EP2199384 - A porous membrane device that promotes the differentiation of monocytes into dendritic cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2012 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi Pasteur VaxDesign Corporation 2501 Discovery Drive, Suite 300 Orlando, FL 32826 / US | [2011/43] |
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states VaxDesign Corporation 12612 Challenger Parkway, Suite 365 Orlando, FL 32826 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drake, Donald III 919 Golfview Street Orlando FL 32804 / US | 02 /
Moe, David 5310 Locksley Avenue Orlando FL 32810 / US | 03 /
Li, Conan 780 Saratoga Avenue, Apt. S-307 San Jose CA 95129 / US | 04 /
Fahlenkamp, Heather RR3 Box 85-2 Cleveland, Oklahoma 74020 / US | 05 /
Sanchez-Schmitz, Guzman 12073 Fountain Brook Blvd., Apt. 1446 Orlando FL 32825 / US | 06 /
Higbee, Russell 9321 Buttonwood Street Orlando FL 32825 / US | 07 /
Parkhill, Robert 1824 Anna Catherine Drive Orlando FL 32828 / US | 08 /
Warren, William, L. 13632 Payton's Way Orlando FL 32828 / US | [2011/44] |
Former [2010/33] | 01 /
Drake, Donald III 919 Golfview Street Orlando FL 32804 / US | ||
02 /
Moe, David 5310 Locksley Avenue Orlando FL 32810 / US | |||
03 /
Li, Conan 780 Saratoga Avenue, Apt. S-307 San Jose CA 95129 / US | |||
04 /
Fahlenkamp, Heather RR3 Box 85-2 Cleveland, Oklahoma 74020 / US | |||
05 /
Sanchez-Schmitz, Guzman 12073 Fountain Brook Blvd., Apt. 1446 Orlando FL 32825 / US | |||
06 /
Higbee, Russell 9321 Buttonwood Street Orlando FL 32825 / US | |||
07 /
Parkhill, Robert 1824 Anna Catherine Drive Orlando FL 32828 / US | |||
08 /
Warren, William, L. 13632 Payton's Way Orlando FL 32828 / US | |||
Former [2010/25] | 01 /
Drake, Donald III 919 Golfview Street Orlando FL 32804 / US | ||
02 /
Moe, David 5310 Locksley Avenue Orlando FL 32810 / US | |||
03 /
Li, Conan 780 Saratoga Avenue, Apt. S-307 San Jose CA 95129 / US | |||
04 /
Fahlenkamp, Heather RR3 Box 85-2 Cleveland OH 74020 / US | |||
05 /
Sanchez-Schmitz, Guzman 12073 Fountain Brook Blvd., Apt. 1446 Orlando FL 32825 / US | |||
06 /
Higbee, Russell 9321 Buttonwood Street Orlando FL 32825 / US | |||
07 /
Parkhill, Robert 1824 Anna Catherine Drive Orlando FL 32828 / US | |||
08 /
Warren, William, L. 13632 Payton's Way Orlando FL 32828 / US | Representative(s) | MacLean, Martin Robert Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | MacLean, Martin Robert Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2010/25] | MacLean, Martin Robert Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10151003.0 | 21.12.2006 | [2010/25] | Priority number, date | US20050752033P | 21.12.2005 Original published format: US 752033 P | [2010/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2199384 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2199384 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/0784, G01N33/50 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
C12N5/0639 (EP,US);
A61K39/4615 (EP);
A61K39/4622 (EP);
A61K39/4641 (EP);
C12M23/12 (EP,US);
C12M23/20 (EP,US);
C12M25/02 (EP,US);
C12M25/14 (EP,US);
C12N2502/28 (EP,US);
C12N2503/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/25] | Title | German: | Eine poröse Membran Gerät, das die Differenzierung von Monozyten in dendritische Zellen fördert | [2010/25] | English: | A porous membrane device that promotes the differentiation of monocytes into dendritic cells | [2010/25] | French: | Un dispositif de membrane poreuse qui favorise la différenciation de monocytes en cellules dendritiques | [2010/25] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/25] | 16.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06848082.1 / EP1963491 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060848082) is 20.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.11.2011 | BE | 02.11.2011 | CY | 02.11.2011 | CZ | 02.11.2011 | DK | 02.11.2011 | EE | 02.11.2011 | FI | 02.11.2011 | HU | 02.11.2011 | LT | 02.11.2011 | LV | 02.11.2011 | NL | 02.11.2011 | PL | 02.11.2011 | RO | 02.11.2011 | SE | 02.11.2011 | SI | 02.11.2011 | SK | 02.11.2011 | TR | 02.11.2011 | IE | 21.12.2011 | LU | 21.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | BG | 02.02.2012 | GR | 03.02.2012 | ES | 13.02.2012 | IS | 02.03.2012 | PT | 02.03.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
TR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
LU | 21.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
LU | 21.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
LU | 21.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 02.11.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03050271 (COLETICA [FR], et al) [A] 1-7* claims 1-59 *; | [AD] - QU CHUNFENG ET AL, "Autocrine type I IFN and contact with endothelium promote the presentation of influenza A virus by monocyte-derived APC.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (20030115), vol. 170, no. 2, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 1010 - 1018, XP002432204 [AD] 1-7 * figure 6 * | [AD] - RANDOLPH G J ET AL, "Differentiation of monocytes into dendritic cells in a model of transendothelial trafficking", SCIENCE 16 OCT 1998 UNITED STATES, (19981016), vol. 282, no. 5388, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 480 - 483, XP002432205 [AD] 1-7 * page 481 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.282.5388.480 | [AD] - SEGUIN ROSANNE ET AL, "Human brain endothelial cells supply support for monocyte immunoregulatory functions.", JOURNAL OF NEUROIMMUNOLOGY, (200302), vol. 135, no. 1-2, ISSN 0165-5728, pages 96 - 106, XP002432206 [AD] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0165-5728(02)00431-9 | [A] - MANNA P P ET AL, "Differentiation and functional maturation of human CD14<+> adherent peripheral blood monocytes by xenogeneic endothelial cells: Up-regulation of costimulation, cytokine generation, and toll-like receptors", TRANSPLANTATION 27 JUL 2002 UNITED STATES, (20020727), vol. 74, no. 2, ISSN 0041-1337, pages 243 - 252, XP009083121 [A] 1-7 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00007890-200207270-00016 | by applicant | - QU ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (2003), vol. 170, pages 1010 - 1018 | - RANDOLPH ET AL., SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 282, pages 480 - 483 | - QU ET AL., JIMMUNOL, (2003), vol. 170, pages 1010 - 1018 |