EP2211518 - A technical system located in the firmware / OS-kernel of an e-mail gateway or firewall to protect the infrastructure or operating system against DDoS attacks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blapp, Martin Rüttelstrasse 13 4416 Bubendorf / CH | [2010/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/30] | Application number, filing date | 10151219.2 | 20.01.2010 | [2010/30] | Priority number, date | CH20090000102 | 22.01.2009 Original published format: CH 1022009 | [2010/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2211518 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2211518 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2010/30] | CPC: |
H04L63/1458 (EP);
H04L63/162 (EP);
H04L2463/141 (EP);
H04L2463/142 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Ein technisches System in der Hardware oder im Kernel eines E-Mail Gateways um die Betriebs-Infrastruktur oder das Betriebssystem gegen DDoS-Angriffe aus dem Internet zu schützen | [2010/30] | English: | A technical system located in the firmware / OS-kernel of an e-mail gateway or firewall to protect the infrastructure or operating system against DDoS attacks | [2010/30] | French: | Un système technique (un pare-feu) dans le noyau de système d?exploitation pour protéger l'infrastructure d'E-mail et le réseau contre des attaques DDoS de l'Internet | [2010/30] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/46] | 27.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/46] | Request for further processing for: | 12.05.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 12.05.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.06.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 06.04.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 06.04.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.06.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 06.04.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 06.04.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.06.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - Hal Pomeranz, "Sendmail's New GreetPauseFeature", (20060926), URL: http://www.deer-run.com/~hal/sysadmin/greet_pause.html, (20121011), XP002685095 [I] 1-6 * the whole document * | [I] - Alfred Perlstein, "Manual Reference Pages - ACCF_DATA", (20001115), URL: http://www.gsp.com/cgi-bin/man.cgi?section=9&topic=accf_data, (20121011), XP002685096 [I] 1-6 * the whole document * | [I] - Alfred Perlstein, "Manual Reference Pages - ACCF_HTTP", (20001115), URL: http://www.gsp.com/cgi-bin/man.cgi?section=9&topic=accf_http, (20121011), XP002685097 [I] 1-6 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO0233870 | CN1968147 | EP1691529 | WO2004068285 | WO03017613 |