EP2298896 - Methods of inhibiting tumor cell proliferation with FOXM1 siRNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the University of Illinois 352 Henry Administration Building 506 South Wright Street Urbana, IL 61801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/12] | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the University of Illionis 352 Henry Administration Building 506 South Wright Street Urbana, IL 61801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Costa, Robert 946 Wisconsin Avenue Oak Park, IL 60304 / US | 02 /
Wang, I-Ching 727 W. Martin Luther King Drive 1005W Cincinnati, OH 45220 / US | [2011/12] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/12] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10075609.7 | 06.01.2005 | [2011/12] | Priority number, date | US20040582141P | 22.06.2004 Original published format: US 582141 P | [2011/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2298896 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, C12N15/86, A61K48/00 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61K48/00 (EP,US);
C12N2310/111 (EP,US);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Inhibierung von Tumorzellwachstum mit FOXM1 siRNS | [2011/12] | English: | Methods of inhibiting tumor cell proliferation with FOXM1 siRNA | [2011/12] | French: | Procédés pour inhiber la prolifération des cellules tumorales avec FOXM1 ARNsi | [2011/12] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 19.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/50] | 26.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/50] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05705076.7 / EP1758999 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050705076) is 09.01.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2004018676 (UNIV BRITISH COLUMBIA [CA], et al) [Y] 8-15 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO2004019761 (UNIV ILLINOIS [US], et al) [AD] 1-15; | [AP]WO2004100977 (UNIV ILLINOIS [US], et al) [AP] 1-15 * page 5, line 6 - line 11 * * page 29, line 8 - line 17; claim 16 *; | [Y] - KALINICHENKO VLADIMIR V ET AL, "Foxm1b transcription factor is essential for development of hepatocellular carcinomas and is negatively regulated by the p19ARF tumor suppressor.", GENES & DEVELOPMENT. 1 APR 2004, (20040401), vol. 18, no. 7, ISSN 0890-9369, pages 830 - 850, XP002338894 [Y] 1-15 * page 832, column L, paragraph 2; figure 9 * * page 843, column R, paragraph 3 * * page 845, column R, paragraph 2 - page 846, column L, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gad.1200704 | [Y] - POTENTE MICHAEL ET AL, "11,12-Epoxyeicosatrienoic acid-induced inhibition of FOXO factors promotes endothelial proliferation by down-regulating p27Kip1.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY. 8 AUG 2003, (20030808), vol. 278, no. 32, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 29619 - 29625, XP002338895 [Y] 1-7 * page 29620, column L, line 3 - line 12; figure 8 * * page 29624, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M305385200 | [A] - ECHEVERRI C. AND BROWN D., "siRNA design: it's all in the algorithm", AMBION TECHNOTES, vol. 11, no. 3, (200405), URL: http://www.ambion.com/techlib/tn/113/14.html, (20050802), XP002338897 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | [A] - BROWN D., "RNAi as a tool for mammalian gene analysis: applications of siRNAs", AMBION TECHNOTES, vol. 10, no. 5, (200310), URL: http://www.ambion.com/techlib/tn/105/14.html, (20050802), XP002338898 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - MILHAVET OLLIVIER ET AL, "RNA interference in biology and medicine.", PHARMACOLOGICAL REVIEWS. DEC 2003, (200312), vol. 55, no. 4, ISSN 0031-6997, pages 629 - 648, XP002338943 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/pr.55.4.1 | [AP] - KATOH M ET AL, "HUMAN FOX GENE FAMILY (REVIEW)", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ONCOLOGY, EDITORIAL ACADEMY OF THE INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ONCOLOGY,, GR, (200411), vol. 25, no. 5, ISSN 1019-6439, pages 1495 - 1500, XP009049979 [AP] 1-15 | [AP] - RYE P D ET AL, "Interfering with cancer: a brief outline of advances in RNA interference in oncology.", TUMOUR BIOLOGY : THE JOURNAL OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR ONCODEVELOPMENTAL BIOLOGY AND MEDICINE. 