EP2354972 - File sharing using customized images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2013/48] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2011/32] | For all designated states RESEARCH IN MOTION LIMITED 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hymel, James 72590-195 Columbia St. W. Waterloo Ontario N2L 5Z5 / CA | [2011/32] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/32] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10152452.8 | 02.02.2010 | [2011/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2354972 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2011/32] | CPC: |
G06F16/434 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gemeinsame Dateinutzung unter Verwendung von massgeschneiderten Bildern | [2011/32] | English: | File sharing using customized images | [2011/32] | French: | Partage de fichiers utilisant des images personnalisées | [2011/32] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2010 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 14.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2007166660 (SONY CORP) [X] 1-14 * claims 1-12 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0062] * |