EP2255845 - Integrated resuscitation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zoll Medical Corporation 269 Mill Road Chelmsford Massachusetts 01824-4105 / US | [2010/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freeman, Gary A. 47 Stearns Street Newton Center, MA 02159 / US | 02 /
Totman, Mark 38 Jefferson Road Winchester, MA 01890 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | 01 /
Freeman, Gary A. 47 Stearns Street Newton Center Massachusetts 02159 / US | ||
02 /
Totman, Mark 38 Jefferson Road Winchester Massachusetts 01890 / US | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2010/48] | Charig, Raymond Julian, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10075438.1 | 30.09.2005 | [2010/48] | Priority number, date | US20040954633 | 30.09.2004 Original published format: US 954633 | [2010/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2255845 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/39, A61H31/00 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
A61N1/39044 (EP,US);
A61B5/02438 (US);
A61B5/0245 (US);
A61B5/1116 (US);
A61B5/1118 (US);
A61B5/14551 (US);
A61B5/346 (US);
A61B5/4836 (EP,US);
A61B5/7282 (US);
A61B7/02 (US);
A61H31/005 (EP,US);
A61H31/007 (EP,US);
A61N1/046 (EP,US);
A61N1/0492 (EP,US);
A61N1/3625 (US);
A61N1/3968 (EP,US);
A61N1/3987 (US);
A61N1/3993 (EP,US);
A61H2031/002 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5007 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5043 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5048 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5061 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5084 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5097 (EP,US);
A61H2230/04 (EP,US);
A61H2230/207 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/48] | Title | German: | Integrierte Reanimation | [2010/48] | English: | Integrated resuscitation | [2010/48] | French: | Reanimation integrée | [2010/48] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/48] | 27.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/47] | 17.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/47] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05256136.2 / EP1642616 | Divisional application(s) | EP17150135.6 / EP3175884 | EP18195117.9 / EP3441112 | EP20170880.7 / EP3702000 | EP21165623.6 / EP3865055 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050256136) is 16.11.2006 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.11.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 27.11.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.12.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3865101 (SAPER LAWRENCE, et al) [A] 2-4,6-8,10 * abstract * * column 3, line 24 - line 45 *; | [A]US5342404 (ALT ECKHARD [DE], et al) [A] 20,21 * abstract * * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 2 * * column 8, line 29 - column 9, line 4 ** column 11, line 10 - column 11, line 24 *; | [A]US2001011159 (CANTRELL ELROY T [US], et al) [A] 13 * abstract * * figure 2 * * paragraph [0039] *; | [X]WO0156652 (ZMD CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,5,11,12 * abstract * * figures 1, 2 * * page 6, line 10 - page 6, line 15 * * page 7, line 4 - page 8, line 23 * * page 10, line 32 - page 11, line 13 *; | [XI]US2003055460 (OWEN JAMES M [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-11,14,15,19 * abstract * * figures 1,2,3,8,13 * * paragraph [0114] - paragraph [0128] * * paragraph [0140] - paragraph [0171] * * paragraph [0187] * [I] 8,12,13,16-18,20,21; | [A]US2004049118 (IDEKER RAYMOND E [US], et al) [A] 16-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0050] * | by applicant | US5330526 | WO9924114 |