2004 SEP-DEC, (200409), vol. 25, no. 5-6, ISSN 1010-4283, pages 329 - 336, XP002338899 [AP] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000081403 | by applicant | US3773919 | EP0036676 | EP0058481 | EP0088046 | EP0133988 | EP0143949 | US4945050 | US4970154 | US5151510 | WO9323569 | WO9402595 | US5399346 | WO9534670 | WO9618736 | WO9640958 | US5593875 | US5624803 | US5631236 | US5635399 | US5672344 | US5672510 | US5676954 | US5679559 | WO9905094 | WO9904819 | WO9907409 | US5902880 | WO9931262 | WO9932619 | WO0001846 | WO0044895 | WO0044914 | WO0053722 | US6146886 | WO0129058 | WO0136646 | US6395713 | - LIN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 278, pages 1319 - 1322 | - OGG ET AL., NATURE, (1997), vol. 389, pages 994 - 999 | - PARADIS; RUVKUN, GENES DEV., (1998), vol. 12, pages 2488 - 2498 | - BIGGS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1999), vol. 96, pages 7421 - 7426 | - BRUNET ET AL., CELL, (1999), vol. 96, pages 857 - 68 | - GUO ET AL., J BIOL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 17184 - 17192 | - BARSYTE ET AL., FASEB J., (2001), vol. 15, pages 627 - 634 | - HONDA ET AL., FASEB J., (1999), vol. 13, pages 1385 - 1393 | - WOLKOW ET AL., SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 290, pages 147 - 150 | - LEE ET AL., CURR. BIOL., (2001), vol. 11, pages 1950 - 1957 | - MEDEMA ET AL., NATURE, (2000), vol. 404, pages 782 - 787 | - HOLLENHORST ET AL., GENES DEV., (2001), vol. 15, pages 2445 - 2456 | - KORANDA ET AL., NATURE, (2000), vol. 406, pages 94 - 98 | - KUMAR ET AL., CURR. BIOL., (2000), vol. 10, pages 896 - 906 | - PIC ET AL., EMBO J, (2000), vol. 19, pages 3750 - 3761 | - KORVER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 1715 - 1719 | - KORVER ET AL., GENOMICS, (1997), vol. 46, pages 435 - 442 | - YAO ET AL., J BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, pages 19827 - 19836 | - YE ET AL., MOL. CELL BIOL., (1997), vol. 17, pages 1626 - 1641 | - YAO ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, pages 19827 - 19836 | - YAO ET AL., J BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, pages 19827 - 36 | - YE ET AL., MOL. CELL BIOL, (1997), vol. 17, pages 1626 - 1641 | - TEH ET AL., CANCER RES., (2002), vol. 62, pages 4773 - 80 | - KALINICHENKO ET AL., GENES & DEV., (2004), vol. 18, pages 830 - 850 | - LAPLANCHE ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1986), vol. 14, page 9081 | - STEC ET AL., JAM. CHEM. SOC., (1984), vol. 106, page 6077 | - STEIN ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1988), vol. 16, page 3209 | - ZON ET AL., ANTI-CANCER DRUG DESIGN, (1991), vol. 6, page 539 | - ZON ET AL., OLIGONUCLEOTIDES AND ANALOGUES: A PRACTICAL APPROACH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1991), pages 87 - 108 | - UHLMANN; PEYMAN, CHEMICAL REVIEWS, (1990), vol. 90, page 543 | - BERNOIST; CHAMBON, NATURE, (1981), vol. 290, pages 304 - 10 | - YAMAMOTO ET AL., CELL, (1980), vol. 22, pages 787 - 97 | - WAGNER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1981), vol. 78, pages 1444 - 45 | - BRINSTER ET AL., NATURE, (1982), vol. 296, pages 39 - 42 | - SWIFT ET AL., CELL, (1984), vol. 38, pages 639 - 46 | - ORNITZ ET AL., COLD SPRING HARBOR SYMP. QUANT. BIOL., (1986), vol. 50, pages 399 - 409 | - MACDONALD, HEPATOLOGY, (1987), vol. 7, pages 425 - 515 | - HANAHAN, NATURE, (1985), vol. 315, pages 115 - 22 | - LEDER ET AL., CELL, (1986), vol. 45, pages 485 - 95 | - MOGRAM ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 315, pages 338 - 40 | - KOLLIAS ET AL., CELL, (1986), vol. 46, pages 89 - 94 | - READHEAD ET AL., CELL, (1987), vol. 48, pages 703 - 12 | - SANI, NATURE, (1985), vol. 314, pages 283 - 86 | - MASON ET AL., SCIENCE, (1986), vol. 234, pages 1372 - 78 | - GROSSCHEDL ET AL., CELL, (1984), vol. 38, pages 647 - 58 | - ADAMES ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 318, pages 533 - 38 | - ALEXANDER ET AL., MOL. CELL BIOL., (1987), vol. 7, pages 1436 - 44 | - PINKERT ET AL., GENES AND DEVEL., (1987), vol. 1, pages 268 - 76 | - KRUMLAUF ET AL., MOL. CELL BIOL., (1985), vol. 5, pages 1639 - 48 | - HAMMER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1987), vol. 235, pages 53 - 58 | - KELSEY ET AL., GENES AND DEVEL., (1987), vol. 1, pages 161 - 71 | - GRAHAM ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1973), vol. 52, page 456 | - CHU ET AL., GENE, (1981), vol. 13, page 197 | - BASS, NATURE, (2001), vol. 411, pages 428 - 429 | - ELBASHIR ET AL., NATURE, (2001), vol. 411, pages 494 - 498 | - FIRE ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 391, page 806 | - BERSTEIN ET AL., NATURE, (2001), vol. 409, page 363 | - HUTVAGNER