EP2363866 - Coil arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Oy Strömbergintie 1 00380 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | For all designated states ABB Oy Strömbergintie 1 00380 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seväkivi, Pertti Lehdokintie 24 01830 Lepsämä / FI | 02 /
Talja, Markku Myrynkuja 1 E 04400 Järvenpää / FI | [2011/36] | Representative(s) | Holmström, Stefan Mikael Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | Holmström, Stefan Mikael Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 10155025.9 | 01.03.2010 | [2011/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2363866 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/02, H01F27/10, H01F27/26 | [2011/36] | CPC: |
H01F27/10 (EP);
H01F27/025 (EP);
H01F27/263 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Spulenanordnung | [2011/36] | English: | Coil arrangement | [2011/36] | French: | Agencement de bobine | [2011/36] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/36] | 17.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US513420 (ROWLAND HENRY A.) [X] 1-3,5,7 * page 1, line 51 - page 1, line 91; figures 1,2 * [I] 4,6; | [XI]US2547045 (SABOL JOHN T) [X] 1,2,5,7 * column 2, line 31 - column 4, line 3; figures 1,2,3 * * column 3, line 47 - column 3, line 62 * * column 4, line 1 - column 4, line 12 * [I] 3,4,6; | [XI]US2004257187 (DRUMMOND GEOFFREY N [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0031]; figure 2 * [I] 3,6; | [A]EP0982832 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0056] , [0057] , [0059]; figure 2 *; | [A]US3073885 (GUGLIELMO CAMILLI) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 45 - column 2, line 57; figure 1 * * column 3, line 16 - column 3, line 32 * |