, line 34 * * page 20, line 35 - page 22, line 30 * * page 23, line 1 - page 24, line 16 * * claims 1, 4, 6, 11-15 * [I] 11; | [XI]WO03083099 (AFFINIUM PHARM INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-10,12-14 * page 42, line 28 - line 33 * * Antibodies; page 106 - page 111 * * Vaccines; page 125 - page 127 * * sequences 13-16 * [I] 11,15; | [XI]WO0170955 (ELITRA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 7,8 * example 7 * * sequences 4672, 5727,8060, 12158 * [I] 1-6,9-15; | WO02077183 [ ] (ELITRA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [ ] * claims 25, 32 * * sequences 7974, 44158 * * example 12 * | [XI] - Wang et al., "Protein encoded by Prokaryotic essential gene 1761", Geneseq, (20030619), Database accession no. ABU16234, URL: EBI, XP002586213 [X] 7,8 * the whole document * [I] 1-6,9-15 |