ET AL., SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 293, page 834 | - ELBASHIR ET AL., GENES DEV., (2001), vol. 15, page 188 | - NATURE, (1998), vol. 391, page 806 | - NATURE CELL BIOL., (1999), vol. 2, page 70 | - NATURE, (2000), vol. 404, page 293 | - NATURE, (2001), vol. 411, page 494 | - ELBASHIR ET AL., EMBO J., (2001), vol. 20, page 6877 | - NYKANEN ET AL., CELL, (2001), vol. 107, page 309 | - MARTINEZ ET AL., CELL, (2002), vol. 110, pages 563 - 574 | - SCHWARZ ET AL., MOLECULAR CELL, (2002), vol. 10, pages 537 - 568 | - ELBASHIR ET AL., GENES DEV., (2001), vol. 15, pages 188 - 200 | - NATURE, vol. 411, pages 494 - 498 | - PAUL ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2002), vol. 19, page 505 | - MIYAGISHI; TAIRA, NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2002), vol. 19, page 497 | - LEE ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2002), vol. 19, page 500 | - AKHTAR ET AL., TRENDS CELL BIO., (1992), vol. 2, page 139 | - MAURER ET AL., MOL. MEMBR. BIOL., (1999), vol. 16, pages 129 - 140 | - HOFLAND; HUANG, HANDB. EXP. PHARMACOL., (1999), vol. 137, pages 165 - 192 | - LEE ET AL., ACS SYMP. SER., (2000), vol. 752, pages 184 - 192 | - CONRY ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (1999), vol. 5, pages 2330 - 2337 | - CHUN ET AL., NEUROSCIENCE LETTERS, (1998), vol. 257, pages 135 - 138 | - D'ALDIN ET AL., MOL. BRAIN RESEARCH, (1998), vol. 55, pages 151 - 164 | - DRYDEN ET AL., J. ENDOCRINOL., (1998), vol. 157, pages 169 - 175 | - GHIRNIKAR ET AL., NEUROSCIENCE LETTERS, (1998), vol. 247, pages 21 - 24 | - BROADDUS ET AL., NEUROSURG. FOCUS, (1997), vol. 3, page 4 | - GOLD, NEUROSCIENCE, (1997), vol. 76, pages 1153 - 1158 | - IZANT; WEINTRAUB, SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, page 345 | - MCGARRY; LINDQUIST, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI USA, (1986), vol. 83, page 399 | - SCANLON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 10591 - 5 | - KASHANI-SABET ET AL., ANTISENSE RES. DEV., (1992), vol. 2, pages 3 - 15 | - DROPULIC ET AL., J. VIROL., (1992), vol. 66, pages 1432 - 41 | - WEERASINGHE ET AL., J VIROL., (1991), vol. 65, pages 5531 - 4 | - OJWANG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 10802 - 6 | - CHEN ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1992), vol. 20, pages 4581 - 9 | - SARVER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 247, pages 1222 - 1225 | - THOMPSON ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1995), vol. 23, page 2259 | - GOOD ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (1997), vol. 4, page 45 | - OHKAWA ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS SYMP. SER., (1992), vol. 27, pages 15 - 6 | - TAIRA ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1991), vol. 19, pages 5125 - 30 | - VENTURA ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1993), vol. 21, pages 3249 - 55 | - CHOWRIRA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, page 25856 | - COUTURE ET AL., TIG, (1996), vol. 12, page 510 | - MIYAGISHI; TAIRA, NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2002), vol. 12, page 497 | - ELROY-STEIN; MOSS, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 6743 - 7 | - GAO; HUANG, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1993), vol. 21, pages 2867 - 72 | - LIEBER ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOI., (1993), vol. 217, pages 47 - 66 | - ZHOU ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 10, pages 4529 - 37 | - YU ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6340 - 4 | - L'HUILLIER ET AL., EMBO J, (1992), vol. 11, pages 4411 - 8 | - LISZIEWICZ ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A, (1993), vol. 90, pages 8000 - 4 | - SULLENGER; CECH, SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 262, page 1566 | - NOONBERG ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RES., (1994), vol. 22, page 2830 | - GOOD ET AL., GENE THER., (1997), vol. 4, page 45 | - SIDMAN ET AL., BIOPOLYMERS, (1983), vol. 22, pages 547 - 556 | - LANGER ET AL., J BIOMED. MATER. RES., (1981), vol. 15, pages 167 - 277 | - LANGER, CHEM. TECH., (1982), vol. 12, pages 98 - 105 | - EPPSTEIN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, pages 3688 - 3692 | - HEFTI, NEUROBIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 25, pages 1418 - 35 | - WANG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI USA., (2002), vol. 99, pages 6881 - 16886 | WO1993US00829 | WO1994US01875 | WO1995US07178 |