EP2236927 - Device for protecting the gas and oxygen supply to a cutting torch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Van der Plaat, Bastiaan Saturnusstraat 7 2957 HH Nieuw-Lekkerland / NL | [2010/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/40] | Representative(s) | Ferguson, Alexander, et al Octrooibureau Ferguson BV Da Costaplein 3 3818 HE Amersfoort / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/11] | Ferguson, Alexander, et al Octrooibureau Ferguson BV P.O. Box 970 3800 AZ Amersfoort / NL | ||
Former [2010/40] | Reynvaan, Lambertus Johannes Octrooibureau Reynvaan Twintighoevenweg 13 3312 LS Dordrecht / NL | Application number, filing date | 10075136.1 | 26.03.2010 | [2010/40] | Priority number, date | NL20091036796 | 31.03.2009 Original published format: NL 1036796 | [2010/40] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2236927 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F23N5/24, F23D14/42, F23N1/02, B23K7/10, F23K5/00, F23D14/46 | [2010/40] | CPC: |
F23N5/247 (EP);
B23K7/10 (EP);
B23K9/321 (EP);
F23D14/42 (EP);
F23D14/465 (EP);
F23K5/007 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Schutz der Gas- und Sauerstoffzufuhr zu einem Schneidbrenner | [2010/40] | English: | Device for protecting the gas and oxygen supply to a cutting torch | [2010/40] | French: | Dispositif de protection de l'alimentation en gaz et oxygène d'un chalumeau d'oxycoupage | [2010/40] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 01.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/12] | 29.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2028032 (WHITE CHARLES F) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [AD]EP0783931 (PLAAT BASTIAAN V D [NL]) [AD] 1-5 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0783931 |