EP2213407 - Hydraulic machine newly manufactured component, method for manufacturing or repairing such a component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2013 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alstom Hydro France 3 Avenue André Malraux 92300 Levallois Perret / FR | [2010/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prigent, Serge / Les Quartelles 38700 Le Sappey en Chartreuse / FR | [2012/14] |
Former [2010/31] | 01 /
Prigent, Serge Les Quartelles 38700 Le Sappey en Chartreuse / FR | Representative(s) | Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix Lyon 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | ||
Former [2010/31] | Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, Rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10151968.4 | 28.01.2010 | [2010/31] | Priority number, date | FR20090050594 | 30.01.2009 Original published format: FR 0950594 | [2010/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2213407 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2213407 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B23P15/00, F03B1/02, B23P6/00 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
B23P15/006 (EP);
B23P6/005 (EP);
F03B1/02 (EP);
F05B2230/232 (EP);
F05B2230/237 (EP);
F05B2230/80 (EP);
F05B2280/20041 (EP);
F05B2280/20071 (EP);
F05B2280/20073 (EP);
F05B2280/2008 (EP);
F05B2280/5007 (EP);
F05B2280/6011 (EP);
F05C2203/0817 (EP);
F05C2203/0826 (EP);
F05C2203/083 (EP);
F05C2203/0869 (EP);
F05C2251/10 (EP);
F05C2253/12 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2010/31] | B23P15/00, F03B3/00, F03B1/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/31] | Title | German: | Neue Komponente einer Hydraulischen Maschine, Verfahren zur Herstellung oder Reparatur einer solchen Komponente | [2011/32] | English: | Hydraulic machine newly manufactured component, method for manufacturing or repairing such a component | [2010/31] | French: | Composant neuf de machine hydraulique, procédé de fabrication ou de maintenance d'un tel composant | [2011/31] |
Former [2010/31] | Neue Komponente von einer Hydraulischen Maschine, Verfahren zur Herstellung oder Reparatur einer solchen Komponente | ||
Former [2010/31] | Composant neuf de machine hydraulique, procede de fabrication ou de maintenance d'un tel composant | Examination procedure | 01.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/10] | 02.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.01.2010 | CY | 04.04.2012 | CZ | 04.04.2012 | DK | 04.04.2012 | EE | 04.04.2012 | FI | 04.04.2012 | HR | 04.04.2012 | LT | 04.04.2012 | LV | 04.04.2012 | MK | 04.04.2012 | MT | 04.04.2012 | NL | 04.04.2012 | PL | 04.04.2012 | RO | 04.04.2012 | SE | 04.04.2012 | SI | 04.04.2012 | SK | 04.04.2012 | SM | 04.04.2012 | BG | 04.07.2012 | NO | 04.07.2012 | GR | 05.07.2012 | ES | 15.07.2012 | IS | 04.08.2012 | PT | 06.08.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
MK | 04.04.2012 | ||
MT | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
SM | 04.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
ES | 15.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
MT | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
SM | 04.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
ES | 15.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
MT | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
ES | 15.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
ES | 15.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
ES | 15.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 04.04.2012 | |
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 04.04.2012 | |
NO | 04.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH216126 (BURGER AMANZ [CH]) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 21 - page 2, line 5; figures 1-3 * * the whole document *; | [A]GB723248 (MARKHAM & COMPANY LTD, et al) [A] 1-15 * page 3, line 24 - line 28; figure 3 * * the whole document *; | [XA]GB995654 (DOMINION ENG WORKS LTD) [X] 6 * page 1, line 79 - line 86 * * page 2, line 16 - line 45 * * figures 1,2 * * the whole document * [A] 1-5,7-15; | [A]JPH01219301 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [A]JP2001153019 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * |