EP2343646 - Method and device for displaying context-dependent metadata in information systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states dmi AG Direct Management Institute Holzstrasse 39 9001 St.Gallen / CH | For all designated states Hüner, Kai Müller-Friedberg-Strasse 8 9000 St. Gallen / CH | For all designated states Österle, Hubert Müller-Friedberg-Strasse 8 9000 St. Gallen / CH | For all designated states Ofner, Martin Müller-Friedeberg-Strasse 8 9000 St. Gallen / CH | For all designated states Otto, Boris Müller-Friedberg-Strasse 8 9000 St. Gallen / CH | [2011/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hüner, Kai University of St. Gallen Institute of Information Management Müller-Friedberg-Str. 8 9000, St. Gallen / CH | 02 /
Österle, Hubert University of St. Gallen Institute of Information Management Müller-Friedberg-Str. 8 9000, St. Gallen / CH | 03 /
Ofner, Martin University of St. Gallen Institute of Information Management Müller-Friedberg-Str. 8 9000, St. Gallen / CH | 04 /
Otto, Boris University of St. Gallen Institute of Information Management Müller-Friedberg-Str. 8 9000, St. Gallen / CH | [2011/28] | Representative(s) | OK pat AG Industriestrasse 47 6300 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/28] | OK pat AG Chamerstrasse 50 6300 Zug / CH | Application number, filing date | 10150185.6 | 06.01.2010 | [2011/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2343646 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44 | [2011/28] | CPC: |
G06F9/453 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Anzeige kontextabhängiger Metadaten in Informationssystemen | [2011/28] | English: | Method and device for displaying context-dependent metadata in information systems | [2011/28] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'affichage de métadonnées dépendantes du contexte dans des systèmes d'informations | [2011/28] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/29] | 22.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5436637 (GAYRAUD CHARLES E [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 11, lines 17-30 * * column 12, lines 22-61 *; | [X]US6219047 (BELL JOHN [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 37 - column 5, line 30 * |