EP2261250 - GCSF-Albumin fusion proteins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/50] | Albumin fusion proteins | ||
[2015/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Human Genome Sciences, Inc. 14200 Shady Grove Road Rockville, MD 20850 / US | For all designated states Novozymes Biopharma DK A/S Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [2011/14] |
Former [2010/50] | For all designated states HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES, INC. 9410 Key West Avenue Rockville, MD 20850 / US | ||
For all designated states Novozymes Biopharma UK Limited Castle Court 59, Castle Boulevard Nottingham NG7 1FD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ballance, David James 715 Hillside Avenue Berwyn, Pennsylvania 19312 / US | 02 /
Turner, Andrew John 212 Hawthorne Road King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US | 03 /
Rosen, Craig A 370 Eagle Hill Road Pasadena MD 21122 / US | 04 /
Haseltine, William A 3035 P Street NW Washington, DC 20007 / US | 05 /
Ruben, Steven M 19420 Pyrite Lane Brookeville, Maryland 20833 / US | [2013/16] |
Former [2010/50] | 01 /
Ballance, David James 715 Hillside Avenue Berwyn, Pennsylvania 19312 / US | ||
02 /
Turner, Andrew John 212 Hawthorne Road King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US | |||
03 /
Rosen, Craig A 22400 Rolling Hill Lane Laytonsville, Maryland 20882 / US | |||
04 /
Haseltine, William A 3035 P Street NW Washington, DC 20007 / US | |||
05 /
Ruben, Steven M 19420 Pyrite Lane Brookeville, Maryland 20833 / US | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/27] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2010/50] | Bassett, Richard Simon, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10075030.6 | 23.12.2002 | [2010/50] | Priority number, date | US20010341811P | 21.12.2001 Original published format: US 341811 P | US20020350358P | 24.01.2002 Original published format: US 350358 P | US20020351360P | 28.01.2002 Original published format: US 351360 P | US20020359370P | 26.02.2002 Original published format: US 359370 P | US20020360000P | 28.02.2002 Original published format: US 360000 P | US20020367500P | 27.03.2002 Original published format: US 367500 P | US20020370227P | 08.04.2002 Original published format: US 370227 P | US20020378950P | 10.05.2002 Original published format: US 378950 P | US20020382617P | 24.05.2002 Original published format: US 382617 P | US20020383123P | 28.05.2002 Original published format: US 383123 P | US20020385708P | 05.06.2002 Original published format: US 385708 P | US20020394625P | 10.07.2002 Original published format: US 394625 P | US20020398008P | 24.07.2002 Original published format: US 398008 P | US20020402131P | 09.08.2002 Original published format: US 402131 P | US20020402708P | 13.08.2002 Original published format: US 402708 P | US20020411426P | 18.09.2002 Original published format: US 411426 P | US20020411355P | 18.09.2002 Original published format: US 411355 P | US20020414984P | 02.10.2002 Original published format: US 414984 P | US20020417611P | 11.10.2002 Original published format: US 417611 P | US20020420246P | 23.10.2002 Original published format: US 420246 P | US20020423623P | 05.11.2002 Original published format: US 423623 P | [2010/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2261250 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2261250 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/765, C12N15/62 | [2010/50] | CPC: |
C07K14/765 (EP,US);
A61K31/155 (EP,US);
A61K31/426 (EP,US);
A61K31/4439 (EP,US);
A61K31/4965 (EP,US);
A61K38/04 (EP,US);
A61K38/17 (EP,US);
A61K38/28 (EP,US);
A61K39/21 (US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/04 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/10 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P3/12 (EP);
A61P3/14 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P5/06 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P5/40 (EP);
A61P5/50 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P7/12 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/02 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C07K14/435 (US);
C07K14/4713 (EP,US);
