EP2239696 - System and method for silencing notifications for a message thread [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2013/48] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2010/41] | For all designated states RESEARCH IN MOTION LIMITED 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kalu, Kalu Onuka 75565 - 175 Columbia Street West Waterloo Ontario N2L 5Z5 / CA | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/41] | 01 /
Kalu Kalu, Onuka 75565 - 175 Columbia Street West Waterloo Ontario N2L 5Z5 / CA | Representative(s) | Reichl, Wolfgang MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/41] | Reichl, Wolfgang MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10154855.0 | 26.02.2010 | [2010/41] | Priority number, date | US20090167542P | 08.04.2009 Original published format: US 167542 P | [2010/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2239696 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2010/41] | CPC: |
G06Q10/107 (EP,US);
H04L51/224 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Dämpfung von Nachrichten für Nachrichtenthreads | [2010/41] | English: | System and method for silencing notifications for a message thread | [2010/41] | French: | Système et procédé pour silencieux de notifications pour fil de message | [2010/41] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/41] | 05.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/01] | 23.06.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/01] | 18.08.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002087646 (HICKEY MATTHEW W [US], et al) [A] 2-4,6 * paragraph [0038] ** paragraph [0039] *; | [XI]US2008294727 (MOODY PAUL B [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6,8,11,12 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0044] * * figure 3 * [I] 2,4,5,7,9,10; | [A]US2008301250 (HARDY MICHAEL THOMAS [CA], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0047] * * figure 1 * | Examination | US2003167310 | by applicant | US2002087646 | US2008294727 | US2008301250 |