EP2237137 - Touch screen interfaces with pulse oximetry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Empire Technology Development LLC 2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400 Wilmington New Castle County, Delaware 19808 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | For all designated states Empire Technology Development LLC 2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400 Wilmington New Castle County, Delaware 19808 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miller, Seth Adrian 6057 S. Kenton Street Englewood, CO 80111 / US | [2010/40] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10154700.8 | 25.02.2010 | [2010/40] | Priority number, date | US20090417478 | 02.04.2009 Original published format: US 417478 | [2010/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2237137 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2237137 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/042 | [2010/40] | CPC: |
G06F3/0425 (EP,US);
A61B5/14551 (EP,US);
A61B5/6887 (EP,US);
A61B5/6898 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0462 (EP,US);
A61B5/02416 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04109 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Berührungsbildschirmschnittstellen mit Pulsoximetrie | [2010/40] | English: | Touch screen interfaces with pulse oximetry | [2010/40] | French: | Interfaces d'écran tactile doté d'oxymétrie de pouls | [2010/40] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/22] | 07.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0184482 (DELSY ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-8,10,12-15 * page 25, line 7 - page 27, line 1 * * page 35, line 11 - page 36, line 2 * * page 48, line 5 - page 49, line 3 * [I] 9,11; | [X]WO9928701 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 11, line 17 - page 16, line 24; figure 8 *; | [A]WO0217778 (NELLCOR PURITAN BENNETT INC [US]) [A] 1,10,12,14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0015] *; | [A]US5719950 (OSTEN DAVID W [US], et al) [A] 1,10,12,14 * column 8, line 4 - column 9, line 20; figures 2b, 7 *; | [A]EP1685794 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,10,12,14 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0045] *; | [A]WO2004066194 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1,10,12,14 * page 4, line 1 - page 9, line 2 *; | [A]US5007423 (BRANSTETTER RONALD L [US], et al) [A] 1,10,12,14 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 31 * |