C07K14/4723 (US);
C07K14/475 (US);
C07K14/50 (US);
C07K14/505 (EP,US);
C07K14/51 (US);
C07K14/521 (US);
C07K14/525 (US);
C07K14/535 (US);
C07K14/54 (US);
C07K14/5406 (US);
C07K14/55 (US);
C07K14/555 (US);
C07K14/56 (US);
C07K14/565 (US);
C07K14/575 (US);
C07K14/57563 (EP,US);
C07K14/5759 (US);
C07K14/585 (US);
C07K14/59 (US);
C07K14/60 (US);
C07K14/605 (US);
C07K14/61 (US);
C07K14/62 (US);
C07K14/635 (EP,US);
C07K14/65 (US);
C07K14/655 (US);
C07K14/665 (US);
C07K14/705 (US);
C07K14/7151 (US);
C07K14/82 (US);
C07K16/00 (US);
C07K16/241 (US);
C07K16/26 (EP,US);
C07K7/06 (US);
C12N15/62 (EP,US);
C12N7/00 (US);
C12N9/0006 (EP,US);
C12N9/0008 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/10 (EP);
C07K2317/622 (EP,US);
C07K2317/76 (US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/20 (US);
C07K2319/30 (US);
C07K2319/31 (EP,US);
C12N2501/335 (EP,US);
C12N2740/16111 (EP,US);
C12N2740/16122 (EP,US);
C12N2740/16134 (EP,US);
C12N2740/16171 (EP,US);
C12Y101/01105 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/27] |
Former [2010/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | GCSF-Albumin Fusionsproteine | [2015/04] | English: | GCSF-Albumin fusion proteins | [2015/04] | French: | Protéines de fusion d'albumine et GCSF | [2015/04] |
Former [2010/50] | Albumin Fusionsproteine | ||
Former [2010/50] | Albumin fusion proteins | ||
Former [2010/50] | Protéines de fusion d'albumine | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 04.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/50] | 23.02.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 18.08.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 29.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02799966.3 / EP1463751 | EP08075724.8 / EP1997829 | Divisional application(s) | EP10075454.8 / EP2277888 | EP10075466.2 / EP2277889 | EP10075467.0 / EP2277910 | EP15174476.0 / EP2990417 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020799966) is 16.08.2005 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/23] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 28.09.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 28.09.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.10.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 28.09.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 28.09.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.10.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.07.2015 | BE | 01.07.2015 | BG | 01.07.2015 | CY | 01.07.2015 | CZ | 01.07.2015 | DK | 01.07.2015 | EE | 01.07.2015 | FI | 01.07.2015 | MC | 01.07.2015 | SE | 01.07.2015 | SI | 01.07.2015 | SK | 01.07.2015 | TR | 01.07.2015 | GR | 02.10.2015 | PT | 02.11.2015 | IE | 23.12.2015 | LU | 23.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
IE | 23.12.2015 | ||
LU | 23.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
IE | 23.12.2015 | ||
LU | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
IE | 23.12.2015 | ||
LU | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
LU | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
LU | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 01.07.2015 | |
GR | 02.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9001063 (DELTA BIOTECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]) [A] 1-29 * abstract *; | [I]WO9315199 (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR]) [I] 1-29 * page 32; figure 1a *; | [I]US5665863 (YEH PATRICE [FR]) [I] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [A]US5667986 (GOODEY ANDREW R [GB], et al) [A] 1-29* the whole document *; | [A]WO0179271 (PRINCIPIA PHARMACEUTICAL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * the whole document * | by applicant | US3773919 | US4002531 | US4179337 | EP0036676 | EP0043075 | EP0052322 | EP0058481 | EP0071564 | JPS58118008 | EP0088046 | US4414510 | DE3218121 | EP0102324 | US4444887 | US4474893 | US4485045 | EP0133988 | EP0142641 | EP0143949 | US4544545 | WO8605807 | EP0201239 | US4647447 | JPS6296086 | US4676980 | WO8704462 | US4687659 | EP0232751 | EP0239400 | US4714681 | US4716111 | EP0251744 | EP0258067 | US4736866 | US4741900 | US4758428 | EP0282317 | WO8900557 | WO8901036 | JPS6447381 | US4816567 | US4816397 | EP0322094 | US4857467 | EP0330451 | WO8910404 | US4885363 | US4897355 | WO9001063 | WO9002809 | EP0361991 | US4925648 | US4946778 | US4946787 | EP0387319 | WO9011092 | WO9013649 | EP0399816 | EP0401384 | US4980286 | WO9100360 | US4994560 | WO9106657 | WO9106309 | WO9109967 | WO9110737 | WO9110741 | US5049386 | US5073627 | WO9201047 | WO9205793 | WO9206194 | WO9208802 | US5122464 | US5139941 | EP0506477 | WO9218619 | US5173414 | WO9222324 | EP0519596 | WO9311236 | US5223409 | US5225539 | WO9317715 | US5258498 | US5274119 | US5283184 | EP0592106 | WO9409469 | EP0598877 | WO9412650 | US5328470 | US5342604 | US5349052 | US5354678 | US5367080 | WO9506058 | US5403484 | US5413923 | WO9515982 | US5427908 | US5428139 | US5435990 | US5436146 | WO9520401 | US5441050 | WO9523857 | US5459127 | EP0682110 | US5474935 | US5478745 | US5482852 | EP0693554 | US5489425 | US5489743 | US5505931 | US5516637 | WO9614328 | US5530101 | US5545806 | US5545618 | WO9626736 | WO9629411 | US5565332 | US5569825 | WO9634096 | WO9633735 | WO9634095 | US5571698 | US5573920 | US5576195 | US5580717 | US5580859 | WO9639515 | US5585089 | WO9640281 | US5589466 | US5589377 | US5593972 | US5601819 | US5602307 | US5612460 | US5625126 | US5633425 | US5641670 | US5643575 | WO9724445 | US5652361 | US5652224 | US5658727 | US5661016 | DE19639601 | WO9733899 | WO9733904 | WO9734911 | US5676954 | US5693622 | US5696239 | US5698426 | US5703055 | WO9802543 | US5714631 | WO9806842 | US5720936 | WO9807880 | WO9807832 | US5723719 | US5728915 | US5731490 | US5731489 | US5733743 | WO9816654 | WO9817281 | WO9818921 | US5750753 | US5756065 | WO9824893 | US5780225 | WO9830694 | WO9830213 | WO9830693 | US5783423 | WO9832466 | WO9832856 | US5807715 | US5808003 | US5811097 | US5814318 | US5821047 | WO9846645 | WO9850433 | WO9850347 | WO9854366 | WO9854202 | US5846818 | WO9856892 | WO9900504 | US5885793 | WO9923105 | US5916771 | US5939598 | WO9949830 | US5965386 | US5969108 | WO9956764 | US5985660 | WO9966936 | US6075181 | WO0044772 | US6114598 | - SLEEP ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 8, page 42 | - LEBLEU ET AL., PNAS USA, (1976), vol. 73, pages 3107 - 3111 | - GRESSER ET AL., NATURE, (1974), vol. 251, pages 543 - 545 | - JOHNSON, TEXAS REPORTS BIOL MED, (1977), vol. 35, pages 357 - 369 | - ADOLF ET AL., J. BIOCHEM, (1991), vol. 276, page 511 | - NYMAN TA ET AL., BIOCHEM, (1998), vol. 329, page 295 | - HOSOI ET AL., J. INTERFERON RES., (1988), vol. 8, page 375 | - KARPUSAS ET AL., CELL MOL LIFE SCI, (1998), vol. 54, page 1203 | - KNIGHT, J. INTERFERON RES., (1982), vol. 2, page 421 | - RUNKEL ET AL., PHARM RES, (1998), vol. 15, page 641 | - LIN, DEV. BIOL. STAND., (1998), vol. 96, page 97 | - SARENEVA ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM, (1996), vol. 242, page 191 | - SARENEVA ET AL., BIOCHEM J., (1994), vol. 303, page 831 | - SARENEVA ET AL., J. INTERFERON RES., (1993), vol. 13, page 267 | - LAI ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1986), vol. 261, page 3116 | - BROUDY ET AL., ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (1988), vol. 265, page 329 | - AUSUBEL, F.M. ET AL.,, Current protocol in Molecular Biology, GREEN PUBLISHING ASSOCIATES, INC., AND JOHN WILEY & SONS INC., (1989), pages 631 - 636,2103 | - BRUTLAG ET AL., COMP. APP. BIOSCI., (1990), vol. 6, pages 237 - 245 | - KARLIN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 2264 - 2268 | - ALTSCHUL, J. MOL. EVOL., (1993), vol. 36, pages 290 - 300 | - ALTSCHUL E, NATURE GENETICS, (1994), vol. 6, pages 119 - 129 | - HENIKOFF ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 10915 - 10919 | - RON ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1993), vol. 268, pages 2984 - 2988 | - DOBELI ET AL., J. BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 7, pages 199 - 216 | - J. BIOL. CHEM., (1993), vol. 268, pages 22105 - 22111 | - BOWIE ET AL., "Deciphering the Message in Protein Sequences: Tolerance to Amino Acid Substitutions", SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 247, pages 1306 - 1310 | - CUNNINGHAM; WELLS, SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, pages 1081 - 1085 | - PINCKARD ET AL., CLIN. EXP. IMMUNOL., (1967), vol. 2, pages 331 - 340 | - ROBBINS ET AL., DIABETES, (1987), vol. 36, pages 838 - 845 | - CLELAND ET AL., CRIT. REV. THERAPEUTIC DRUG CARRIER SYSTEMS, (1993), vol. 10, pages 307 - 377 | - B. C. JOHNSON,, POST-TRANSLATIONAL COVALENT MODIFICATION OF PROTEINS, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1983), pages 1 - 12 | - SEIFTER ET AL., METH. ENZYMOL., (1990), vol. 182, pages 626 - 646 | - RATTAN ET AL., ANN. N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (1992), vol. 663, pages 48 - 62 | - PHIZICKY ET AL., MICROBIOL. REV., (1995), vol. 59, pages 94 - 123 | - HOUGHTEN, BIO/TECHNIQUES, (1992), vol. 4, pages 12 - 421 | - LAM, NATURE, (1991), vol. 354, pages 82 - 84 | - FODOR, NATURE, (1993), vol. 364, pages 555 - 556 | - CULL ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 1865 - 1869 | - SCOTT; SMITH, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 386 - 390 | - DEVLIN, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 404 - 406 | - CWIRLA ET AL., PROC..NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 6378 - 6382 | - FELICI, J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, pages 301 - 310 | - AUSUBEL ET AL,, Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN · WILEY & SONS, INC., (1994), vol. 1 | - AUSUBEL ET AL,, Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC., (1994), vol. 1 | - AUSUBEL ET AL,, Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1994), vol. 1 | - CHOTHIA; LESK, J MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917 | - CHOTHIA ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 342, pages 878 - 883 | - TUTT ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 147, pages 60 - 69 | - KOSTELNY ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, pages 1547 - 1553 | - SONGSIVILAI; LACHMANN, CLIN. EXP. IMMUNOL., (1990), vol. 79, pages 315 - 321 | - KOSTELNY ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, pages 1547 - 1553 | - HOLLIGER ET AL., "Diabodies", PNAS USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448 | - TRAUNECKER ET AL., "Janusins", EMBO J, (1991), vol. 10, pages 3655 - 3659 | - TRAUNECKER ET AL., "Janusin: new molecular design for bispecific reagents", INT J CANCER, (1992), vol. 17, pages 51 - 52 | - DENG ET AL., BLOOD, (1998), vol. 92, no. 6, pages 1981 - 1988 | - CHEN ET AL., CANCER RES., (1998), vol. 58, no. 16, pages 3668 - 3678 | - HARROP ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 161, no. 4, pages 1786 - 1794 | - ZHU ET AL., CANCER RES., (1998), vol. 58, no. 15, pages 3209 - 3214 | - YOON ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 160, no. 7, pages 3170 - 3179 | - PRAT ET AL., J. CELL. SCI., (1998), vol. 111, pages 237 - 247 | - PITARD ET AL., J. HNMUNOL. METHODS, (1997), vol. 205, no. 2, pages 177 - 190 | - LIAUTARD ET AL., CYTOKINE, (1997), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 233 - 241 | - CARLSON ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, no. 17, pages 11295 - 11301 | - TARYMAN ET AL., NEURON, (1995), vol. 14, no. 4, pages 755 - 762 | - MULLER ET AL., STRUCTURE, (1998), vol. 6, no. 9, pages 1153 - 1167 | - BARTUNEK ET AL., CYTOKINE, (1996), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 14 - 20 | - HAMMERLING ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies and T-Cell Hybridomas, ELSEVIER, (1981), pages 563 - 681 | - BRINKMAN ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1995), vol. 182, pages 41 - 50 | - AMES ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1995), vol. 184, pages 177 - 186 | - KETTLEBOROUGH ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 24, pages 952 - 958 | - PERSIC ET AL., GENE, (1997), vol. 187, pages 9 - 18 | - BURTON ET AL., ADVANCES IN IMMUNOLOGY, (1994), vol. 57, pages 191 - 280 | - MULLINAX ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1992), vol. 12, no. 6, pages 864 - 869 | - SAWAI ET AL., AJRI, (1995), vol. 34, pages 26 - 34 | - BETTER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, pages 1041 - 1043 | - HUSTON ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1991), vol. 