EP2365250 - Partial filling of a pulse detonation combustor in a pulse detonation combustor based hybrid engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2011/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tangirala, Venkat Eswarlu / 2108 Alexis Avenue Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 02 /
Joshi, Narendra Digamber / 6005 Baneberry Drive Schenectady, NY 12303 / US | [2011/37] | Representative(s) | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation-Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2011/37] | Gray, Thomas, et al GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 10155968.0 | 09.03.2010 | [2011/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2365250 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F23R7/00, F23C15/00, F02K7/02 | [2011/37] | CPC: |
F23R7/00 (EP);
F02C5/00 (EP);
F02K7/02 (EP);
F23C15/00 (EP);
F23R2900/03281 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Teilweise Befüllung einer Verbrennungsanlage mit gepulster Detonation in einer Verbrennungsanlage mit gepulster Detonation basierend auf einem Hybridmotor | [2011/37] | English: | Partial filling of a pulse detonation combustor in a pulse detonation combustor based hybrid engine | [2011/37] | French: | Remplissage partiel de chambre de combustion à détonation par impulsion dans une chambre de combustion à détonation par impulsion basée sur un moteur hybride | [2011/37] | Examination procedure | 09.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 22.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2012 | Observations by third parties | 15.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2013 | Observations by third parties | 19.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/02] | 28.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US6062018 (BUSSING THOMAS R A [US]) [X] 8-11,14,15 * figures 3,5, 7, 10, 11 * * column 4, line 13 - line 15 * * column 4, line 63 - line 67 * * column 5, line 14 - line 26 * * column 11, line 57 - line 60 * [A] 5,12,13 [I] 1-4,6,7; | [XI]US2005279078 (DEAN ANTHONY J [US], et al) [X] 8-11 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0030] , [ 0032] * [I] 1-4; | [XI]WO2007025047 (UNIV CINCINNATI [US], et al) [X] 8-11,14,15 * figure 19b; claims 30,38,39 * * page 23 - page 24 * [I] 1-4,6,7; | [XI]US2008229756 (PINARD PIERRE FRANCOIS [US], et al) [X] 8-11,14,15 * figures 1-3; claim 1 * * paragraphs [0010] , [ 0019] , [ 0041] , [0044] * [I] 1-4,6,7; | [XI] - HOKE, J.; ROYCE, B.; SCHAUER, F., "Heat Transfer and Thermal Management in a Pulsed Detonation Engine", AIAA AEROSPACE SCIENCES MEETING & EXHIBIT, Reno, NV, (20030106), pages 1 - 5, XP002600836 [X] 8,9,11 * the whole document * [I] 1-4 | [XI] - VENKAT, E.; NARENDRA, D., "Systems Level Performance Estimations for a Pulse detonation Combustor Based Hybrid Engine", PROCEEDINGS OF ASME TURBO EXPO 2008, Berlin, (20080609), no. GT2008, pages 1 - 19, XP002600837 [X] 8,9,11 * abstract * * pages 16,18 * [I] 1-4 | [XI] - KASAHARA, J. ; HIRANO, M.; MATSUO, A.; DAIMON, Y.; ENDO, T., "Thrust measurement of a multicycle partially filled pulse detonation rocket engine", JOURNAL OF PROPULSION AND POWER, vol. 25, no. 6, (20091230), pages 1281 - 1290, URL: http://pdf.aiaa.org/jaPreview/JPP/2009/PVJA42224.pdf, (20100915), XP002600838 [X] 8-10 * figures 1,4,16,21; table 2 * * page 1282 * * page 1283 * * page 1286 * [I] 1-4 | [A] - COOPER, M. AND SHEPHERD, J., E. AND SCHAUER, F., "Impulse Correlation for Partially-filled detonation Tubes", vol. 20, no. 5, (20041231), pages 1 - 10, JOURNAL OF PROPULSION AND POWER, URL: www.galcit.caltech.edu/EDL/publications/reprints/nozzles.pdf, (20100914), XP002600839 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - F. Joos, Technische Verbrennung, Springer-Verlag Berlin Heidelberg, (20061231), XP002601300 [A] 1-15 * page 236 - page 238; figure 8.13 * | Examination | US2004250529 | by applicant | WO2007025047 | US2008229756 | other | US2004250529 | EP1483489 | - "PCE*- Pulse Combustion Engine", EUROPEAN FP6 PROPOSAL NUMBER FP6-511812-1, (20031013), pages 1 - 6, XP003029354 |