EP2175665 - Optical disk for high resolution and three-dimensional video recording, optical disk reproduction apparatus, and optical disk recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oshima, Mitsuaki Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Kitaura, Hiromu Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
Fukuda, Hideki Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
Ishihara, Hideshi Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
Kawara, Toshiyuki Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2012/47] |
Former [2010/15] | 01 /
Oshima, Mitsuaki Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
02 /
Kitaura, Hiromu Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
03 /
Fukuda, Hideki Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
04 /
Ishihara, Hideshi Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
05 /
Kawara, Toshiyuki Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [2012/47] |
Former [2010/15] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 10151837.1 | 03.12.1997 | [2010/15] | Priority number, date | JP19960323770 | 04.12.1996 Original published format: JP 32377096 | JP19960347284 | 26.12.1996 Original published format: JP 34728496 | WO1997JP00615 | 28.02.1997 Original published format: PCT/JP97/00615 | JP19970234320 | 29.08.1997 Original published format: JP 23432097 | JP19970288099 | 21.10.1997 Original published format: JP 28809997 | [2010/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2175665 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2175665 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | [2010/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2175665 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/00, G11B20/10, G11B20/12, G11B20/14, H04N5/04, H04N5/44, H04N5/45, H04N9/82, H04N9/804, H04N13/00, G11B27/00, G11B27/10, H04N5/765, H04N5/85, H04N7/50, H04N13/04, G11B27/30, H04N5/76, H04N7/26 | [2012/34] | CPC: |
G11B20/00007 (EP,US);
H04N13/00 (KR);
H04N13/172 (US);
G11B20/10222 (EP,US);
G11B20/10527 (EP,US);
G11B20/1217 (EP,US);
G11B20/14 (EP,US);
G11B27/005 (EP,US);
G11B27/10 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
H04N13/144 (EP,US);
H04N13/161 (EP,US);
H04N13/167 (EP,US);
H04N13/178 (EP,US);
H04N13/183 (EP,US);
H04N13/189 (EP,US);
H04N13/194 (EP,US);
H04N13/239 (EP,US);
H04N13/359 (EP,US);
H04N13/398 (EP,US);
H04N19/597 (EP,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
H04N21/426 (EP,US);
H04N21/42646 (EP,US);
H04N21/4305 (EP,US);
H04N21/43072 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/4325 (EP,US);
H04N21/4334 (EP,US);
H04N21/4392 (EP,US);
H04N5/04 (EP,US);
H04N5/45 (EP,US);
H04N5/765 (EP,US);
H04N5/85 (EP,US);
H04N9/8042 (EP,US);
H04N9/8045 (EP,US);
H04N9/8227 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10546 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10675 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1074 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10805 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10953 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1288 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US);
H04N13/10 (EP,US);
H04N13/15 (EP,US);
H04N13/341 (EP,US);
H04N13/361 (EP,US);
H04N13/363 (EP,US);
H04N2013/0085 (EP,US);
H04N5/46 (EP,US);
H04N5/775 (EP,US);
H04N7/012 (EP,US);
H04N7/0122 (EP,US);
H04N9/7921 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/30] | H04N5/04, H04N5/44, H04N5/45, H04N9/82, H04N9/804, H04N13/00 | ||
Former IPC [2010/15] | H04N13/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/15] | Title | German: | Optische Platte für hochauflösende und dreidimensionale Videoaufzeichnung, Wiedergabegerät für optische Platten, und Aufzeichnungsgerät für optische Platten | [2010/15] | English: | Optical disk for high resolution and three-dimensional video recording, optical disk reproduction apparatus, and optical disk recording apparatus | [2010/15] | French: | Disque optique pour enregistrement en haute qualité et en trois dimensions, appareil de reproduction des disques optiques, et appareil d'enregistrement des disques optiques | [2010/15] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/15] | 16.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01101177.2 / EP1094674 | EP97946090.4 / EP0944269 | Divisional application(s) | EP10179038.4 / EP2259584 | EP10179042.6 / EP2268015 | EP10179050.9 / EP2259585 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19970946090) is 28.06.2000 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 21.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5193000 (LIPTON LENNY [US], et al) [A] 1-2 * figures 10, 11 *; | [A]JPH0713544 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [A] 1-2 * abstract *; | [A]EP0655869 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-2* figures 4, 5 *; | [A]EP0665697 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1-2 * figures 4-6 *; | [A]JPH07288850 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-2 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0067]; figures 1-3, 6a, 6b *; | [A]JPH07298311 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-2 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0067]; figures 1-3, 6a, 6b *; | [X]JPH08307902 (SONY CORP) [X] 1-2 * paragraphs [0003] - [0007] - [0 29] , [0 30] , [0 33] , [0 80] - [0085]; figures 8, 13; claim 1 *; | [X]JPH08307896 (SONY CORP) [X] 1-2 * the whole document * | Examination | JPH0638244 | - KANAI Y ET AL, "MPEG2 3D PLAYER SYSTEM", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19950801), vol. 41, no. 3, doi:10.1109/30.468018, ISSN 0098-3063, pages 716 - 722, XP000539528 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.468018 | by applicant | JPH0638244 | - KANAI Y ET AL., "MPEG2 3D Player System", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, (19950801), vol. 41, pages 716 - 722 |