EP2236417 - Method and device for controlling the attitude of an unmanned aerial vehicle using only one axis of three-axis magnetometer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fitzpatrick, David 2531 Violeta Circle SE Rio Rancho, NM 87124 / US | [2010/40] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10151453.7 | 22.01.2010 | [2010/40] | Priority number, date | US20090417380 | 02.04.2009 Original published format: US 417380 | [2010/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2236417 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B64C39/02, G01R33/02, G05D1/08 | [2010/40] | CPC: |
B64U70/80 (EP,US);
B64U30/26 (EP,US);
B64U50/11 (EP,US);
B64U50/18 (EP,US);
B64U50/33 (EP,US);
G01R33/0206 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Lageregelung eines unbemannten Fluggeräts unter Verwendung nur einer Achse eines Dreiachsen-Magnetometers | [2010/40] | English: | Method and device for controlling the attitude of an unmanned aerial vehicle using only one axis of three-axis magnetometer | [2010/40] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le contrôle de l'attitude d'un véhicule aérien sans pilote utilisant seulement un axe d'un magnétomètre triaxial | [2010/40] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/40] | 07.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/06] | 26.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.09.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2843034 (DEUTSCHE FORSCH LUFT RAUMFAHRT); | [Y]EP1995174 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]); | by applicant | EP1995174 | US2010012776 |