EP2213813 - Method for manufacturing a floor comprising a plurality of solid wood strips and resulting floor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vicente, André 21 Rue du Chasselas 34110 Frontignan / FR | [2010/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/31] | Representative(s) | Hartmann, Jean-Luc, et al Cabinet Morelle & Bardou SC Parc Technologique du Canal 9, Avenue de l'Europe B.P. 72253 31522 Ramonville Saint-Agne Cedex / FR | [2013/09] |
Former [2012/14] | Morelle, Guy Georges Alain Cabinet Morelle & Bardou, SC Parc Technologique du Canal 9, Avenue de l'Europe B.P. 72253 31522 Ramonville Saint Agne Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2010/31] | Morelle, Guy Georges Alain Cabinet Morelle & Bardou, SC Parc Technologique du Canal 9, Avenue de l'Europe B.P. 72253 31522 Ramonville Saint Agne Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 10151820.7 | 27.01.2010 | [2010/31] | Priority number, date | FR20090050595 | 30.01.2009 Original published format: FR 0950595 | [2010/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2213813 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2213813 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/04 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
E04F15/04 (EP);
E04F15/02166 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Fussbodens aus einer Vielzahl von Massivholzlatten, und so hergestellter Fussboden | [2010/31] | English: | Method for manufacturing a floor comprising a plurality of solid wood strips and resulting floor | [2010/31] | French: | Procédé de réalisation d'un plancher comportant une pluralité de lames en bois massif et plancher ainsi obtenu | [2010/31] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/10] | 04.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.01.2010 | AT | 04.04.2012 | CY | 04.04.2012 | CZ | 04.04.2012 | DK | 04.04.2012 | EE | 04.04.2012 | FI | 04.04.2012 | HR | 04.04.2012 | LT | 04.04.2012 | LV | 04.04.2012 | MK | 04.04.2012 | MT | 04.04.2012 | NL | 04.04.2012 | PL | 04.04.2012 | RO | 04.04.2012 | SE | 04.04.2012 | SI | 04.04.2012 | SK | 04.04.2012 | SM | 04.04.2012 | TR | 04.04.2012 | BG | 04.07.2012 | NO | 04.07.2012 | GR | 05.07.2012 | IS | 04.08.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
MK | 04.04.2012 | ||
MT | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
SM | 04.04.2012 | ||
TR | 04.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
MT | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
SM | 04.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
MT | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 04.04.2012 | |
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 04.04.2012 | |
NO | 04.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US1649842 (JAMES MCBRIDE) [AD] 1 * page 2, line 17 - line 27 * * figure - *; | [AD]GB2151277 (RASTA ABRASIVES UK LIMITED) [AD] 1 * page 1, line 6 - line 8 * * page 1, line 27 - line 38 * * page 1, line 71 - line 91 * * page 1, line 116 - line 123 * * figure - *; | [AD]FR2712327 (JAMWOOD [FR]) [AD] 1,5 * page 3, line 27 - line 28 * * page 6, line 28 - line 31 * * figure 3a *; | [AD]GB2339437 (STAIRWAY & ENTRANCE SAFETY PRO [GB]) [AD] 1 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 2 * * figure - *; | [AD]FR2801943 (FAURE DIDIER [FR]) [AD] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [AD]AT5117U (THEURETZBACHER HERMANN [AT]) [AD] 1 * page 4, line 18 - line 25 * * figure 1 *; | [AD]WO0246546 (BARANOWSKI GRZEGORZ [PL]) [AD] 1* figure - *; | [AD]ES2178602 (INSTAPAR S L [ES]) [AD] 1 * figure 2b * | by applicant | AT5117B | US1649842 |