EP2223740 - Chemical apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2010/35] | For all designated states Hitachi Plant Technologies, Ltd. 5-2 Higashi-Ikebukuro 4-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 170-8466 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saito, Kimio c/o Hitachi Plant Technologies, Ltd. 5-2 Higashi-Ikebukuro 4-chome, Toshima-ku Tokyo 170-8466 / JP | 02 /
Endo, Yoshishige c/o Hitachi Plant Technologies, Ltd. 5-2 Higashi-Ikebukuro 4-chome, Toshima-ku Tokyo 170-8466 / JP | 03 /
Kato, Hajime c/o Hitachi Plant Technologies, Ltd. 5-2 Higashi-Ikebukuro 4-chome, Toshima-ku Tokyo 170-8466 / JP | 04 /
Ito, Yuzuru c/o Hitachi Plant Technologies, Ltd. 5-2 Higashi-Ikebukuro 4-chome, Toshima-ku Tokyo 170-8466 / JP | 05 /
Mori, Syuuichi c/o Hitachi Plant Technologies, Ltd. 5-2 Higashi-Ikebukuro 4-chome, Toshima-ku Tokyo 170-8466 / JP | [2010/35] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10153240.6 | 10.02.2010 | [2010/35] | Priority number, date | JP20090028075 | 10.02.2009 Original published format: JP 2009028075 | [2010/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2223740 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2223740 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/00 | [2010/35] | CPC: |
B01J19/0093 (EP);
B01F23/703 (EP);
B01J2219/00869 (EP);
B01J2219/00889 (EP);
B01J2219/00891 (EP);
B01J2219/00959 (EP);
B01J2219/00986 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Chemische Vorrichtung | [2010/35] | English: | Chemical apparatus | [2010/35] | French: | Appareil chimique | [2010/35] | Examination procedure | 10.04.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2007136253 (HITACHI PLANT TECHNOLOGIES LTD) [Y] 1-5 * abstract *; | [Y]WO03095086 (UNIV DURHAM [GB], et al) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * page 19, line 21 - page 21, line 8; figure 7 *; | [Y]EP1317954 (AVANTIUM INT BV [NL]) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0033]; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2006057895 (VELOCYS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * page 29, line 1 - page 30, line 7; figure 60 * | by applicant | JP2009028075 | JP2008080306 |