EP2360808 - Mobile communication device employing power pack with multiple pairs of taps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2015/27] |
Former [2013/48] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | ||
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2011/34] | For all designated states RESEARCH IN MOTION LIMITED 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mankaruse, George Soliman 73129 - 305 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | 02 /
Zhu, Lizhong 72246 - 305 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | 03 /
Corrigan, Michael Stephen 72283 - 305 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | [2012/33] |
Former [2011/34] | 01 /
Mankaruse, George Soliman 73129 - 305 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
02 /
Zhu, Lizhong 72246 - 305 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | |||
03 /
Corigan, Michael Stephen 72283 - 305 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Representative(s) | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/27] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2011/34] | Patel, Binesh Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | ||
Former [2011/32] | Patel, Binesh Barker Brettell LLP 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | Application number, filing date | 10153696.9 | 16.02.2010 | [2011/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2360808 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2360808 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, H02J7/34 | [2011/34] | CPC: |
H02J7/345 (EP);
H04B1/40 (KR);
H02J7/0045 (EP);
H02J2207/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] |
Former [2011/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Mobile Kommunikationsvorrichtung mit einem Netzteil mit mehreren Tappaaren | [2011/34] | English: | Mobile communication device employing power pack with multiple pairs of taps | [2011/34] | French: | Dispositif de communication mobile utilisant un bloc d'alimentation avec plusieurs paires de prises | [2011/34] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2010 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 27.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.02.2010 | AT | 01.07.2015 | BE | 01.07.2015 | BG | 01.07.2015 | CY | 01.07.2015 | CZ | 01.07.2015 | DK | 01.07.2015 | EE | 01.07.2015 | ES | 01.07.2015 | FI | 01.07.2015 | HR | 01.07.2015 | IT | 01.07.2015 | LT | 01.07.2015 | LV | 01.07.2015 | MC | 01.07.2015 | MK | 01.07.2015 | NL | 01.07.2015 | PL | 01.07.2015 | RO | 01.07.2015 | SE | 01.07.2015 | SI | 01.07.2015 | SK | 01.07.2015 | SM | 01.07.2015 | TR | 01.07.2015 | NO | 01.10.2015 | GR | 02.10.2015 | IS | 01.11.2015 | PT | 02.11.2015 | IE | 16.02.2016 | LU | 16.02.2016 | CH | 29.02.2016 | LI | 29.02.2016 | MT | 29.02.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 16.02.2010 | |
AT | 01.07.2015 | ||
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CY | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
SM | 01.07.2015 | ||
TR | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
IE | 16.02.2016 | ||
LU | 16.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
MT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 16.02.2010 | |
AT | 01.07.2015 | ||
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CY | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MK | 01.07.2015 | ||
MT | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
SM | 01.07.2015 | ||
TR | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
IE | 16.02.2016 | ||
LU | 16.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 16.02.2010 | |
AT | 01.07.2015 | ||
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CY | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MK | 01.07.2015 | ||
MT | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
SM | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
IE | 16.02.2016 | ||
LU | 16.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MT | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
IE | 16.02.2016 | ||
LU | 16.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
IE | 16.02.2016 | ||
LU | 16.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
LU | 16.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
LU | 16.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/43] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
LU | 16.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 01.07.2015 | |
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 01.07.2015 | |
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 01.07.2015 | |
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 01.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6215274 (DOTZLER KEVIN [US]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [Y]EP1445780 (NEC TOKIN CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraphs [0048] - [0049] * * paragraphs [0055] - [0056] * * figures 1-3,4 *; | [Y]US2007003088 (LEHTOLA ESA A [FI]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0036] * * figures 1A,1B *; | [A]DE102005030123 (AUSTRIAMICROSYSTEMS AG [AT]) [A] 9-11 * paragraphs [0047] - [0050]; figure 1 * |