EP2366408 - Aqueous clear solutions of fluocinolone acetonide for treatment of otic inflammation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laboratorios SALVAT, S.A. Calle Gall 30-36 08950 Esplugues de Llobregat, Barcelona / ES | [2011/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ruiz i Pol, Jaume LABORATORIOS SALVAT, S.A. Gall, 30-36 E-08950, Esplugues de LLobregat-Barcelona / ES | 02 /
Izquierdo Torres, Francisca LABORATORIOS SALVAT, S.A. Gall, 30-36 E-08950 Esplugues de LLobregat - Barcelona / ES | [2012/29] |
Former [2011/38] | 01 /
Ruizipol, Jaume LABORATORIOS SALVAT, S.A. Gall, 30-36 E-08950, Esplugues de LLobregat-Barcelona / ES | ||
02 /
Izquierdo Torres, Francisca LABORATORIOS SALVAT, S.A. Gall, 30-36 E-08950 Esplugues de LLobregat - Barcelona / ES | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2011/38] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 10155005.1 | 01.03.2010 | [2011/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2366408 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2366408 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/10, A61K47/12, A61K47/14, A61K47/32, A61K47/38, A61K9/00, A61K31/58 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
A61K9/0046 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/32 (KR);
A61K31/496 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/573 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/58 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/12 (KR);
A61K47/14 (KR);
A61K47/38 (KR);
A61K9/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/496, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/573, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/58, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/38] | A61K47/10, A61K47/12, A61K47/14, A61K47/32, A61K47/38, A61K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/38] | Title | German: | Wässrige klare Lösungen aus Fluocinolon-Acetonid zur Behandlung von Ohrentzündungen | [2011/38] | English: | Aqueous clear solutions of fluocinolone acetonide for treatment of otic inflammation | [2011/38] | French: | Solutions claires aqueuses d'acétonide de fluocinolone pour le traitement de l'inflammation otique | [2011/38] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/46] | 03.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.03.2010 | AT | 18.07.2012 | BE | 18.07.2012 | CY | 18.07.2012 | CZ | 18.07.2012 | EE | 18.07.2012 | HR | 18.07.2012 | LT | 18.07.2012 | LV | 18.07.2012 | MK | 18.07.2012 | MT | 18.07.2012 | NL | 18.07.2012 | RO | 18.07.2012 | SI | 18.07.2012 | SK | 18.07.2012 | SM | 18.07.2012 | BG | 18.10.2012 | GR | 19.10.2012 | IS | 18.11.2012 | PT | 19.11.2012 | IE | 01.03.2013 | LU | 01.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
MK | 18.07.2012 | ||
MT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
SM | 18.07.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
IE | 01.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
MT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
SM | 18.07.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
IE | 01.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
MT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
IE | 01.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
IE | 01.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 18.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1013180 (ICI LTD) [A] 1-15 * page 1, column r, line 78 - page 2, column l, line 15 * * examples 1,2; claim - *; | [A]GB1133800 (ICI LTD) [A] 1-15 * page 1, column l, lines 22-31 * * page 1, column r, lines 51-56 *; | [Y]GB1411432 (MEDISAN AB) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE2515594 (WARNER LAMBERT CO) [Y] 1-15 * example 2 *; | [AD]EP0995435 (SENJU PHARMA CO [JP]) [AD] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]US2009325938 (LICHTER JAY [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0013] * * paragraphs [0174] , [0179]; example 10; claim - *; | [Y]US2010036000 (LICHTER JAY [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0243] , [ 252] - [0254] * * example -; claim - * | by applicant | EP1312356 | US2009111780 | - T.L. LEMKE; D.A. WILLIAMS, Foye's Principles of Medicinal Chemistry, WOLTERS KLUWER, (2007), page 902 | - J. COLOE; M.J. ZIRWAS, "Allergens in corticosteroid vehicles", DERMATITIS, (2008), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 38 - 42 | - P.D. DARBRE; P.W. HARVEY, "Paraben esters: review of recent studies of endocrine toxicity, absorption, esterase and human exposure, and discussion of potential human health risks", J APPL TOXICOL., (2008), vol. 28, no. 5, pages 561 - 578 |