EP2221101 - Method for softening water for use in a scrubber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/34] | System and method for softening water for use in a scrubber | ||
[2013/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Babcock & Wilcox Power Generation Group, Inc. Patent Department 20 South van Buren Avenue Barberton OH 44203-0351 / US | [2010/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Downs, William 8645 Schubert Avenue Alliance Ohio 44601 / US | 02 /
Williams, Paul J 4317 Wilcor Drive Akron Ohio 44319 / US | [2014/23] |
Former [2010/34] | 01 /
Downs, William 8645 Schubert Avenue Alliance Ohio 44601 / US | ||
02 /
Williams, Paul J 4317 Wilcor Drive, Akron Ohio 44319 / US | Representative(s) | Meldrum, David James D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [2014/23] |
Former [2010/34] | Meldrum, David James D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10154253.8 | 22.02.2010 | [2010/34] | Priority number, date | US20090154611P | 23.02.2009 Original published format: US 154611 P | US20100689313 | 19.01.2010 Original published format: US 689313 | [2010/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2221101 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2221101 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/50, B01D53/73, // C02F1/52, C02F103/18, C02F5/02 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
C02F1/5236 (EP,US);
B01D53/507 (EP,US);
C02F5/02 (EP,US);
C02F2101/10 (US);
C02F2101/101 (US);
C02F2103/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Enthärtung von Wäscherwasser | [2013/49] | English: | Method for softening water for use in a scrubber | [2013/49] | French: | Procédé d'adoucissement de l'eau à utiliser dans un épurateur-laveur | [2013/49] |
Former [2010/34] | System und Verfahren zum Weichmachen von Wasser zur Verwendung mit einer Bürste | ||
Former [2010/34] | System and method for softening water for use in a scrubber | ||
Former [2010/34] | Système et procédé d'adoucissement de l'eau à utiliser dans un épurateur | Examination procedure | 21.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 20.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 04.06.2014 | BG | 04.06.2014 | CY | 04.06.2014 | EE | 04.06.2014 | FI | 04.06.2014 | HR | 04.06.2014 | LT | 04.06.2014 | LV | 04.06.2014 | MC | 04.06.2014 | MK | 04.06.2014 | MT | 04.06.2014 | NL | 04.06.2014 | SE | 04.06.2014 | SI | 04.06.2014 | SM | 04.06.2014 | NO | 04.09.2014 | GR | 05.09.2014 | IS | 04.10.2014 | IE | 22.02.2015 | LU | 22.02.2015 | CH | 28.02.2015 | LI | 28.02.2015 | FR | 02.03.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | BE | 04.06.2014 | |
BG | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
MT | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SM | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
IE | 22.02.2015 | ||
LU | 22.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
FR | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
MT | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
IE | 22.02.2015 | ||
LU | 22.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
FR | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | BE | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
IE | 22.02.2015 | ||
LU | 22.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
FR | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | BE | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
IE | 22.02.2015 | ||
LU | 22.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | BE | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
LU | 22.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | BE | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
LU | 22.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/44] | BE | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
LU | 22.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | BE | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | BE | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 04.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE3901812 (KT KUNSTSTOFFTECH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7,13,14 * figure 1 * * column 4, line 27 - column 5, line 64 * [I] 8-12; | [XI]US5266285 (GLANCY DENNIS L [US], et al) [X] 1-7,13,14 * column 3, line 52 - column 5, line 10; figure 2 *[I] 8-12 | by applicant | DE3901812 | US5266285 |