203, pages 46 - 88 | - SHU ET AL., PNAS, (1993), vol. 90, pages 7995 - 7999 | - SKERRA ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, pages 1038 - 1040 | - MORRISON, SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, page 1202 | - OI ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1986), vol. 4, page 214 | - GILLIES ET AL., J. HRUNUNOL. METHODS, (1989), vol. 125, pages 191 - 202 | - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, page 323 | - PADLAN, MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 28, no. 4/5, pages 489 - 498 | - STUDNICKA ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1994), vol. 7, no. 6, pages 805 - 814 | - ROGUSKA ET AL., PNAS, (1994), vol. 91, pages 969 - 973 | - LONBERG; HUSZAR, INT. REV. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 13, pages 65 - 93 | - JESPERS ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 12, pages 899 - 903 | - KUTMEIER ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1994), vol. 17, page 242 | - CHOTHIA ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1998), vol. 278, pages 457 - 479 | - MORRISON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1984), vol. 81, pages 851 - 855 | - NEUBERGER ET AL., NATURE, (1984), vol. 312, pages 604 - 608 | - TAKEDA ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 314, pages 452 - 454 | - BIRD, SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 423 - 42 | - HUSTON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883 | - WARD ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 334, pages 544 - 54 | - SKERRA ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 1038 - 1041 | - FOECKING ET AL., GENE, (1986), vol. 45, page 101 | - COCKETT ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 8, page 2 | - RUTHER ET AL., EMBO J., (1983), vol. 2, page 1791 | - INOUYE; INOUYE, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1985), vol. 13, pages 3101 - 3109 | - VAN HEEKE; SCHUSTER, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1989), vol. 24, pages 5503 - 5509 | - LOGAN; SHENK, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 355 - 359 | - BITTNER ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 153, pages 51 - 544 | - WIGLER ET AL., CELL, (1977), vol. 11, page 223 | - SZYBALSKA; SZYBALSKI, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 48, page 202 | - LOWY ET AL., CELL, (1980), vol. 22, page 817 | - WIGLER ET AL., NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, page 357 | - O'HARE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1981), vol. 78, page 1527 | - MULLIGAN; BERG, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1981), vol. 78, page 2072 | - CLINICAL PHARMACY, vol. 12, pages 488 - 505 | - WU; WU, BIOTHERAPY, (1991), vol. 3, pages 87 - 95 | - TOLSTOSHEV, ANN. REV. PHARMACOL. TOXICOL., (1993), vol. 32, pages 573 - 596 | - MULLIGAN, SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 260, pages 926 - 932 | - MORGAN.; ANDERSON, ANN. REV. BIOCHEM., (1993), vol. 62, pages 191 - 217 | - TIB TECH, (199305), vol. 11, no. 5, pages 155 - 215 | - SANTERRE ET AL., GENE, (1984), vol. 30, page 147 | - COLBERRE-GARAPIN ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1981), vol. 150, page 1 | - DNA cloning, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1987), vol. 3 | - CROUSE ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1983), vol. 3, page 257 | - BEBBINGTON ET AL., BIOLTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, page 169 | - BIBLIA; ROBINSON, BIOTECHNOL. PROG., (1995), vol. 11 | - PROUDFOOT, NATURE, (1986), vol. 322, page 52 | - KOHLER, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, page 2197 | - GENTZ ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 821 - 824 | - WILSON ET AL., CELL, (1984), vol. 37, page 767 | - TAKAHASHI ET AL., INT. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 6, pages 1567 - 1574 | - "Monoclonal Antibodies For Immunotargeting Of Drugs In Cancer Therapy", AMON ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies And Cancer Therapy, ALAN R. LISS, INC., (1985), pages 243 - 56 | - "Antibodies For Drug Delivery", HELLSTROM ET AL., Controlled Drug Delivery (2nd Ed.),, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1987), pages 623 - 53 | - "Antibody Carriers Of Cytotoxic Agents In Cancer Therapy: A Review", THORPE ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies '84: Biological And Clinical Applications, (1985), pages 475 - 506 | - "Analysis, Results, And Future Prospective Of The Therapeutic Use Of Radiolabeled Antibody In Cancer Therapy", Monoclonal Antibodies For Cancer Detection And Therapy, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1985), pages 303 - 16 | - "The Preparation And Cytotoxic Properties Of Antibody-Toxin ' Conjugates", THORPE ET AL., Immunol. Rev., (1982), vol. 62, pages 119 - 58 | - MORRISON ET AL., CELL, (1999), vol. 96, pages 737 - 49 | - HOUGHTEN, BIO/TECHNIQUES, (1992), vol. 13, pages 412 - 421 | - CWIRLA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 6378 - 6382 | - WU; WU, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 262, pages 4429 - 4432 | - LANGER, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 1527 - 1533 | - TREAT ET AL., Liposomes in the Therapy of Infectious Disease and Cancer, LISS, (1989), pages 353 - 365 | - SEFTON, CRC CRIT. REF. BIOMED. ENG., (1987), vol. 14, page 201 | - BUCHWALD ET AL., SURGERY, (1980), vol. 88, page 507 | - SAUDEK ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (1989), vol. 321, page 574 | - RANGER; PEPPAS, J., MACROMOL. SCI. REV. MACROMOL. CHEM., (1983), vol. 23, page 61 | - LEVY ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 228, page 190 | - DURING ET AL., ANN. NEUROL., (1989), vol. 25, page 351 | - HOWARD ET AL., J.NEUROSURG., (1989), vol. 71, page 105 | - GOODSON, MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (1984), vol. 2, pages 115 - 138 | - JOLIOT ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 1864 - 1868 | - JALKANEN ET AL., J. CELL. BIOL., (1985), vol. 101, pages 976 - 985 | - JALKANEN ET AL., J. CELL . BIOL., (1987), vol. 105, pages 3087 - 3096 | - POZNANSKY ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1988), vol. 239, page 18 | - SLEEP ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 8, pages 42 - 46 | - KERRY-WILLIAMS ET AL., YEAST, (1998), vol. 14, pages 161 - 169 | - BECKER; GUARENTE, METHODS ENZYMOL., (1990), vol. 194, page 182 | - DOMINIK MUMBURG; ROLF MULLER; MARTIN FUNK, NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 22, no. 25, pages 5767 - 5768 | - SAILD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 487 - 491 | - MAUNDRELL, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1990), vol. 265, pages 10857 - 10864 | - HOFFMAN; WINSTON, GENETICS, (1990), vol. 124, pages 807 - 816 | - GLEESON ET AL., J. GEN. MICROBIOL., (1986), vol. 132, pages 3459 - 3465 | - ROBINSON, "11", BIOTECHNOL. PROG., (1995), page 1 | - KOLLER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 8932 - 8935 | - ZIJLSTRA ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 342, pages 435 - 438 | - ELLIS, S.B. ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1985), vol. 5, pages 1111 - 21 | - KOUTZ, P.J ET AL., YEAST, (1989), vol. 5, pages 167 - 77 | - TSCHOPP, J.F. ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1987), vol. 15, pages 3859 - 76 | - HUNKAPILLER ET AL., NATURE, (1984), vol. 310, pages 105 - 111 | - DENARDO ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES., (1998), vol. 4, no. 10, pages 2483 - 90 | - PETERSON ET AL., BIOCONJUG. CHEM., (1999), vol. 10, no. 4, pages 553 - 7 | - ZIMMERMAN ET AL., NUCL. MED. BIOL., (1999), vol. 26, no. 8, pages 943 - 50 | - SEIFTER ET AL., MEM. ENZYMOL., (1990), vol. 182, pages 626 - 646 | - MORPURGO ET AL., APPL. BIOCHEM. BIOTECHNOL., (1996), vol. 56, pages 59 - 72 | - VOROBJEV ET AL., NUCLEOSIDES NUCLEOTIDES, (1999), vol. 18, pages 2745 - 2750 | - CALICETI ET AL., BIOCONJUG. CHEM., (1999), vol. 10, pages 638 - 646 | - MALIK ET AL., EXP. HEMATOL., (1992), vol. 20, pages 1028 - 1035 | - DELGADO ET AL., CRIT. REV. THERA. DRUG CARRIER SYS., (1992), vol. 9, pages 249 - 304 | - FRANCIS ET AL., INTEM. J. OF HEMATOL., (1998), vol. 68, pages 1 - 18 | - HSU ET AL., J. HISTOCHEM. CYTOCHEM., (1981), vol. 29, pages 577 - 580 | - JALKANEN ET AL., J. CELL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 105, pages 3087 - 3096 | - CHOMCZYNSKI; SACCHI, ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1987), vol. 162, pages 156 - 159 | - JALKANEN, M. ET AL., J. CELL . BIOL., (1987), vol. 105, pages 3087 - 3096 | - "The Enzyme Linked Immunosorbent Assay (ELISA)", VOLLER, A., Diagnostic Horizons, MICROBIOLOGICAL ASSOCIATES QUARTERLY PUBLICATION, (1978), vol. 2, pages 1 - 7 | - VOLLER ET AL., J. CLIN. PATHOL., (1978), vol. 31, pages 507 - 520 | - BUTLER, J.E., METH. ENZYMOL., (1981), vol. 73, pages 482 - 523 | - "Bifunctional Chelating Agents for Radiometal-labeled monoclonal Antibodies", SUBRAMANIAN, R.; MEARES, C.F., Cancer Imaging with Radiolabeled Antibodies, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLICATIONS | - SAJI, H., "Targeted delivery of radiolabeled imaging and therapeutic agents: bifunctional radiopharmaceuticals", CRIT. REV. THER. DRUG CARRIER SYST., (1999), vol. 16, pages 209 - 244 | - SRIVASTAVA S.C.; MEASE R.C., "Progress in research on ligands, nuclides and techniques for labeling monoclonal antibodies", INT. J RAD. APPL. INSTRUM. B, (1991), vol. 18, pages 589 - 603 | - LIU, S.; EDWARDS, D.S., "Bifunctional chelators for therapeutic lanthanide radiopharmaceuticals", BIOCONJUG. CHEM., (2001), vol. 12, pages 7 - 34 | - DENARDO ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (1998), vol. 4, no. 10, pages 2483 - 90 | - M. MOI ET AL., J AMER. CHEM. SOC., (1989), vol. 49, page 2639 | - S. V. DESHPANDE ET AL., J NUCL. MED., (1990), vol. 31, page 473 | - G. RUSER ET AL., BIOCONJ. CHEM., (1990), vol. 1, page 345 | - C. J. BROAN ET AL., J. C. S. CHEM. COMM., (1990), vol. 23, page 1739 | - C. J. ANDERSON ET AL., J NUCL. MED., (1995), vol. 36, page 850 | - OHMONO ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1992), vol. 35, pages 157 - 162 | - KUNG ET AL., J NUCL..MED., (1984), vol. 25, pages 326 - 332 | - JURISSON ET AL., CHEM. REV., (1993), vol. 93, pages 1137 - 1156 | - MULLINS ET AL., HYPERTENSION, (1993), vol. 22, no. 4, pages 630 - 633 | - BRENIN ET AL., SURG. ONCOL., (1997), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 99 - 110 | - CLUTTER ET AL., GENETICS, (1996), vol. 143, no. 4, pages 1753 - 1760 | - MCCARTHY, THE LANCET, (1997), vol. 349, no. 9049, page 405 | - KIM ET AL., MOL. REPROD. DEV., (1997), vol. 46, no. 4, pages 515 - 526 | - HOUDCBINE, REPROD. NUTR. DEV., (1995), vol. 35, no. 6, pages 609 - 617 | - PETTERS, REPROD. FERTIL. DEV., (1994), vol. 6, no. 5, pages 643 - 645 | - SCHNIEKE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 278, no. 5346, pages 2130 - 2133 | - AMOAH, J. ANIMAL SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 75, no. 2, pages 578 - 585 | - DITULLIO, BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 74 - 77 | - CLARK ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1989), vol. 7, pages 487 - 492 | - GORTON ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1987), vol. 5, pages 1183 - 1187 | - SOULIER ET AL., FEBS LETTS., (1992), vol. 297, page 13 | - WU AND GROSSMAN, Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1987), vol. 153 | - GONDA, CRITICAL REVIEWS IN THERAPEUTIC DRUG CARRIER SYSTEMS, (1990), vol. 6, pages 273 - 313 | - RAEBURN ET AL., PHARMACOL. TOXICOL. METHODS, (1992), vol. 27, pages 143 - 159 | - SIDMAN ET AL., BIOPOLYMERS, (1983), vol. 22, pages 547 - 556 | - LANGER ET AL., J. BIOMED. MATER. RES., (1981), vol. 15, pages 167 - 277 | - LANGER, CHEM. TECH., (1982), vol. 12, pages 98 - 105 | - TREAT ET AL., Liposomes in the Therapy of Infectious Disease and Cancer, LISS, (1989), pages 317 - 327,353- | - EPSTEIN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. (USA), (1985), vol. 82, pages 3688 - 3692 | - HWANG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI.