EP2345892 - Smart sensor system using an electroactive polymer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Université Catholique de Louvain Cellule de Liaison Recherche Et Developpement Place de l'Université 1 1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | [2011/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yunus, Sami 4, rue Artoisenet 5000, NAMUR / BE | 02 /
Bertand, Patrick Rue de la Citronnelle, 79 1348, LOUVAIN LA NEUVE / BE | 03 /
Attout, Anne 221, rue E. Vandervelde 6220, FLEURUS / BE | [2011/29] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/29] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10150280.5 | 07.01.2010 | [2011/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2345892 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/333, G01N27/416 | [2011/29] | CPC: |
G01N27/4167 (EP,US);
G01N27/4161 (US);
G01N27/3335 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Intelligentes Sensorsystem mit einem elektroaktiven Polymer | [2011/29] | English: | Smart sensor system using an electroactive polymer | [2011/29] | French: | Système capteur intelligent utilisant un polymère électroactif | [2011/29] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/33] | 07.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002070128 (BECKMANN UDO [DE]) [A] 1-9 * column 2, lines 61-63 * * column 4, lines 16-54 *; | [A]US2004182719 (PURVIS DUNCAN ROSS [GB], et al) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [A] - B. LAKARD, O.SEGUT, S. LAKARD, G. HERLEM T. GHARBI, "Potentiometric miniaturized pH sensors based on polypyrrole films", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B, (20060621), vol. 122, pages 101 - 108, XP002581266 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.SNB.2006.04.112 | [A] - CUI GANG ET AL., "Potentiometric pCO2 sensor using polyaniline-coated pH-sensitive electrodes", THE ANALYST, (1998), vol. 123, pages 1855 - 1859, XP002581267 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - JIN Y ET AL, "Reliable Remote-Monitoring Electrochemical Potentiostat for Glucose Measurements", TSINGHUA SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, TSINGHUA UNIVERSITY PRESS, BEIJING, CN LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S1007-0214(09)70122-1, vol. 14, no. 5, ISSN 1007-0214, (20091001), pages 593 - 600, (20090929), XP026666043 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1007-0214(09)70122-1 | [A] - C.-Y. HUANG ET AL., "Design of a portable potentiostat for electrochemical sensors", ISSNIP-IEEE, (2004), pages 331 - 336, XP002581268 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - S. YUNUS, A. ATTOUT, P. BERTRAND, "Controlled aniline polymerization strategies for polyaniline micro- and nano self-assembling into practical electronicdevices", LANGMUIR, (20090601), vol. 25, pages 1851 - 1854, XP002581269 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/LA803034Q |