EP2224212 - Method and navigation device for determining probable journey times [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Navigon AG Schottmüllerstrasse 20 A 20251 Hamburg / DE | [2010/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Englerth, Harald Ringstrasse 4 97241 Bergtheim / DE | 02 /
Schmidt, Thorsten W. Olga-Pöhlmann-Str. 9 97318, Kitzingen / DE | 03 /
Ros, Feliu Friedrich-Spee-Str. 40 97072, Würzburg / DE | [2011/32] |
Former [2010/35] | 01 /
Englerth, Harald Berliner Platz 2 97080, Würzburg / DE | ||
02 /
Schmidt, Thorsten W. Olga-Pöhlmann-Str. 9 97318, Kitzingen / DE | |||
03 /
Ros, Feliu Friedrich-Spee-Str. 40 97072, Würzburg / DE | Representative(s) | von den Steinen, Axel Advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Beethovenstrasse 5 97080 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | von den Steinen, Axel Advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Beethovenstrasse 5 97080 Würzburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10153794.2 | 17.02.2010 | [2010/35] | Priority number, date | DE20091010381 | 26.02.2009 Original published format: DE102009010381 | DE20091043309 | 29.09.2009 Original published format: DE102009043309 | [2010/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2224212 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/34 | [2010/35] | CPC: |
G01C21/3492 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Navigationseinrichtung zur Ermittlung der voraussichtlichen Fahrzeit | [2010/35] | English: | Method and navigation device for determining probable journey times | [2010/35] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de navigation destinés à la détermination du temps de trajet prévisible | [2010/35] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 01.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/09] | 10.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP1172631 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [YD] 1,2,7,13-15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0026] *; | [Y]DE102005004332 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1,2,7,13-15 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0030] * | by applicant | EP1172631 |