EP2233636 - Paper machine frame part and method of manufacture thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/39] | Paper machine components | ||
[2017/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2017/44] |
Former [2010/39] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hiller, Wolfgang Rosenweg 3 89129 Nerenstetten / DE | 02 /
Janzer, Josef Weimarer Str. 5 89547 Gerstetten / DE | 03 /
Gardum, Thomas Paul-Lincke-Strasse 7 86199 Augsburg / DE | [2017/44] |
Former [2010/39] | 01 /
Hiller, Wolfgang Rosenweg 3 89129 Nerenstetten / DE | ||
02 /
Janzer, Josef Weimarer Str. 5 89547 Gerstetten / DE | |||
03 /
Gardum, Thomas Paul-Lincke-Strasse 7 86199 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10151924.7 | 28.01.2010 | [2010/39] | Priority number, date | DE20091001883 | 26.03.2009 Original published format: DE102009001883 | [2010/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2233636 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2233636 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2233636 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | D21F7/00, D21F9/00, D21G9/00, D21F1/00, D21F3/00, D21F5/00, D21G1/00 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
D21F9/00 (EP);
D21F1/00 (EP);
D21F3/00 (EP);
D21F5/00 (EP);
D21F7/00 (EP);
D21G1/00 (EP);
D21G9/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/39] | D21F7/00, D21F9/00, D21G9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] |
Former [2010/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Papiermaschinenstuhlungsteil und Verfahren zur dessen Herstellung | [2017/42] | English: | Paper machine frame part and method of manufacture thereof | [2017/22] | French: | Bâti pour machine à papier et procédé de fabrication dudit bâti | [2017/22] |
Former [2010/39] | Papiermaschinenbauteile | ||
Former [2010/39] | Paper machine components | ||
Former [2010/39] | Composants de machines à papier | Examination procedure | 18.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/35] | 16.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 22.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.01.2010 | CY | 01.11.2017 | CZ | 01.11.2017 | DK | 01.11.2017 | EE | 01.11.2017 | ES | 01.11.2017 | HR | 01.11.2017 | LT | 01.11.2017 | LV | 01.11.2017 | MC | 01.11.2017 | MK | 01.11.2017 | MT | 01.11.2017 | NL | 01.11.2017 | PL | 01.11.2017 | PT | 01.11.2017 | RO | 01.11.2017 | SE | 01.11.2017 | SI | 01.11.2017 | SK | 01.11.2017 | SM | 01.11.2017 | TR | 01.11.2017 | IE | 28.01.2018 | LU | 28.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | FR | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | BG | 01.02.2018 | GB | 01.02.2018 | NO | 01.02.2018 | GR | 02.02.2018 | IS | 01.03.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 28.01.2010 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PT | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
TR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 28.01.2018 | ||
LU | 28.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
GB | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
TR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 28.01.2018 | ||
LU | 28.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
GB | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 28.01.2018 | ||
LU | 28.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
GB | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 28.01.2018 | ||
LU | 28.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
GB | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 28.01.2018 | ||
LU | 28.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
LU | 28.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
LU | 28.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
LU | 28.01.2018 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | ES | 01.11.2017 | |
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | ES | 01.11.2017 | |
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 01.11.2017 | |
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | LT | 01.11.2017 | |
NO | 01.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3102116 (HERGETH HUBERT) [X] 1,2,5,9,10,12 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0020886 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [X] 1,2,6-11 * page 6, line 16 - page 12, line 5; figure - *; | [X]DE102007016719 (VOITH PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,9,12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0011] , [0015] , [0034] , [0038] , [0043] , [0044]; figure - *; | [X]CH658277 (HANSRUEDI MEYER) [X] 1,2,9-11 * page 2, line 61 - page 3, line 29; figure - *; | [X]EP0054276 (EMAG MASCHFAB GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,5,6,9 * page 3, paragraph 5 - page 5, paragraph 1; figure . *; | [X]EP0964098 (EGGER JOHANN [AT]) [X] 1,9,12 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0460508 | DE2229506 |