EP2228773 - Method for managing the operation of a positioning module included in an electronic toll device, corresponding computer program product, storage means and electronic toll device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sierra Wireless 3 Esplanade du Foncet 92442 Issy Les Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [2010/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Didi, Thierry / 75, rue Vasco de Gama 75015, PARIS / FR | 02 /
Flechelle, Christophe / 13, rue Pasteur 92700, COLOMBES / FR | [2013/03] |
Former [2010/37] | 01 /
Didi, Thierry 75, rue Vasco de Gama 75015, PARIS / FR | ||
02 /
Flechelle, Christophe 13, rue Pasteur 92700, COLOMBES / FR | Representative(s) | Guéné, Patrick Cabinet Vidon Technopôle Atalante 16B, rue de Jouanet 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Guéné, Patrick Cabinet Vidon Technopôle Atalante 16B, rue de Jouanet 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | ||
Former [2010/37] | Guéné, Patrick Cabinet Vidon Technopôle Atalante 16B, rue de Jouanet 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10156149.6 | 11.03.2010 | [2010/37] | Priority number, date | FR20090051570 | 12.03.2009 Original published format: FR 0951570 | [2010/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2228773 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2228773 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G07B15/06 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
G07B15/063 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/37] | G07B15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/37] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Verwaltung der Funktionsweise eines Lokalisierungsmoduls, das in einer elektronischen Mautvorrichtung enthalten ist, entsprechendes Computerprogrammprodukt, entsprechendes Speichermittel und entsprechende elektronische Mautvorrichtung | [2010/37] | English: | Method for managing the operation of a positioning module included in an electronic toll device, corresponding computer program product, storage means and electronic toll device | [2010/37] | French: | Procédé de gestion du fonctionnement d'un module de localisation compris dans un dispositif de télépéage, produit programme d'ordinateur, moyen de stockage, et dispositif de télépéage correspondants | [2010/37] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/44] | 07.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.03.2010 | AT | 16.01.2013 | CY | 16.01.2013 | CZ | 16.01.2013 | DK | 16.01.2013 | EE | 16.01.2013 | FI | 16.01.2013 | HR | 16.01.2013 | IT | 16.01.2013 | LT | 16.01.2013 | LV | 16.01.2013 | MK | 16.01.2013 | MT | 16.01.2013 | NL | 16.01.2013 | PL | 16.01.2013 | RO | 16.01.2013 | SE | 16.01.2013 | SI | 16.01.2013 | SK | 16.01.2013 | SM | 16.01.2013 | TR | 16.01.2013 | IE | 11.03.2013 | LU | 11.03.2013 | BE | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | BG | 16.04.2013 | NO | 16.04.2013 | GR | 17.04.2013 | ES | 27.04.2013 | IS | 16.05.2013 | PT | 16.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
MK | 16.01.2013 | ||
MT | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
SM | 16.01.2013 | ||
TR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IE | 11.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
MT | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
SM | 16.01.2013 | ||
IE | 11.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
MT | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
IE | 11.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
IE | 11.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
IE | 11.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 16.01.2013 | |
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 16.01.2013 | |
NO | 16.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0111571 (MANNESMANN AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-14 * claim - *; | [Y]WO2007045002 (KAPSCH CARRIERCOM AG [AT], et al) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008132088 (WAVECOM [FR], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002102990 (ALBERTH WILLIAM P [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0029] *; | [A]DE4344433 (DETECON GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * column 2 - lines 6-34 * |