EP2226370 - Method for attaching a double-sided pressure-sensitive adhesive tape comprising a release liner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/36] | Double-sided pressure-sensitive adhesive tape and method for attaching the same, and release liner | ||
[2012/14] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2019 | Revocation of patent | published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2012/21] |
Former [2010/36] | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsubaki, Hiroyuki c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 02 /
Kinpara, Kazuhiko c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 03 /
Hirose, Isao c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2012/52] |
Former [2010/36] | 01 /
Tsubaki, Hiroyuki c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | ||
02 /
Kinpara, Kazuhiko c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | |||
03 /
Hirose, Isao c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/36] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10154601.8 | 25.02.2010 | [2010/36] | Priority number, date | JP20090053091 | 06.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009053091 | [2010/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2226370 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2226370 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/02 | [2010/36] | CPC: |
C09J7/403 (EP,US);
B32B37/0015 (US);
C09J2301/124 (EP,US);
C09J2301/302 (EP,US);
C09J2301/412 (EP,US);
C09J2400/24 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Befestigung eines doppelseitig druckempfindlichen Haftklebebandes mit Abziehschicht | [2012/14] | English: | Method for attaching a double-sided pressure-sensitive adhesive tape comprising a release liner | [2012/14] | French: | Procédé de fixation d'une bande adhésive recto verso sensible à la pression avec revêtement protecteur | [2012/14] |
Former [2010/36] | Doppelseitige, druckempfindliche Klebefolie und Verfahren zu ihrer Befestigung und Abziehschicht | ||
Former [2010/36] | Double-sided pressure-sensitive adhesive tape and method for attaching the same, and release liner | ||
Former [2010/36] | Bande adhésive recto verso sensible à la pression et son procédé de fixation et revêtement protecteur | Examination procedure | 26.11.2010 | Observations by third parties | 07.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 08.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2011 | Observations by third parties | 17.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2011 | Observations by third parties | 25.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11002302.5 / EP2341115 | EP12004732.9 / EP2508582 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.09.2013
01.10.2013
ADMISSIBLE tesa SE Kst. 9500 - Bf. 645 Quickbornstraße 24 20253 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Stubbe, Andreas tesa SE Kst. 9500 Hugo-Kirchberg-Strasse 1 22848 Norderstedt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.09.2013
01.10.2013
ADMISSIBLE tesa SE Kst. 9500 - Bf. 645 Quickbornstraße 24 20253 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Stubbe, Andreas tesa AG, Kst. 9500 - Bf. 645, Quickbornstrasse 24 20253 Hamburg / DE | 04.11.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.03.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.12.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.01.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 29.01.2019 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/30] | Appeal following opposition | 05.04.2016 | Appeal received No. T0854/16 | 06.06.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.01.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 29.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.02.2019 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.02.2010 | AT | 26.12.2012 | BE | 26.12.2012 | CY | 26.12.2012 | CZ | 26.12.2012 | DK | 26.12.2012 | EE | 26.12.2012 | FI | 26.12.2012 | HR | 26.12.2012 | IT | 26.12.2012 | LT | 26.12.2012 | LV | 26.12.2012 | MK | 26.12.2012 | MT | 26.12.2012 | NL | 26.12.2012 | PL | 26.12.2012 | RO | 26.12.2012 | SE | 26.12.2012 | SI | 26.12.2012 | SK | 26.12.2012 | SM | 26.12.2012 | TR | 26.12.2012 | IE | 25.02.2013 | LU | 25.02.2013 | MC | 28.02.2013 | BG | 26.03.2013 | NO | 26.03.2013 | GR | 27.03.2013 | ES | 06.04.2013 | IS | 26.04.2013 | PT | 26.04.2013 | CH | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MK | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
SM | 26.12.2012 | ||
TR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IE | 25.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
SM | 26.12.2012 | ||
IE | 25.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
IE | 25.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
IE | 25.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
IE | 25.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 26.12.2012 | |
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 26.12.2012 | |
NO | 26.03.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5044776 (SCHRAMER KURT M [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * figures 2, 4 * * claims 1-3, 6, 10 *; | [X]US5964252 (SIMMONS GEORGE R [US], et al) [X] 6 * column 9, line 53 - line 57 * * figure 9 ** claims 1, 2, 5, 9 *; | [X]WO0114489 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-4,6 * page 8, line 11 - line 13 * * figures 6e, 9b * * claims 1, 5, 6 *; | [XA]WO2005075595 (PARK SANG-JUNG [KR]) [X] 6 * page 5, line 14 - line 16 * * figures 7, 8 * * claims 1, 4 * [A] 1-5 | Examination | DE3724528 | DE29901090U | by applicant | JP2002309227 | JP2005179561 | JP2005350650 | JP2006022189 | JP2007009138 | JP2008012798 | other | DE3724528 | DE29901090U |