EP2175602 - Amble modulation series [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.11.2015 [2015/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Socionext Inc. 2-10-23 Shin-Yokohama Kohoko-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222-0033 / JP | [2015/24] |
Former [2015/18] | For all designated states Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited 2-10-23 Shin-Yokohama Kohoku-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222-0033 / JP | ||
Former [2010/15] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huo, Changqin c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2010/15] | Representative(s) | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 10151015.4 | 26.09.2007 | [2010/15] | Priority number, date | US20070892704 | 02.03.2007 Original published format: US 892704 | US20070744290 | 04.05.2007 Original published format: US 744290 | [2010/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2175602 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2175602 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26 | [2010/15] | CPC: |
H04L27/2613 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/155 (KR);
H04L27/2628 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0048 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/15 (EP,US);
H04L5/0023 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/15] | Title | German: | Modulations-Ambelsequenz | [2010/15] | English: | Amble modulation series | [2010/15] | French: | Séquence ambule de modulation | [2010/15] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 19.10.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/48] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07117304.1 / EP1965550 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070117304) is 09.09.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - "C80216j-07_141 ; C80216j-07_141", IEEE DRAFT; C80216J-07_141, IEEE-SA, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, (20070108), vol. 802.16j, pages 1 - 7, XP017629487 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [A] - "Relay midamble ; S80216j-06_144", IEEE DRAFT; S80216J-06_144, IEEE-SA, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, (20061114), vol. 802.16j, pages 1 - 4, XP017629026 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [A] - "RS 802.16e Preamble Transmission ; C80216j-06_241r1", IEEE DRAFT; C80216J-06_241R1, IEEE-SA, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, (20070108), vol. 802.16j, pages 1 - 11, XP017629339 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0711730 |