EP2217017 - Method and apparatus for message delivery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vodafone Intellectual Property Licensing Limited The Connection Newbury, Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | [2010/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Russell, Nick R&D Vodafone Group Services Limited The Connection Newbury, Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | 02 /
Dawes, Peter R&D Vodafone Group Services Limited The Connection Newbury, Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | 03 /
Hutton, David R&D Vodafone Group Services Limited The Connection Newbury, Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | [2013/30] |
Former [2010/32] | 01 /
Russell, Nick R&D Vodafone Group Services Limited The Connection Newbury, Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | ||
02 /
Dawes, Peter R&D Vodafone Group Services Limited The Connection Newbury, Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | |||
03 /
Hutton, David R&D Vodafone Group Services Limited The Connection Newbury, Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | Representative(s) | Hoyles, Matthew Thomas, et al Vodafone Group Services Ltd. Group Legal and Corporate Secretariat One Kingdom Street, 5th floor Paddington Central London W2 6BY / GB | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/30] | Sneary, Adrian Bernard Vodafone Group Services Limited Group Legal Vodafone House The Connection Newbury Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | ||
Former [2010/32] | Sneary, Adrian Bernard Vodafone Group Services Limited Group Legal Vodafone House The Connection Newbury Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | Application number, filing date | 10153120.0 | 09.02.2010 | [2010/32] | Priority number, date | GB20090002014 | 09.02.2009 Original published format: GB 0902014 | [2010/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2217017 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2217017 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/58 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
H04L51/23 (EP,US);
H04L51/58 (EP,US);
H04W4/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/32] | H04W4/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Liefern von Nachrichten | [2010/32] | English: | Method and apparatus for message delivery | [2010/32] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la livraison de messages | [2010/32] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 07.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.02.2010 | AT | 24.07.2013 | BE | 24.07.2013 | BG | 24.07.2013 | CY | 24.07.2013 | CZ | 24.07.2013 | DK | 24.07.2013 | EE | 24.07.2013 | FI | 24.07.2013 | HR | 24.07.2013 | LT | 24.07.2013 | LV | 24.07.2013 | MC | 24.07.2013 | MK | 24.07.2013 | MT | 24.07.2013 | NL | 24.07.2013 | PL | 24.07.2013 | RO | 24.07.2013 | SE | 24.07.2013 | SI | 24.07.2013 | SK | 24.07.2013 | SM | 24.07.2013 | TR | 24.07.2013 | NO | 24.10.2013 | GR | 25.10.2013 | IS | 24.11.2013 | PT | 25.11.2013 | IE | 09.02.2014 | LU | 09.02.2014 | CH | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 09.02.2010 | |
AT | 24.07.2013 | ||
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
MT | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
SM | 24.07.2013 | ||
TR | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 09.02.2014 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 09.02.2010 | |
AT | 24.07.2013 | ||
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
MT | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
SM | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 09.02.2014 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
MT | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
SM | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 09.02.2014 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
MT | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
SM | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 09.02.2014 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
MT | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 09.02.2014 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 09.02.2014 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 24.07.2013 | |
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 24.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0169848 (VENATION LTD [GB]) [A] 1-18* page 2, line 16 - page 3, line 22 *; | [X]EP1259036 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [X] 1-18 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0021]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0038]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0048] *; | [A]EP1950934 (CVON INNOVATIONS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0013] *; | [A]WO2009015571 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [A] 1-18; | EP2184897 [ ] (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [ ] * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0012] * | by applicant | EP1259036 |