EP2275221 - Welding device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Van de Ven, Hans Leeuwensteinlaan 23 5261 ES Vught / NL | [2011/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/03] | Representative(s) | Ferguson, Alexander, et al Octrooibureau Ferguson BV Da Costaplein 3 3818 HE Amersfoort / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/11] | Ferguson, Alexander, et al Octrooibureau Ferguson BV P.O. Box 970 3800 AZ Amersfoort / NL | ||
Former [2011/03] | Reynvaan, Lambertus Johannes Octrooibureau Reynvaan Twintighoevenweg 13 3312 LS Dordrecht / NL | Application number, filing date | 10075268.2 | 23.06.2010 | [2011/03] | Priority number, date | NL20091037086 | 30.06.2009 Original published format: NL 1037086 | [2011/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2275221 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2275221 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/28, B23K9/32 | [2011/03] | CPC: |
B23K9/285 (EP);
B23K9/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schweißvorrichtung | [2011/03] | English: | Welding device | [2011/03] | French: | Dispositif de soudure | [2011/03] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/25] | 06.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2540978 (REALISA AEROTHERMIQUES ET [FR]) [A] 2,3* page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 14; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5121788 (CAROLLO GLENN M [US]) [Y] 1-4 * column 1, line 43 - line l; figures 1,7 *; | [A]US5248868 (CUSICK III JOSEPH B [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE19520616 (DAIKIN MFG CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * page 5, line 34 - page 6, line 24; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2005016978 (STEIN ALAN E [US], et al) [A] 1-4 | by applicant | NL1027088C |