EP2362692 - Method and a device for determining which resource has to be allocated to a home base station [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
Mitsubishi Electric R&D Centre Europe B.V. Capronilaan 46 1119 NS Schiphol Rijk / NL | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | For:FR
Mitsubishi Electric R&D Centre Europe B.V. Capronilaan 46 1119 NS Schiphol Rijk / NL | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Khanfouci, Mourad Mitsubishi Electric R&D Centre Europe 1 allée de Beaulieu CS 10806 35708 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | 02 /
Abouchami, Rachad Mitsubishi Electric R&D Centre Europe 1 allée de Beaulieu CS 10806 35708 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [2011/35] | Representative(s) | Maillet, Alain Cabinet Le Guen Maillet 5, place Newquay B.P. 70250 35802 Dinard Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | Maillet, Alain Cabinet Le Guen Maillet 5, place Newquay B.P. 70250 35802 Dinard Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 10153977.3 | 18.02.2010 | [2011/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2362692 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/26 | [2011/35] | CPC: |
H04W28/26 (EP);
H04W16/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung, welche Ressource einer Heimbasisstation zugeordnet werden muss | [2011/35] | English: | Method and a device for determining which resource has to be allocated to a home base station | [2011/35] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour déterminer quelle ressource doit être affectée à une station de base domestique | [2011/35] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/13] | 12.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/06] | 30.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5781536 (AHMADI HAMID [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8,9,11,12 * figure 10 * * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 54 * * column 10, line 35 - column 14, line 57 * * column 15, line 60 - column 16, line 65 * [I] 6,7,10; | [XI]WO2010003509 (NEC EUROPE LTD [DE], et al) [X] 1,8,9,11,12 * figures 1-4 * * claims 1-17 * * page 3, line 19 - page 11, line 1 * [I] 2-7,10 |