EP2218333 - Filleting device and method for harvesting fillets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 11.01.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Opposition rejected | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meyn Food Processing Technology B.V. Noordeinde 68 1511 AE Oostzaan / NL | [2010/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
de Vos, Ferdinand Allard p/a Noordeide 68 1511 AE, OOSTZAAN / NL | 02 /
Vonk, Pieter Willem p/a Noordeinde 68 1511 AE, OOSTZAAN / NL | 03 /
Waasdijk, Martinus Casper Melchior Balthasar p/a Noordeinde 68 1511 AE, OOSTZAAN / NL | 04 /
Koopman, Michael George Lourentius p/a Nooreinde 68 1511 AE, OOSTZAAN / NL | [2011/44] |
Former [2010/33] | 01 /
de Vos, Ferdinand Allard p/a Noordeide 68 1511 AE, OOSTZAAN / NL | ||
02 /
Vonk, Pieter Willem p/a Noordeinde 68 1511 AE, OOSTZAAN / NL | |||
03 /
Waasdijk, Martinus Casper Melchior Balthasar p/a Noordeinde 68 1511 AE, OOSTZAAN / NL | |||
04 /
Koopman, Michael George Lourentius p/a Nooreinde 68 1511 AE, OOSTZAAN / NL | Representative(s) | van Breda, Jacobus Octrooibureau Los & Stigter B.V. P.O. Box 20052 1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | Van Breda, Jacobus Octrooibureau Los & Stigter B.V., Weteringschans 96 1017 XS Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2010/33] | Van Breda, Jacobus Octrooibureau Los & Stigter B.V., Weteringschans 96 1017 XS Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 10150056.9 | 04.01.2010 | [2010/33] | Priority number, date | NL20092002524 | 13.02.2009 Original published format: NL 2002524 | NL20091036646 | 27.02.2009 Original published format: NL 1036646 | [2010/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2218333 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2218333 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A22C21/00 | [2010/33] | CPC: |
A22C21/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/33] | Title | German: | Filetiervorrichtung und Verfahren zur Entfernung von Fileten | [2010/33] | English: | Filleting device and method for harvesting fillets | [2010/33] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour enlever des filets | [2010/33] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 01.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.07.2012
27.08.2012
ADMISSIBLE Marel Stork Poultry Processing B.V. Handelstraat 3 5831 AV Boxmeer / NL Opponent's representative Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V., et al, et al P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [2013/45] |
Former [2012/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.07.2012
Marel Stork Poultry Processing B.V. Handelstraat 3 5831 AV Boxmeer / NL Opponent's representative Janssen, Francis-Paul AOMB P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | 10.09.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.10.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.02.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.03.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 24.03.2014 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 08.08.2018 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2019/07] | Appeal following opposition | 22.05.2014 | Appeal received No. T1186/14 | 21.07.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.08.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 08.08.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.08.2018 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.01.2010 | AT | 02.11.2011 | BE | 02.11.2011 | CY | 02.11.2011 | CZ | 02.11.2011 | EE | 02.11.2011 | FI | 02.11.2011 | HR | 02.11.2011 | IT | 02.11.2011 | LT | 02.11.2011 | LV | 02.11.2011 | MK | 02.11.2011 | MT | 02.11.2011 | PL | 02.11.2011 | RO | 02.11.2011 | SE | 02.11.2011 | SI | 02.11.2011 | SK | 02.11.2011 | SM | 02.11.2011 | TR | 02.11.2011 | IE | 04.01.2012 | LU | 04.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | BG | 02.02.2012 | NO | 02.02.2012 | GR | 03.02.2012 | ES | 13.02.2012 | IS | 02.03.2012 | PT | 02.03.2012 | CH | 31.01.2014 | LI | 31.01.2014 | [2014/46] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 04.01.2010 | |
AT | 02.11.2011 | ||
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MK | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
SM | 02.11.2011 | ||
TR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 04.01.2012 | ||
LU | 04.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MK | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
SM | 02.11.2011 | ||
TR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 04.01.2012 | ||
LU | 04.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MK | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
TR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 04.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MK | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 04.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MK | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 04.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
NO | 02.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4682386 (HAZENBROEK JACOBUS E [NL], et al) [A] 1,2,7,13,16 * column 6, line 15 - column 7, line 48; figures 1,7,8 *; | [A]DE4105564 (NORDISCHER MASCHINENBAU [DE]) [A] 1,13 * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 59; figure 1 *; | [A]US5269722 (DIESING KARL-HEINZ [DE], et al) [A] 1,13 * column 4, lines 22-58; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0591741 (NORDISCHER MASCHINENBAU [DE]) [A] 1,13 * the whole document *; | [AD]US5372539 (KUNIG HELMUT [DE], et al) [AD] 1-4,7,12-14,16 * column 1, lines 28-47 * * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 61 * * column 5, line 38 - column 7, line 3 * * column 5, lines 13-33; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0695506 (STORK PMT [NL]) [A] 1,13* figures 5-8; claims 2,3,15,16 *; | [A]EP1346639 (STORK PMT [NL]) [A] 1,13 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044]; figures 10-17 *; | [AD]EP1454531 (MEYN FOOD PROC TECHNOLOGY BV [NL]) [AD] 1,13 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0063]; figures 2-10 * | by applicant | US5372539 | EP1454531 |