EP2214418 - Microphone unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1, Nakagaito 7-chome Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | [2010/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoda, Takeshi c/o Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1, Nakagaito 7-chome Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | 02 /
Horibe, Ryusuke c/o Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1, Nakagaito 7-chome Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | 03 /
Tanaka, Fuminori c/o Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1, Nakagaito 7-chome Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | [2010/31] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/31] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10150594.9 | 13.01.2010 | [2010/31] | Priority number, date | JP20090016948 | 28.01.2009 Original published format: JP 2009016948 | [2010/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2214418 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2214418 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/38, // H04R1/08 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
H04R1/38 (EP,US);
G02C5/001 (KR);
G02C7/16 (KR);
H04N2213/008 (KR);
H04R1/083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Mikrofoneinheit | [2010/31] | English: | Microphone unit | [2010/31] | French: | Unité de microphone | [2010/31] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/18] | 28.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/33] | 07.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.10.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE4229450 (HAGENUK TELECOM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 * * column 3, lines 11-49 * [I] 3-7; | [XI]EP0493361 (AKG AKUSTISCHE KINO GERAETE [AT]) [X] 1 * figure 1 * * page 3, line 50 - page 4, line 30 * [I] 3-7; | [XI]WO0049789 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 1A * * page 4, line 32 - page 5, line 4 * [I] 3-7; | [A]CN101247669 (GOER ACOUSTICS CO LTD [CN]) [A] 5-7 * abstract * * figure 1 * | by applicant | JP2008048329 | JP2008219238 | JP3601900B | JP20090016948 |