EP2221257 - Cartridge piston with a venting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sulzer Mixpac AG Rütistrasse 7 9469 Haag / CH | [2010/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schär, Martin Chamerstrasse 38 6331, Hünenberg / CH | [2010/34] | Representative(s) | Kluthe, Stefan Sulzer Management AG Patentabteilung / 0067 Neuwiesenstrasse 15 8401 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Kluthe, Stefan Sulzer Management AG Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 14 8401 Winterthur / CH | Application number, filing date | 10152759.6 | 05.02.2010 | [2010/34] | Priority number, date | EP20090152496 | 11.02.2009 Original published format: EP 09152496 | [2010/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2221257 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/00, // B05C17/005 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
B65D83/0005 (EP,US);
B05C17/00579 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/34] | Title | German: | Kartuschenkolben mit Entlüftungsvorrichtung | [2010/34] | English: | Cartridge piston with a venting device | [2010/34] | French: | Piston de cartouche doté d'un évent | [2010/34] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 16.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE9110529U (PRESTELE, EUGEN, 8900 AUGSBURG, DE) [X] 1 * page 4; figures 3a,3b *; | [XA]WO03050012 (TAH IND INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 12; | [X]US2005029306 (BRENNAN ROBERT CHARLES [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0047]; figures 7,8,12,13 *; | [A]DE202005000531U (TOPIC ANTON [DE]) [A] 1* paragraph [0037]; figure - *; | [X]EP1738834 (TAH IND INC [US]) [X] 1,11 * paragraphs [0022] , [0024]; figures 1B,2 *; | [A]DE102006025873 (FISCHBACH KG KUNSTSTOFF TECHNI [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE20010417U |