EP2218490 - Filter retention system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BHA Altair, LLC 840 Crescent Centre Dr., Suite 600 Franklin, TN 37067 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | For all designated states BHA Altair, LLC 840 Crescent Centre Dr. Suite 600 Franklin, Tennessee 37067 / US | ||
Former [2010/33] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mann, Richard Michael Ashley Fairview Odiham Road Riseley Reading, Berkshire RG7 1SD / GB | 02 /
Goodrick-Meech, Christina 15 Priory Court Fawcett Road Southsea Portsmouth, Hampshire PO4 0DR / GB | 03 /
Dunstan, Beverley 230 Hursley Road Chandlers Ford Eastleigh, Hampshire SO53 1JS / GB | 04 /
Eyers, William Keith Albert 26 Alpha Road Chobham, Surrey GU24 8NF / GB | [2010/33] | Representative(s) | Pronovem Office Van Malderen Avenue Josse Goffin 158 1082 Bruxelles / BE | [2014/09] |
Former [2010/33] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 10151701.9 | 26.01.2010 | [2010/33] | Priority number, date | US20090363682 | 30.01.2009 Original published format: US 363682 | [2010/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2218490 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/00 | [2010/33] | CPC: |
B01D46/0005 (EP,US);
B01D46/58 (EP,US);
B01D2265/028 (EP,US);
Y10S55/31 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Filterrückhaltesystem | [2010/33] | English: | Filter retention system | [2010/33] | French: | Système de rétention de filtre | [2010/33] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 24.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/36] | 16.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.08.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0264531 (DUERR GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 10,12-14 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - line 26 * * column 2, line 27 - line 32 *[I] 1-9,11,15 | Examination | US3552104 |