EP2345766 - Waste liquid tank [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uponor Infra Oy Äyritie 20 01510 Vantaa / FI | [2015/24] |
Former [2013/04] | For all designated states Uponor Innovation AB P.O. Box 101 73061 Virsbo / SE | ||
Former [2011/29] | For all designated states Uponor Innovation Ab Virsbo Industriomräde 73061 Virsbo / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Päivinen, Niko Mukkulankatu 4 A 13 15210, Lahti / FI | 02 /
Tast, Niila Puolakantie 1 15270, Kukkila / FI | [2017/30] |
Former [2011/29] | 01 /
Päivinen, Niko Mukkulankatu 4 A 13 15210, Lahti / FI | ||
02 /
Tast, Niila Puolakantie 1 15270, Kukkila / FI | Representative(s) | Papula Oy P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2013/30] |
Former [2011/29] | Huhtanen, Ossi Jaakko Kolster Oy AB, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 10150634.3 | 13.01.2010 | [2011/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2345766 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2345766 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01D17/00, E03F5/22, E03F11/00, // C02F3/12 | [2017/13] | CPC: |
E03F11/00 (EP);
B01D17/00 (EP);
E03F5/22 (EP);
C02F3/1242 (EP);
Y02W10/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/29] | E03F5/22, E03F11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] |
Former [2011/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Abwassertank | [2011/29] | English: | Waste liquid tank | [2011/29] | French: | Réservoir de déchets liquides | [2011/29] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/09] | 03.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.01.2010 | AT | 26.07.2017 | CY | 26.07.2017 | CZ | 26.07.2017 | EE | 26.07.2017 | ES | 26.07.2017 | HR | 26.07.2017 | IT | 26.07.2017 | LT | 26.07.2017 | LV | 26.07.2017 | MC | 26.07.2017 | MK | 26.07.2017 | NL | 26.07.2017 | PL | 26.07.2017 | PT | 26.07.2017 | RO | 26.07.2017 | SI | 26.07.2017 | SK | 26.07.2017 | SM | 26.07.2017 | TR | 26.07.2017 | BG | 26.10.2017 | GR | 27.10.2017 | IS | 26.11.2017 | GB | 13.01.2018 | IE | 13.01.2018 | LU | 13.01.2018 | MT | 13.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | FR | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 13.01.2010 | |
AT | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PT | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
GB | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 13.01.2018 | ||
MT | 13.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
GB | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 13.01.2018 | ||
MT | 13.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
GB | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 13.01.2018 | ||
MT | 13.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
GB | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 13.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
GB | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 13.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
GB | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 13.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
GB | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 13.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
LU | 13.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
LU | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | LT | 26.07.2017 | |
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 26.07.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2317170 (BALMORAL GROUP [GB]) [X] 1-4 * page 1, line 13 - page 2, line 19 * * figure - *; | [XA]EP2085326 (GRAF PLASTICS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0033] - [0036] * * figure 7 * [A] 2-4; | [XA]US6328890 (THIBAULT RONALD M [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, lines 2-6, 23-25 * * column 4, line 33 - column 6, line 8 * * figures 1-3, 6 * [A] 2-4; | [AD]EP1449812 (UPONOR INNOVATION AB [SE]) [AD] 1 | by applicant | EP1449812 |