EP2224367 - Content management apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2010/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujimoto, Shingo c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Matsui, Kazuki c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2010/35] | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 10150535.2 | 12.01.2010 | [2010/35] | Priority number, date | JP20090042744 | 25.02.2009 Original published format: JP 2009042744 | [2010/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2224367 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/00 | [2010/35] | CPC: |
H04L63/10 (EP,US);
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
G06F21/88 (EP,US);
H04L63/0823 (EP,US);
H04L67/06 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2141 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Inhaltsverwaltungsvorrichtung | [2010/35] | English: | Content management apparatus | [2010/35] | French: | Appareil de gestion de contenu | [2010/35] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 18.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/37] | 21.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.12.2011 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 28.03.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 28.03.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.04.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008163336 (FENG WENJIE [CN], et al) [X] 1,4,6 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0069] *[I] 2,3,5,7,8 | by applicant | JP2006318134 |