EP2222016 - Method and device for hashing onto points of an elliptic curve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2010/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Joye, Marc 1 rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443, Issy-Les-Moulineaux / FR | [2010/34] | Representative(s) | Huchet, Anne, et al TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | Huchet, Anne, et al TECHNICOLOR European Patent Operations 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2010/34] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte Technicolor 1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 10153614.2 | 15.02.2010 | [2010/34] | Priority number, date | EP20090305164 | 19.02.2009 Original published format: EP 09305164 | [2010/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2222016 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
H04L9/3236 (EP,KR);
G06F21/00 (KR);
G06F9/4494 (KR);
G06F9/453 (KR);
H04L9/3073 (EP,KR);
H04L9/3247 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Hash-Codieren auf Punkten einer elliptischen Kurve | [2010/34] | English: | Method and device for hashing onto points of an elliptic curve | [2010/34] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour hacher sur des points d'une courbe elliptique | [2010/34] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/10] | 28.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/48] | 25.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.06.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - BARRETO PAULO S. L. M. AND HAE KIM Y., "Fast hashing onto ellitpic curves over fields of characteristic 3", IACR website, (20011115), pages 1 - 11, URL: http://eprint.iacr.org/2001/098.pdf, (20090812), XP002541311 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - HAN SONG; YEUNG WINSON K Y; WANG JIE, "Identity-based confirmer signatures from pairings over elliptic curves", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 4TH ACM CONFERENCE ON ELECTRONIC COMMERCE, San diego california USA, (20030609), pages 262 - 263, URL: http://delivery.acm.org/10.1145/780000/779989/p262-han.pdf?key1=779989&key2=8675610521&coll=GUIDE&dl=GUIDE&CFID=48515992&CFTOKEN=63552357, (20090811), XP002541312 [A] 1-10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/779928.779989 | Examination | WO03017559 | EP2377268 | - JOHNSON D ET AL, "The Elliptic Curve Digital Signature Algorithm (ECDSA)", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF INFORMATION SECURITY (IJIS), SPRINGER, HEIDELBERG, DE, (20010801), vol. 1, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S102070100002, ISSN 1615-5262, pages 36 - 63, XP009123085 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s102070100002 | - THOMAS ICART ED - SHAI HALEVI, How to Hash into Elliptic Curves, ADVANCES IN CRYPTOLOGY - CRYPTO 2009, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 303 - 316, (20090816), ISBN 978-3-642-03355-1, XP047029909 | - DANIEL R L BROWN, "The Encrypted Elliptic Curve Hash", INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR CRYPTOLOGIC RESEARCH,, (20080429), vol. 20080429:183902, pages 1 - 15, XP061002823 | - BOYEN L MARTIN VOLTAGE SECURITY X, "Identity-Based Cryptography Standard (IBCS) #1: Supersingular Curve Implementations of the BF and BB1 Cryptosystems; rfc5091.txt", NETWORK WORKING GROUP RFC 1717, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, CH, (20071201), ISSN 0000-0003, XP015055163 | - DANIEL J BERNSTEIN ET AL, Faster Addition and Doubling on Elliptic Curves, ADVANCES IN CRYPTOLOGY - ASIACRYPT 2007; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE], SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 29 - 50, (20071202), ISBN 978-3-540-76899-9, XP047029730 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-540-76900-2_3 | by applicant | - "Practical: A Paradigm for Designing Efficient Protocols", 1st ACM Conference on Computer and Communications Security, ACM PRESS, (1993), pages 62 - 73 | - D. BONEH; M. FRANKLIN, "Identity-Based Encryption from the Weil Pairing", SIAM JOURNAL OF COMPUTING, (2003), vol. 32, no. 3, pages 586 - 615 | - "A Course in Number Theory and Cryptography", N. KOBLITZ, Graduate Texts in Mathematics, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1994), vol. 114 |