EP2208452 - Device for foaming a mixture of air, steam and milk, in particular a milk foamer for a coffee machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2010/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneiderbauer, Gottfried Itsching, 24 84553 Halsbach / DE | [2012/51] |
Former [2010/29] | 01 /
Schneiderbauer, Gottfried Itsching 24 84553, Halsbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 10150778.8 | 14.01.2010 | [2010/29] | Priority number, date | DE20091000309 | 20.01.2009 Original published format: DE102009000309 | [2010/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2208452 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2208452 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/60, A47J31/44, A47J31/46 | [2010/29] | CPC: |
A47J31/4485 (EP);
A47J31/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/29] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Aufschäumen einer Mischung aus Luft, Dampf und Milch, insbesondere ein Milchaufschäumer für einen Kaffeeautomaten | [2010/29] | English: | Device for foaming a mixture of air, steam and milk, in particular a milk foamer for a coffee machine | [2010/29] | French: | Dispositif de moussage d'un mélange composé d'air, de vapeur et de lait, notamment un mousseur à lait pour un automate à café | [2010/29] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/09] | 10.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.01.2010 | CY | 17.04.2013 | CZ | 17.04.2013 | DK | 17.04.2013 | EE | 17.04.2013 | FI | 17.04.2013 | HR | 17.04.2013 | IT | 17.04.2013 | LT | 17.04.2013 | LV | 17.04.2013 | MC | 17.04.2013 | MK | 17.04.2013 | MT | 17.04.2013 | NL | 17.04.2013 | PL | 17.04.2013 | RO | 17.04.2013 | SE | 17.04.2013 | SI | 17.04.2013 | SK | 17.04.2013 | SM | 17.04.2013 | TR | 17.04.2013 | BG | 17.07.2013 | NO | 17.07.2013 | GR | 18.07.2013 | ES | 28.07.2013 | IS | 17.08.2013 | PT | 19.08.2013 | GB | 14.01.2014 | IE | 14.01.2014 | LU | 14.01.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 14.01.2010 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
MT | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
SM | 17.04.2013 | ||
TR | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
GB | 14.01.2014 | ||
IE | 14.01.2014 | ||
LU | 14.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 14.01.2010 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
MT | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
SM | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
GB | 14.01.2014 | ||
IE | 14.01.2014 | ||
LU | 14.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
MT | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
SM | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
GB | 14.01.2014 | ||
IE | 14.01.2014 | ||
LU | 14.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
MT | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
GB | 14.01.2014 | ||
IE | 14.01.2014 | ||
LU | 14.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
GB | 14.01.2014 | ||
IE | 14.01.2014 | ||
LU | 14.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
GB | 14.01.2014 | ||
LU | 14.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
LU | 14.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 17.04.2013 | |
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 17.04.2013 | |
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 17.04.2013 | |
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 17.04.2013 | |
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 17.04.2013 | |
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP2025268 (GRUPPO CIMBALI SPA [IT]) [XP] 1-8 * column 25 - column 39; figures 2-4 *; | [A]EP1656863 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [A] 1-8 * figures 2,6-8 * |