(USA), (1980), vol. 77, pages 4030 - 4034 | - YANG ET AL., PNAS, (1997), vol. 94, pages 11567 - 72 | - CHEN ET AL., NAT. MED., (1997), vol. 3, pages 1110 - 16 | - DUDLEY ET AL., SCIENCE EXPRESS, (20020919), URL: www.scienceexpress.org | - MURATA ET AL., CANCER RES., (1991), vol. 51, pages 22 - 26 | - PAVLOFF ET AL., J. BIO. CHEM., (1992), vol. 267, pages 17321 - 17326 | - TOMKINSON ET AL., BIOCHEM J., (1992), vol. 286, pages 475 - 480 | - INGBER ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 348, pages 555 - 557 | - MATSUBARA; ZIFF, J. CLIN. INVEST., (1987), vol. 79, pages 1440 - 1446 | - HOLMES ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 262, no. 4, pages 1659 - 1664 | - TAKEUCHI ET AL., AGENTS ACTIONS, (1992), vol. 36, pages 312 - 316 | - H. BREM; J. FOLLANAN, J PEDIATR. SURG., (1993), vol. 28, pages 445 - 51 | - C. STORGARD ET AL., J CLIN. INVEST., (1999), vol. 103, pages 47 - 54 | - HAUSER ET AL., GROWTH FACTORS, (1993), vol. 4, pages 259 - 268 | - BERKNER ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1988), vol. 6, page 616 | - ROSENFELD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 252, pages 431 - 434 | - ROSENFELD ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 68, pages 143 - 155 | - HAJ-AHMAND ET AL., J. VIROL., (1986), vol. 57, page 267 | - MIZUNO ET AL., NO SHINKEI GEKA, (1992), vol. 20, pages 547 - 5 5 1 | - CHEN ET AL., PNAS, (1994), vol. 91, pages 3 054 - 3 05 7 | - BELLDEGRUN, A. ET AL., J. NATL. CANCER INST., (1993), vol. 85, pages 207 - 216 | - FERRANTINI, M. ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 53, pages 1107 - 1112 | - FERRANTINI, M. ET AL., J. IMMUNOLOGY, (1994), vol. 153, pages 4604 - 4615 | - KAIDO, T. ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (1995), vol. 60, pages 221 - 229 | - OGURA, H. ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1990), vol. 50, pages 5102 - 5106 | - SANTODONATO, L. ET AL., HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1996), vol. 7, pages 1 - 10 | - SANTODONATO, L. ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (1997), vol. 4, pages 1246 - 1255 | - ZHANG, J.-F. ET AL., CANCER GENE THERAPY, (1996), vol. 3, pages 31 - 38 | - FELGNER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 7413 - 7416 | - MALONE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 6077 - 6081 | - DEBS ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1990), vol. 265, pages 10189 - 10192 | - FELGNER ET AL., PROC. NATL ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 7413 - 7416 | - P. FELGNER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, vol. 84, pages 7413 - 7417 | - STRAUBINGER ET AL., METHODS OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1983), vol. 101, pages 512 - 527 | - PAPAHADJOPOULOS ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1975), vol. 394, page 483 | - WILSON ET AL., CELL, (1979), vol. 17, page 77 | - DEAMER, D.; BANGHAM, A., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1976), vol. 443, page 629 | - OSTRO ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1977), vol. 76, page 836 | - FRALEY ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1979), vol. 76, page 3348 | - ENOCH, H.; STRITTMATTER, P., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1979), vol. 76, page 145 | - FRALEY ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1980), vol. 255, page 10431 | - SZOKA, F.; PAPAHADJOPOULOS, D., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1978), vol. 75, page 145 | - SCHAEFER-RIDDER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1982), vol. 215, page 166 | - MILLER, HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1990), vol. 1, pages 5 - 14 | - SCHWARTZ ET AL., AM. REV. RESPIR. DIS., (1974), vol. 109, pages 233 - 238 | - ROSENFELD, M. A. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 252, pages 431 - 434 | - GREEN, M. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1979), vol. 76, page 6606 | - KOZARSKY; WILSON, CURR. OPIN. GENET. DEVEL., (1993), vol. 3, pages 499 - 503 | - ENGELHARDT ET AL., HUMAN GENET. THER., (1993), vol. 4, pages 759 - 769 | - YANG ET AL., NATURE GENET., (1994), vol. 7, pages 362 - 369 | - WILSON ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 365, pages 691 - 692 | - MUZYCZKA, N., CURR. TOPICS IN MICROBIOL. IMMUNE!., (1992), vol. 158, page 97 | - KANEDA ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 243, page 375 | - STRIBLING ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 189, pages 11277 - 11281 |